HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC
Plaintiff: HDI Global Insurance Company
3Rd Party Plaintiff: SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: Chidori Ship Holding LLC, Jessica Ship Holding S.A., NYK Shipmanagement PTE LTD., Ocean Network Express PTE LTD. and M/V One Apus in rem
Case Number: 1:2023cv02915
Filed: April 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 1300 F.E.L.A. (DISCONTINUED AFTER 1/27/2014)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2023 Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. NYK Shipmanagement PTE LTD. waiver sent on 5/15/2023, answer due 7/14/2023. Document filed by Silver Birch GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter)
May 18, 2023 Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Jessica Ship Holding S.A. waiver sent on 5/15/2023, answer due 7/14/2023. Document filed by Silver Birch GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter)
May 18, 2023 Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Chidori Ship Holding LLC waiver sent on 5/15/2023, answer due 7/14/2023. Document filed by Silver Birch GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter)
May 18, 2023 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Ocean Network Express PTE LTD. waiver sent on 5/15/2023, answer due 7/14/2023. Document filed by Silver Birch GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter)
May 12, 2023 Filing 38 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jessica Ship Holding S.A...(pc)
May 12, 2023 Filing 37 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chidori Ship Holding LLC..(pc)
May 12, 2023 Filing 36 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ocean Network Express PTE LTD...(pc)
May 12, 2023 Filing 35 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to NYK Shipmanagement PTE LTD...(pc)
May 12, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Peter Skoufalos. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD., OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD, SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
May 11, 2023 Filing 34 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., re: #26 Amended Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter)
May 11, 2023 Filing 33 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD, re: #26 Amended Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter)
May 11, 2023 Filing 32 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD, re: #26 Amended Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter)
May 11, 2023 Filing 31 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, re: #26 Amended Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter)
May 10, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Peter Skoufalos to RE-FILE Document No. #30 Request for Issuance of Summons, #29 Request for Issuance of Summons, #28 Request for Issuance of Summons, #27 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
May 9, 2023 Filing 30 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., re: #26 Amended Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter) Modified on 5/10/2023 (jgo).
May 9, 2023 Filing 29 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD, re: #26 Amended Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter) Modified on 5/10/2023 (jgo).
May 9, 2023 Filing 28 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD, re: #26 Amended Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter) Modified on 5/10/2023 (jgo).
May 9, 2023 Filing 27 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, re: #26 Amended Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter) Modified on 5/10/2023 (jgo).
May 3, 2023 Filing 26 AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT amending #21 Amended Third Party Complaint, against CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., M/V One Apus in rem, NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD., OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD..Document filed by SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC. Related document: #21 Amended Third Party Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Answer).(Skoufalos, Peter)
May 3, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Peter Skoufalos to RE-FILE Document No. #22 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, #23 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, #25 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, #24 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
May 3, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Peter Skoufalos to RE-FILE Document No. #21 Amended Third Party Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): not all the party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Third Party Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
May 2, 2023 Filing 25 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD, re: #21 Amended Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter)
May 2, 2023 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD, re: #21 Amended Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter)
May 2, 2023 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., re: #21 Amended Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter)
May 2, 2023 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, re: #21 Amended Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter)
May 2, 2023 Filing 21 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT amending #12 Third Party Complaint against M/V One Apus in rem.Document filed by SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC. Related document: #12 Third Party Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Answer).(Skoufalos, Peter) Modified on 5/3/2023 (vf).
May 2, 2023 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD...(jgo)
May 2, 2023 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD...(jgo)
May 2, 2023 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A...(jgo)
May 2, 2023 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC..(jgo)
May 1, 2023 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD, re: #12 Third Party Complaint. Document filed by SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter)
May 1, 2023 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD, re: #12 Third Party Complaint. Document filed by SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter)
May 1, 2023 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., re: #12 Third Party Complaint. Document filed by SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter)
May 1, 2023 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, re: #12 Third Party Complaint. Document filed by SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter)
May 1, 2023 Filing 12 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against M/V One Apus in rem, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD., OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE LTD..Document filed by SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter)
April 28, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter)
April 27, 2023 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent BDP International Inc. for SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC. Document filed by SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter)
April 27, 2023 Document filed by SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC..(Skoufalos, Peter)
April 6, 2023 Filing 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number: 2:22-cv-05096. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received.
April 6, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vba)
April 6, 2023 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
April 6, 2023 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:22-md-03028-PAE. (vba)
April 6, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vba)
April 6, 2023 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-md-03028-PAE. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba)
March 31, 2023 Filing 8 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-3). Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 29 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of New York for the reasons set forth in the order of June 1, 2022, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Paul A. Englelmayer. (mbh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/6/2023.]
February 1, 2023 COPY OF DOC. NO. 7 HAS BEEN MAILED TO UNREP. (bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/6/2023.]
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH TO THE HONORABLE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/31/23. 1/31/23 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mbh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/6/2023.]
January 12, 2023 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Kelli Despot re: served Summons in a Civil Action Civil Cover Sheet, Case Management Track Designation Form, Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statements, Complaint in Admiralty, and Exhibits upon Nicole Grimme by Personal Service on 01/04/2023 (ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/6/2023.]
January 12, 2023 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jayson Young re: served Summons in a Civil Action Civil Cover Sheet, Case Management Track Designation Form, Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statements, Complaint in Admiralty, and Exhibits upon Gwen P. by Personal Service on 01/09/2023 (ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/6/2023.]
December 28, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILING OF NOTICE OF TAG-ALONG ACTION WITH JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTISTATE LITIGATION. (ERROR WITH FILING; INCORRECT CASE NUMBER ON PDF). (ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) Modified on 12/29/2022 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/6/2023.]
December 28, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE COMPANY re #1 Complaint (Attorney), Attorney Required Forms, Designation Form (ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/6/2023.]
December 22, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC. Forwarded To: counsel on 12/22/22. (mbh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/6/2023.]
December 22, 2022 Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file Designation Form in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. (sbt) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/6/2023.]
December 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HDI Global Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16389555.), filed by HDI Global Insurance Company.(ZACHARKOW, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/6/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HDI Global Insurance Company
Represented By: GEORGE R. ZACHARKOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: SILVER BIRCH GP, LLC
Represented By: Peter Skoufalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Chidori Ship Holding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Jessica Ship Holding S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: NYK Shipmanagement PTE LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Ocean Network Express PTE LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: M/V One Apus in rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?