NAVCAN.DC, Inc. et al v. Rinde et al
Plaintiff: NAVCAN.DC, Inc. (previously known as Cascade Divide Data Centers, Inc.), DACH Holdings, LLC, Silverstein Realty Group, Inc., Silver Springs Development, Inc., GGH, Inc., Residencial de Chihuahua 2001, S.A. de C.V. and NAVCAN.DC, Inc.
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Rinde, Esq., CKR Law, LLP and Jeffrey Rinde
Case Number: 1:2023cv02267
Filed: March 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #18 Status Report filed by DACH Holdings, LLC, Silver Springs Development, Inc., Silverstein Realty Group, Inc., Residencial de Chihuahua 2001, S.A. de C.V., NAVCAN.DC, Inc., GGH, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for May 10, 2023, is adjourned to May 24, 2023, at 4:00 P.M. At that time, the parties shall call 888-363-4749 and use the access code 558-3333. The deadline for the parties to file the joint letter and proposed civil case management plan and scheduling order is extended to May 17, 2023, at 12:00 P.M. If Defendants donot appear in the action leading up to the new conference date, Plaintiff shallfile a proposed order to show cause for default judgment and supporting papersrequired by the Court's Individual Rules by May 17, 2023., ( Motions due by 5/17/2023., Telephonic Initial Conference set for 5/24/2023 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/04/2023) (ama)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by DACH Holdings, LLC, GGH, Inc., NAVCAN.DC, Inc., Residencial de Chihuahua 2001, S.A. de C.V., Silver Springs Development, Inc., Silverstein Realty Group, Inc...(Conway, Kevin)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, It is hereby ORDERED that if Defendants appear or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' communication, the parties shall file the joint letter and proposed case management plan as soon as possible and no later than May 3, 2023. If not, no later than May 3, 2023, Plaintiff shall file a status letter (1) requesting further adjournment of the initial conference for up to 30 days and (2) proposing a date prior to the conference to present an Order to Show Cause for default judgment as to Defendants and related papers as provided in the Court's Individual Rules. It is further ORDERED that the initial pretrial conference scheduled for May 3, 2023, is adjourned to May 10, 2023, at 4:00 P.M. ( Initial Conference set for 5/10/2023 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/27/23) (yv)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by DACH Holdings, LLC, GGH, Inc., NAVCAN.DC, Inc., Residencial de Chihuahua 2001, S.A. de C.V., Silver Springs Development, Inc., Silverstein Realty Group, Inc...(Conway, Kevin)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. CKR Law, LLP served on 4/11/2023, answer due 5/2/2023. Service was accepted by Amy Lesch, Business Document Specialist. Document filed by Residencial de Chihuahua 2001, S.A. de C.V.; Silver Springs Development, Inc.; NAVCAN.DC, Inc.; Silverstein Realty Group, Inc.; DACH Holdings, LLC; GGH, Inc...(Conway, Kevin)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Jeffrey Rinde served on 4/4/2023, answer due 4/25/2023. Document filed by Residencial de Chihuahua 2001, S.A. de C.V.; Silver Springs Development, Inc.; NAVCAN.DC, Inc.; Silverstein Realty Group, Inc.; DACH Holdings, LLC; GGH, Inc...(Conway, Kevin)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Conference re: #11 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Kevin P. Conway, Esq. dated March 29, 2023. Application GRANTED. An alternative method of service under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) is acceptable if (1) it is not prohibited by international agreement, (2) comports with constitutional notions of due process, (3) the plaintiff has made a reasonable effort to effectuate service on the defendant and (4) the circumstances are such that the court's intervention is necessary. See Asia Cube Energy Holdings, Ltd. v. Inno Energy Tech Co., No. 20 Civ. 6203, 2020 WL 4884002, at *2-3 (S.D.N.Y. Aug. 17, 2020). Here, the factors weigh in favor of granting the request. Cambodia is not a party to the Hague Convention, see Hague Convention, Nov. 15, 1965, 20 U.S.T. 361 (listing signatories), Defendant Rinde resides, purportedly, in an unknown location within Cambodia and service of process by email is reasonably calculated under the circumstances to apprise Rinde of the pendency of the action. Plaintiff shall promptly serve a copy of the Complaint on Rinde and file proof of service on the docket no later than April 24, 2023. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Dkt. No. 11. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/4/2023) (ate)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Service due by 4/24/2023. (ate)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Kevin P. Conway, Esq. dated March 30, 2023 re: Requested Pre-Motion Conference Date. Document filed by DACH Holdings, LLC, GGH, Inc., NAVCAN.DC, Inc., Residencial de Chihuahua 2001, S.A. de C.V., Silver Springs Development, Inc., Silverstein Realty Group, Inc...(Conway, Kevin)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Kevin P. Conway, Esq. dated March 29, 2023. Document filed by DACH Holdings, LLC, GGH, Inc., NAVCAN.DC, Inc., Residencial de Chihuahua 2001, S.A. de C.V., Silver Springs Development, Inc., Silverstein Realty Group, Inc...(Conway, Kevin)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order and Individual Rules and Procedures for Civil Cases served on Jeffrey Rinde and CKR Law LLP on March 21, 2023. Document filed by DACH Holdings, LLC, GGH, Inc., NAVCAN.DC, Inc., Residencial de Chihuahua 2001, S.A. de C.V., Silver Springs Development, Inc., Silverstein Realty Group, Inc...(Conway, Kevin)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that a telephonic conference will be held on May 3, 2023 at 4:00 p.m. