Yitzhak et al v. Verner et al
Plaintiff: Erica T Yitzhak, The Law Offices of Erica T. Yitzhak and Erica T. Yitzhak, Esq. P.C.
Defendant: Paul William Verner, Verner and Simon, Verner and Simon, P.C. and Verner and Simon, LLP
Case Number: 1:2023cv02084
Filed: March 10, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jennifer H Rearden
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 pi Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned parties, that Defendants PAUL WILLIAM VERNER; VERNER SIMON, i/s/h/a VERNER AND SIMON; VERNER SIMON, P.C., i/s/h/a VERNER AND SIMON, P.C.; and VERNER SIMON, LLP, i/s/h/a VERNER AND SIMON, LLP's time to answer or otherwise move is hereby further extended up to and including May 13,2023. SO ORDERED. Paul William Verner answer due 5/13/2023; Verner and Simon answer due 5/13/2023; Verner and Simon, LLP answer due 5/13/2023; Verner and Simon, P.C. answer due 5/13/2023., Motions terminated: #8 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden from Erin O'Leary dated April 19, 2023. filed by Paul William Verner. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 4/20/2023) (kv)
April 19, 2023 Filing 8 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden from Erin O'Leary dated April 19, 2023. Document filed by Paul William Verner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint).(O'Leary, Erin)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re: #6 Proposed Stipulation and Order filed by Paul William Verner, Verner and Simon, LLP, Verner and Simon, Verner and Simon, P.C. - In seeking a request for extension of time, the parties shall comply with Rule 2.E of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden) (Text Only Order) (kwi) Modified on 4/18/2023 (kwi).
April 14, 2023 Filing 6 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Paul William Verner, Verner and Simon, Verner and Simon, LLP, Verner and Simon, P.C...(O'Leary, Erin)
March 13, 2023 Filing 5 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Paul William Verner, Verner and Simon, Verner and Simon, LLP, Verner and Simon, P.C...(O'Leary, Erin)
March 13, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Lavoott Bluestone on behalf of Erica T. Yitzhak, Esq. P.C., The Law Offices of Erica T. Yitzhak, Erica T Yitzhak..(Bluestone, Andrew)
March 13, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Erin Anne O'Leary to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the jurisdiction of this action is based on diversity - the party/intervenor did not name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time - name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Please use the revised form found here # NYSD form page (lb)
March 13, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Erin Anne O'Leary. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Origin code has been modified to 2 (Removal from State Court). (sj)
March 13, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
March 13, 2023 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
March 13, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
March 10, 2023 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MISSING DIVERSITY INFORMATION - FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Paul William Verner, Verner and Simon, Verner and Simon, LLP, Verner and Simon, P.C...(O'Leary, Erin) Modified on 3/13/2023 (lb).
March 10, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(O'Leary, Erin)
March 10, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 159789/2022. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27455294).Document filed by Verner and Simon, P.C., Paul William Verner, Verner and Simon, LLP, Verner and Simon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Retainer Letter, #3 Exhibit C - License and tax returns (redacted), #4 Exhibit D - State of New Jersey Dept of the treasury filing certificate (redacted), #5 Exhibit E - Department of State Division of Corporations Entity Information for Verner Simon P.C., #6 Exhibit F - Department of State Division of Corporations Entity Information for Verner Simon, LLP, #7 Exhibit G - Affidavit of Service Through the Secretary of).(O'Leary, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yitzhak et al v. Verner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica T Yitzhak
Represented By: Andrew Lavoott Bluestone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Law Offices of Erica T. Yitzhak
Represented By: Andrew Lavoott Bluestone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica T. Yitzhak, Esq. P.C.
Represented By: Andrew Lavoott Bluestone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul William Verner
Represented By: Erin Anne O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verner and Simon
Represented By: Erin Anne O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verner and Simon, P.C.
Represented By: Erin Anne O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verner and Simon, LLP
Represented By: Erin Anne O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?