Endurance Specialty Insurance Limited v. Horseshoe Re Limited
Petitioner: Endurance Specialty Insurance Limited
Respondent: Horseshoe Re Limited
Case Number: 1:2023cv01831
Filed: March 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 205 Removal from State Court: Enforcement of Foreign Arbital Awards
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #23 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (tp)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Endurance Specialty Insurance Limited. Related Document Number: #18 ..(Ginsberg, Melissa) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. .
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DECLARATION of Peter Chaffetz in Support re: #20 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Horseshoe Re Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email chain between the ICC Court, Endurance, Bernard Eder, and Horseshoe).(Chaffetz, Peter)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #20 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Horseshoe Re Limited..(Chaffetz, Peter)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Horseshoe Re Limited..(Chaffetz, Peter)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Endurance Specialty Insurance Limited..(Ginsberg, Melissa)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Document filed by Endurance Specialty Insurance Limited..(Ginsberg, Melissa)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion to Expedite. Initial briefs or both motions due April 11, 2023, Responses due May 1, 2023. Replies due May 8, 2023. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/29/2023) (tg)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Peter Chaffetz dated March 29, 2023. Document filed by Horseshoe Re Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email from the Tribunal to the Parties dated Feb. 16, 2023).(Chaffetz, Peter)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 4/11/2023. Responses due by 5/1/2023 Replies due by 5/8/2023. (tg)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Conference re: #14 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #11 Order,, to Set Briefing Schedule addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David A. Attisani dated 03/27/2023. The plaintiff may move to remand on the same schedule as the motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's motion due 4/17/23, Response due 5/12/23, Reply due 5/24/23.(Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/27/2023) (tro)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #11 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, to Set Briefing Schedule addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David A. Attisani dated 03/27/2023. Document filed by Endurance Specialty Insurance Limited..(Attisani, David)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Endurance Specialty Holdings Ltd., Corporate Parent Sompo Holdings, Inc. for Endurance Specialty Insurance Limited. Document filed by Endurance Specialty Insurance Limited..(Ginsberg, Melissa)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Albert Attisani on behalf of Endurance Specialty Insurance Limited..(Attisani, David)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The respondent may move to dismiss without a pre-motion conference. The motion is due April 17, 2023. The response is due May 12, 2023. The reply is due May 24, 2023. The conference scheduled for March 27, 2023 is canceled. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/24/2023) ( Motions due by 4/17/2023., Responses due by 5/12/2023, Replies due by 5/24/2023.) (ks)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Telephone Conference set for 3/27/2023 at 3:00 PM adjourned to 03:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: A telephone conference is scheduled for March 27, 2023 at 3:00 p.m. Dial-in: 888-363-4749, with access code 8140049. ( Telephone Conference set for 3/27/2023 at 03:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/10/2023) (ate)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference from March 16, 2023 to March 21, 2023 addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Melissa Ginsberg dated March 9, 2023. Document filed by Endurance Specialty Insurance Limited..(Ginsberg, Melissa)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The parties are directed to appear, by phone, for a pre-motion conference on March 16, 2023, at 12:00 p.m. Dial-in: 888-363-4749, with access code 8140049. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/8/2023) ( Telephone Conference set for 3/16/2023 at 12:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (ks)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Peter Chaffetz dated March 8, 2023. Document filed by Horseshoe Re Limited..(Chaffetz, Peter)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 650832-2023..Document filed by Horseshoe Re Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Process, Pleadings, and Orders served on Respondent, NYSCEF 1-25, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Process, Pleadings, and Orders served on Respondent, NYSCEF 26-50, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Email dated February 14, 2023).(Chaffetz, Peter)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and accompanying exhibits served on Endurance Specialty Insurance Limited on March 3, 2023. Document filed by Horseshoe Re Limited..(Chaffetz, Peter)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sj)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Peter R Chaffetz to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Pursuant to ECF Filing Rule 13.3, Notice of Removal exhibits must be filed as attachments and labeled. Each attachment must be clearly titled in the ECF entry so the subject of the exhibit is clear. They cannot be labeled "Exhibit A, Exhibit B, etc.". Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Peter R Chaffetz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Carl Schwartz on behalf of Horseshoe Re Limited..(Schwartz, Steven)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Arthur J. Gallagher & Co., Inc., Corporate Parent Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. (Bermuda) Limited for Horseshoe Re Limited. Document filed by Horseshoe Re Limited..(Chaffetz, Peter)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Chaffetz, Peter)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - EXHIBITS NOT CLEARLY TITLED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 650832/2023. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27416487).Document filed by Horseshoe Re Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit B).(Chaffetz, Peter) Modified on 3/3/2023 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Endurance Specialty Insurance Limited v. Horseshoe Re Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Endurance Specialty Insurance Limited
Represented By: David Albert Attisani
Represented By: Melissa Rae Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Horseshoe Re Limited
Represented By: Steven Carl Schwartz
Represented By: Peter R Chaffetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?