Meissner et al v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Stuart Meissner, Mr. Jonathan zeron, Mr. James aleman, Jr., Steven Silvestro, Stuart Meissner, Jonathan Zeron and James Aleman, JR.
Defendant: CITY OF NEW YORK, New York City Police Department, Keechant L. Sewell, nicole berkovich and New York City Police Department License Division
Case Number: 1:2023cv01907
Filed: March 6, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #22 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Nicholas R. Ciappetta dated April 11, 2023., #1 Complaint. Application granted. SO ORDERED. Nicole Berkovich answer due 6/13/2023; City of New York answer due 6/13/2023; New York City Police Department answer due 6/13/2023; New York City Police Department License Division answer due 6/13/2023. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 4/13/2023) (ate)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Nicholas R. Ciappetta dated April 11, 2023. Document filed by Nicole Berkovich, City of New York, New York City Police Department, New York City Police Department License Division..(Ciappetta, Nicholas)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Nicole Berkovich waiver sent on 3/20/2023, answer due 5/19/2023. Document filed by Steven Silvestro; Stuart Meissner; James Aleman, JR; Jonathan Zeron..(Schechter, Robert)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Robert Ciappetta on behalf of Nicole Berkovich..(Ciappetta, Nicholas)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Robert Ciappetta on behalf of City of New York, New York City Police Department, New York City Police Department License Division..(Ciappetta, Nicholas)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summonses and Complaint served on City of New York, NYPD, NYPD License Division, NYPD Commissioner Keechant L. Sewell on 3/20/2023. Service was accepted by serviceECF@law.nyc.gov. Service was made by Email. Document filed by James Aleman, JR, Stuart Meissner, Steven Silvestro, Jonathan Zeron..(Schechter, Robert)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Notice of Constitutional Question pursuant to FRCP 5.1 re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by James Aleman, JR, Stuart Meissner, Steven Silvestro, Jonathan Zeron..(Tilem, Peter)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Police Department..(gp)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Police Department License Division..(gp)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nicole Berkovich..(gp)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Police Department, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by James Aleman, JR, Stuart Meissner, Steven Silvestro, Jonathan Zeron..(Tilem, Peter)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Police Department License Division, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by James Aleman, JR, Stuart Meissner, Steven Silvestro, Jonathan Zeron..(Tilem, Peter)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nicole Berkovich, Director NYPD License Division, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by James Aleman, JR, Stuart Meissner, Steven Silvestro, Jonathan Zeron..(Tilem, Peter)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Keechant L. Sewell..(gp)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York..(gp)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Peter Howard Tilem to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (gp)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Peter Howard Tilem to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on 'As to' docket entry text was omitted. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (gp)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (gp)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Peter Howard Tilem. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1331vc Fed. Question: Violation of Constitutional Rights;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 42:1983 Civil Rights Act;. (gp)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Peter Howard Tilem . The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error (names in lower case). (gp) Modified on 3/7/2023 (gp).
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Matthew Schechter on behalf of Stuart Meissner, Steven Silvestro, James aleman, Jr, Jonathan zeron..(Schechter, Robert)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tilem, Peter)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nicole Berkovich, Director NYPD License Division, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Stuart Meissner, Steven Silvestro, James aleman, Jr, Jonathan zeron..(Tilem, Peter) Modified on 3/7/2023 (gp).
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Keechant L. Sewell, Police Commissioner, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Stuart Meissner, Steven Silvestro, James aleman, Jr, Jonathan zeron..(Tilem, Peter)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Police Department License Division, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Stuart Meissner, Steven Silvestro, James aleman, Jr, Jonathan zeron..(Tilem, Peter) Modified on 3/7/2023 (gp).
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Stuart Meissner, Steven Silvestro, James aleman, Jr, Jonathan zeron..(Tilem, Peter) Modified on 3/7/2023 (gp).
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Stuart Meissner, Steven Silvestro, James aleman, Jr, Jonathan zeron..(Tilem, Peter)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF NEW YORK, New York City Police Department, New York City Police Department License Division, Keechant L. Sewell, nicole berkovich. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27428044)Document filed by James aleman, Jr, Jonathan zeron, Stuart Meissner, Steven Silvestro..(Tilem, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meissner et al v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Stuart Meissner
Represented By: Peter Howard Tilem
Represented By: Robert Matthew Schechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Jonathan zeron
Represented By: Robert Matthew Schechter
Represented By: Peter Howard Tilem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. James aleman, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Matthew Schechter
Represented By: Peter Howard Tilem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Silvestro
Represented By: Robert Matthew Schechter
Represented By: Peter Howard Tilem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stuart Meissner
Represented By: Robert Matthew Schechter
Represented By: Peter Howard Tilem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Zeron
Represented By: Robert Matthew Schechter
Represented By: Peter Howard Tilem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Aleman, JR.
Represented By: Robert Matthew Schechter
Represented By: Peter Howard Tilem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Ciappetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Police Department
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Ciappetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keechant L. Sewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: nicole berkovich
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Ciappetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Police Department License Division
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Ciappetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?