Crichlow v. Dinello et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Crichlow
Defendant: David Dinello, Kristin Salotti, NP, David Rosner, Jayson Perez, Ann Andola, MD, DR. Mikhail Gusman, Gerald Ortega, Kristin Salotti, Ann Andola and Mikhail Gusman
Case Number: 1:2023cv03386
Filed: April 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Loretta A Preska
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2023 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kristin Salotti. (vf)
May 22, 2023 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Rosner. (vf)
May 22, 2023 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jayson Perez. (vf)
May 22, 2023 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gerald Ortega. (vf)
May 22, 2023 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mikhail Gusman. (vf)
May 22, 2023 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Dinello. (vf)
May 22, 2023 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ann Andola. (vf)
May 19, 2023 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kristin Salotti, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kevin Crichlow..(Agnew, Amy)
May 19, 2023 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Rosner, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kevin Crichlow..(Agnew, Amy)
May 19, 2023 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jayson Perez, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kevin Crichlow..(Agnew, Amy)
May 19, 2023 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gerald Ortega, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kevin Crichlow..(Agnew, Amy)
May 19, 2023 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mikhail Gusman, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kevin Crichlow..(Agnew, Amy)
May 19, 2023 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Dinello, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kevin Crichlow..(Agnew, Amy)
May 19, 2023 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ann Andola, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kevin Crichlow..(Agnew, Amy)
April 25, 2023 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Agnew, Amy)
April 25, 2023 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea)
April 25, 2023 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-08173-LAP. Notice of Assignment to follow. (aea)
April 25, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(aea)
April 24, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Amy Jane Agnew to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; Jury Demand code was not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
April 24, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
April 24, 2023 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Loretta A. Preska as possibly related to 19-cv-8173. (jgo)
April 24, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
April 21, 2023 Filing 3 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of A.J. Agnew re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-8173(LAP). Document filed by Kevin Crichlow..(Agnew, Amy)
April 21, 2023 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Agnew, Amy) Modified on 4/24/2023 (jgo).
April 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ann Andola, MD, David Dinello, Mikhail Gusman, Gerald Ortega, Jayson Perez, David Rosner, Kristin Salotti, NP. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27642228)Document filed by Kevin Crichlow..(Agnew, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crichlow v. Dinello et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Crichlow
Represented By: Amy Jane Agnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Dinello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin Salotti, NP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayson Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Andola, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. Mikhail Gusman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin Salotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Andola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikhail Gusman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?