Federal Insurance Company et al v. Terra Worldwide Logistics LLC et al
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company and Indemnity Insurance Company of North America
Defendant: Terra Worldwide Logistics LLC, HMM Co., Ltd., Yang Ming Marine Transport Corporation and Ocean Network Express Pte Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2023cv02374
Filed: March 21, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Loretta A Preska
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1333 ad Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2023 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ocean Network Express Pte Ltd...(Donatelli, Randolph)
May 18, 2023 Filing 26 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Ocean Network Express Holdings, Ltd., Other Affiliate Nippon Yusen Kaisha, Other Affiliate Kawasaki Kisen Kaisha Ltd., Other Affiliate Mitsui O.S.K. Lines Ltd. for Ocean Network Express Pte Ltd.. Document filed by Ocean Network Express Pte Ltd...(Donatelli, Randolph)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER By Orders of Reference dated May 8, 2023 (23-CV-331, Dkt. No. 42; 23-CV-334, Dkt. No. 23; 23-CV-2374, Dkt. No. 24), Judge Preska referred these related cases to me for settlement. The parties are directed to advise the Court within 30 days when they wish to schedule the settlement conference. The parties should do so by filing a letter-motion on the docket that indicates at least three dates that are mutually convenient for the parties. Alternatively, counsel are free to e-mail my deputy clerk, David Tam, at David_Tam@nysd.uscourts.gov to find a mutually convenient date for the parties and the Court. The settlement conference will be in-person. All participants in the conference (attorneys, clients, and any interpreters) must comply with the Court's most recent COVID-19 Protocol (available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/covid-19-coronavirus). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 5/8/2023) (jca)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/8/2023) (tg)
May 4, 2023 Filing 23 STATUS REPORT. in response to March 24, 2023 Order #14 Document filed by Federal Insurance Company, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America..(Heilig, Justin)
April 28, 2023 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by HMM Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Sea Waybill).(Waid, Raymond)
April 28, 2023 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by HMM Co., Ltd...(Waid, Raymond)
April 10, 2023 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Terra Worldwide Logistics LLC waiver sent on 3/30/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. Document filed by Federal Insurance Company; Indemnity Insurance Company of North America..(Heilig, Justin)
April 7, 2023 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Yang Ming Marine Transport Corporation waiver sent on 3/30/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. Document filed by Federal Insurance Company; Indemnity Insurance Company of North America..(Heilig, Justin)
April 7, 2023 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Ocean Network Express Pte Ltd. waiver sent on 3/24/2023, answer due 5/23/2023. Document filed by Federal Insurance Company; Indemnity Insurance Company of North America..(Heilig, Justin)
April 7, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. HMM Co., Ltd. served on 3/28/2023, answer due 4/18/2023. Service was accepted by Seuong Kim, Paralegal. Document filed by Federal Insurance Company; Indemnity Insurance Company of North America..(Heilig, Justin)
April 6, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Yang Ming Marine Transport Corporation..(Wolfson, Garth)
April 6, 2023 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Yang Ming Marine Transport Corporation..(Wolfson, Garth)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. Counsel in the related cases (case nos. 23-CV-331, 23-CV-334, and 23-CV-2374) shall confer and inform the Court by letter no later than May 4, 2023, how they propose to proceed.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/24/23) (yv)
March 23, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
March 23, 2023 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
March 23, 2023 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:23-cv-00331-LAP. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba)
March 22, 2023 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to HMM Co., Ltd...(pc)
March 22, 2023 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yang Ming Marine Transport Corporation..(pc)
March 22, 2023 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Terra Worldwide Logistics LLC..(pc)
March 22, 2023 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ocean Network Express Pte Ltd...(pc)
March 22, 2023 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Loretta A. Preska as possibly related to 23cv331. (pc)
March 22, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
March 22, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc)
March 21, 2023 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ocean Network Express Pte Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Federal Insurance Company, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America..(Heilig, Justin)
March 21, 2023 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Yang Ming Marine Transport Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Federal Insurance Company, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America..(Heilig, Justin)
March 21, 2023 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HMM Co., Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Federal Insurance Company, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America..(Heilig, Justin)
March 21, 2023 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Terra Worldwide Logistics LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Federal Insurance Company, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America..(Heilig, Justin)
March 21, 2023 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 23-cv-331. Document filed by Federal Insurance Company, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America..(Heilig, Justin)
March 21, 2023 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent ACE American Insurance Company, Corporate Parent INA Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent INA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent INA Corporation for Indemnity Insurance Company of North America. Document filed by Indemnity Insurance Company of North America..(Heilig, Justin)
March 21, 2023 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings Inc. for Federal Insurance Company. Document filed by Federal Insurance Company..(Heilig, Justin)
March 21, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Heilig, Justin)
March 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HMM Co., Ltd., Ocean Network Express Pte Ltd., Terra Worldwide Logistics LLC, Yang Ming Marine Transport Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27495531)Document filed by Federal Insurance Company, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America..(Heilig, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Insurance Company et al v. Terra Worldwide Logistics LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Justin Matthew Heilig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indemnity Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Justin Matthew Heilig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terra Worldwide Logistics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMM Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Raymond Timothy Waid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yang Ming Marine Transport Corporation
Represented By: Garth S. Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Network Express Pte Ltd.
Represented By: Randolph H Donatelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?