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. The telephonic conference is public, and the time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. The parties shall ensure they are all dialed into the conference call by the appointed conference time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint letter on ECF by April 26, 2023 at noon, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs: as set forth herein. Counsel who have noticed an appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed (i) to notify all other parties' attorneys in this action by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules forthwith, and (ii) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must send a copy of this order and Individual Rules to that party personally. DATE AND TIME OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE: May 3, 2023 at 4:00 p.m. IPTC MATERIALS DUE: April 26, 2023 at noon. Telephonic Initial Conference set for 5/3/2023 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/20/2023) (ama)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Conway, Kevin)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jeffrey Rinde..(jgo)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CKR Law, LLP..(jgo)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kevin P. Conway. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Plaintiff code 2 (Citizen of Another State);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State);. (jgo)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Kevin P. Conway to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; all of the party names must be shown on the PDF case caption. If all of the party names do not fit, include 'et al'; the incorrect Citizenship Plaintiff code was selected under Citizenship of Principal Parties;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kevin P. Conway. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jeffrey A. Rinde, Esq.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Paradigm Holdings, Inc. for Silver Springs Development, Inc.; Other Affiliate Navcan.213, Inc., Other Affiliate Navcan.Colo, Inc. for NAVCAN.DC, Inc. (previously known as Cascade Divide Data Centers, Inc.); Other Affiliate 59 Turnpike Road, LLC, Other Affiliate Cape Ann Botanicals, LLC, Other Affiliate Old Planters of Cape Ann, Inc., Other Affiliate GGH ESM, LLC, Other Affiliate Cape Ann Blends, LLC, Other Affiliate Cape Ann Production, LLC for GGH, Inc.. Document filed by DACH Holdings, LLC, GGH, Inc., NAVCAN.DC, Inc. (previously known as Cascade Divide Data Centers, Inc.), Residencial de Chihuahua 2001, S.A. de C.V., Silver Springs Development, Inc., Silverstein Realty Group, Inc...(Conway, Kevin)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CKR Law, LLP, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by DACH Holdings, LLC, GGH, Inc., NAVCAN.DC, Inc. (previously known as Cascade Divide Data Centers, Inc.), Residencial de Chihuahua 2001, S.A. de C.V., Silver Springs Development, Inc., Silverstein Realty Group, Inc...(Conway, Kevin)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jeffrey Rinde, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by DACH Holdings, LLC, GGH, Inc., NAVCAN.DC, Inc. (previously known as Cascade Divide Data Centers, Inc.), Residencial de Chihuahua 2001, S.A. de C.V., Silver Springs Development, Inc., Silverstein Realty Group, Inc...(Conway, Kevin)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Conway, Kevin) Modified on 3/17/2023 (jgo).
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CKR Law, LLP, Jeffrey A. Rinde, Esq.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27479815)Document filed by Residencial de Chihuahua 2001, S.A. de C.V., Silver Springs Development, Inc., NAVCAN.DC, Inc. (previously known as Cascade Divide Data Centers, Inc.), Silverstein Realty Group, Inc., DACH Holdings, LLC, GGH, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - AAA Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - AAA Termination Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3A - Escrow Agreement, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3B - Escrow Agreement, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3C - Escrow Agreement, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3D - Escrow Agreement, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 3E - Escrow Agreement, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 3F - Escrow Agreement, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Assignment, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Post Hearing Memorandum, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - JAMS Award, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - 10/31/22 Letter, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - 11/8/22 Letter, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Suspension Order, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - 12/17/22 Letter, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - 12/19/22 Letter).(Conway, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NAVCAN.DC, Inc. et al v. Rinde et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAVCAN.DC, Inc. (previously known as Cascade Divide Data Centers, Inc.)
Represented By: Kevin P. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DACH Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Kevin P. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silverstein Realty Group, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin P. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silver Springs Development, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin P. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GGH, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin P. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Residencial de Chihuahua 2001, S.A. de C.V.
Represented By: Kevin P. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAVCAN.DC, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin P. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Rinde, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CKR Law, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Rinde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?