Madison v. Ruiz et al
Plaintiff: Donald Madison
Defendant: Veronica Ruiz, Ashley Baker-Harris, DR. Mikhail Gusman and Mikhail Gusman
Case Number: 1:2023cv03438
Filed: April 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Loretta A Preska
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(aea)
April 28, 2023 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-08173-LAP. Notice of Assignment to follow. (aea)
April 28, 2023 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea)
April 27, 2023 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Veronica Ruiz. (vf)
April 27, 2023 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ashley Baker-Harris. (vf)
April 27, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mikhail Gusman. (vf)
April 26, 2023 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Veronica Ruiz, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Donald Madison..(Agnew, Amy)
April 26, 2023 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ashley Harris-Baker, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Donald Madison..(Agnew, Amy)
April 26, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mikhail Gusman, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Donald Madison..(Agnew, Amy)
April 26, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc)
April 26, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 26, 2023 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Loretta A. Preska as possibly related to 19cv8173. (pc)
April 25, 2023 Filing 3 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of A. J. Agnew re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-8173(LAP). Document filed by Donald Madison..(Agnew, Amy)
April 25, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Agnew, Amy)
April 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ashley Baker-Harris, Mikhail Gusman, Veronica Ruiz. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27652274)Document filed by Donald Madison..(Agnew, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madison v. Ruiz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Madison
Represented By: Amy Jane Agnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Baker-Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. Mikhail Gusman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikhail Gusman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?