Fernandez v. Capra
Petitioner: Welington Fernandez
Respondent: Michael Capra
Case Number: 1:2023cv01845
Filed: March 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2023 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Eastern District of New York acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 1:23-cv-01941, filed on 03/10/2023. (sgz)
March 6, 2023 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 2. Mailed to: Welington Fernandez 20-A-0331 Sing Sing Correctional Facility 354 Hunter Street Ossining, NY 10562. (dsh)
March 3, 2023 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York.(rdz)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Petitioner and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Whether Petitioner should be permitted to proceed further without payment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. This order closes this case. Because Petitioner has not at this time made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right, a certificate of appealability will not issue under 28 U.S.C. 2253. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 44445 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/3/23) (rdz) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
March 3, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sac)
March 2, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Document filed by Welington Fernandez..(rdz)
March 2, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernandez v. Capra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Welington Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Capra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?