Times v. Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jerald Times
Defendant: Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc., Heather Haley, Matthew Morales and LaMae deJongh
Case Number: 1:2023cv03229
Filed: April 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference re: #13 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Jerald Times..(Avallone, Rocco)
June 12, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/2/2023 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/12/2023) (kv)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Diane Windholz dated June 8, 2023., #1 Complaint,. Granted. Heather Haley(Sued in their Individual Capacity) answer due 7/17/2023; Heather Haley(Sued in their Official Capacity) answer due 7/17/2023; Matthew Morales(Sued in their Official Capacity) answer due 7/17/2023; Matthew Morales(Sued in their Individual Capacity) answer due 7/17/2023; Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc. answer due 7/17/2023; LaMae deJongh(Sued in their Individual Capacity) answer due 7/17/2023; LaMae deJongh(Sued in their Official Capacity) answer due 7/17/2023. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/9/2023) (tg)
June 8, 2023 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Diane Windholz dated June 8, 2023. Document filed by Heather Haley(Sued in their Individual Capacity), Matthew Morales(Sued in their Official Capacity), Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc., LaMae deJongh(Sued in their Individual Capacity). Return Date set for 7/17/2023 at 05:00 PM..(Windholz, Diane)
May 1, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Matthew Morales(Sued in their Official Capacity) waiver sent on 4/25/2023, answer due 6/26/2023; Matthew Morales(Sued in their Individual Capacity) waiver sent on 4/25/2023, answer due 6/26/2023. Document filed by Matthew Morales(Sued in their Official Capacity); Matthew Morales(Sued in their Individual Capacity)..(Windholz, Diane)
May 1, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Heather Haley(Sued in their Individual Capacity) waiver sent on 4/25/2023, answer due 6/26/2023; Heather Haley(Sued in their Official Capacity) waiver sent on 4/25/2023, answer due 6/26/2023. Document filed by Heather Haley(Sued in their Individual Capacity); Heather Haley(Sued in their Official Capacity)..(Windholz, Diane)
May 1, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. LaMae deJongh(Sued in their Individual Capacity) waiver sent on 4/25/2023, answer due 6/26/2023; LaMae deJongh(Sued in their Official Capacity) waiver sent on 4/25/2023, answer due 6/26/2023. Document filed by LaMae deJongh(Sued in their Individual Capacity); LaMae deJongh(Sued in their Official Capacity)..(Windholz, Diane)
May 1, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc. waiver sent on 4/25/2023, answer due 6/26/2023. Document filed by Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc...(Windholz, Diane)
May 1, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura Victorelli on behalf of Heather Haley(Sued in their Individual Capacity), Heather Haley(Sued in their Official Capacity), Matthew Morales(Sued in their Official Capacity), Matthew Morales(Sued in their Individual Capacity), Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc., LaMae deJongh(Sued in their Individual Capacity), LaMae deJongh(Sued in their Official Capacity)..(Victorelli, Laura)
May 1, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Diane Windholz on behalf of Heather Haley(Sued in their Individual Capacity), Heather Haley(Sued in their Official Capacity), Matthew Morales(Sued in their Official Capacity), Matthew Morales(Sued in their Individual Capacity), Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc., LaMae deJongh(Sued in their Individual Capacity), LaMae deJongh(Sued in their Official Capacity)..(Windholz, Diane)
April 19, 2023 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Heather Haley(Sued in their Individual Capacity), Heather Haley(Sued in their Official Capacity), Matthew Morales(Sued in their Official Capacity), Matthew Morales(Sued in their Individual Capacity), Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc., LaMae deJongh(Sued in their Individual Capacity), LaMae deJongh(Sued in their Official Capacity)..(jgo)
April 19, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Rocco G Avallone. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $8,000,000,000; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $8,000,000; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
April 19, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
April 19, 2023 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
April 19, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
April 18, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc., Heather Haley, Matthew Morales, LaMae deJongh, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jerald Times..(Avallone, Rocco)
April 18, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Avallone, Rocco)
April 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Heather Haley(Sued in their Individual Capacity), Heather Haley(Sued in their Official Capacity), Matthew Morales(Sued in their Official Capacity), Matthew Morales(Sued in their Individual Capacity), Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc., LaMae deJongh(Sued in their Individual Capacity), LaMae deJongh(Sued in their Official Capacity). (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27623444)Document filed by Jerald Times..(Avallone, Rocco)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Times v. Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerald Times
Represented By: Rocco G Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc.
Represented By: Diane Windholz
Represented By: Laura Victorelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Haley
Represented By: Diane Windholz
Represented By: Laura Victorelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Morales
Represented By: Diane Windholz
Represented By: Laura Victorelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaMae deJongh
Represented By: Diane Windholz
Represented By: Laura Victorelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?