Noel v. The City of New York et al
Plaintiff: gordon noel
Defendant: CITY OF NEW YORK, Correction Officers' Benevolent Association, Inc. and The City Of New York
Case Number: 1:2023cv03082
Filed: April 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2617 Family and Medical Leave Act of 1993
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John William Burns on behalf of Correction Officers' Benevolent Association, Inc...(Burns, John)
May 23, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Correction Officers' Benevolent Association, Inc. served on 5/11/2023, answer due 6/1/2023. Service was accepted by Lisa Jones, Receptionist. Document filed by Gordon Noel..(Ehrlich, David)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 5/11/2023) (tg)
May 11, 2023 Filing 10 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Karen K. Rhau dated May 11, 2023. Document filed by The City Of New York..(Rhau, Karen)
May 11, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen Rhau on behalf of The City Of New York..(Rhau, Karen)
May 11, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. The City Of New York served on 4/20/2023, answer due 5/11/2023. Service was accepted by Ariton Marke. Document filed by Gordon Noel..(Ehrlich, David)
May 11, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: The City Of New York answer due 7/17/2023. (tg)
April 14, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott William Clark on behalf of Gordon Noel..(Clark, Scott)
April 14, 2023 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The City Of New York. (vf)
April 14, 2023 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Correction Officers' Benevolent Association, Inc. (vf)
April 14, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Ross Ehrlich. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: CITY OF NEW YORK, gordon noel. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly. (vf)
April 14, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
April 14, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David Ross Ehrlich. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $10,000,000,000; County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 1,000,000; the County code has been modified to Queens. (vf)
April 14, 2023 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
April 14, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
April 13, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by gordon noel..(Ehrlich, David)
April 13, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Correction Officers' Benevolent Association, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by gordon noel..(Ehrlich, David)
April 13, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ehrlich, David)
April 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF NEW YORK, Correction Officers' Benevolent Association, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27602406)Document filed by gordon noel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request to be Excused from Duty).(Ehrlich, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noel v. The City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF NEW YORK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Officers' Benevolent Association, Inc.
Represented By: John William Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City Of New York
Represented By: Karen Rhau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: gordon noel
Represented By: David Ross Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?