Murchinson Ltd. et al v. Nano Dimension Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Murchinson Ltd., EOM Management LTD., Nomis Bay Ltd. and BPY Limited
Defendant: Nano Dimension Ltd., Yoav Stern, Amit Dror, Simon Anthony-Fried, Channa Caspi, Oded Gera, Yoav Nissan-Cohen, Igal Rotem, Roni Kleinfeld and J. Christopher Moran
Case Number: 1:2023cv03658
Filed: May 1, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Rochon
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 02 U.S.C. § 138 Library of Congress Access
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2023 Filing 49 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Notice of the Initial Pretrial Conference, Statement of Relatedness, Rule 7.1 Statement, JLR Rochon Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, ECF Rules April 24, 2023, Edition, Stipulation and Order filed on June 1, 2023 mailed to DEFENDANT Igal Rotem, Fintaro, Beit Maskit, 25 Maskit St. POB 12286, Herziliya, 4673325, Israel on 6/9/2023 by Federal Express tracking # 7723 6247 1925, to the individual of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of FRCP 4(f)2(c)(ii).(amf)
June 9, 2023 Filing 48 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Notice of the Initial Pretrial Conference, Statement of Relatedness, Rule 7.1 Statement, JLR Rochon Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, ECF Rules April 24, 2023, Edition, Stipulation and Order filed on June 1, 2023 mailed to DEFENDANT Simon Anthony-Fried, 26 Ve'idat Katowits Steet, Ground Floor, Tel-Aviv, 6230428, Israel on 6/9/2023 by Federal Express tracking # 7723 6282 0281, to the individual of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of FRCP 4(f)2(c)(ii).(amf)
June 9, 2023 Filing 47 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Notice of the Initial Pretrial Conference, Statement of Relatedness, Rule 7.1 Statement, JLR Rochon Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, ECF Rules April 24, 2023, Edition, Stipulation and Order filed on June 1, 2023 mailed to DEFENDANT Channa Caspi, 14 Mevoh Estrog, Neve Monson, Yehud, 5640603, Israel on 6/9/2023 by Federal Express tracking # 7723 6256 9181, to the individual of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of FRCP 4(f)2(c)(ii).(amf)
June 9, 2023 Filing 46 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Notice of the Initial Pretrial Conference, Statement of Relatedness, Rule 7.1 Statement, JLR Rochon Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, ECF Rules April 24, 2023, Edition, Stipulation and Order filed on June 1, 2023 mailed to DEFENDANT Yoav Nissan-Cohen, 15 Hanofar Street, Mishmar David, 7684100, Isreal on 6/9/2023 by Federal Express tracking # 7723 6306 7994, to the individual of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of FRCP 4(f)2(c)(ii).(ehn)
June 9, 2023 Filing 45 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Notice of the Initial Pretrial Conference, Statement of Relatedness, Rule 7.1 Statement, JLR Rochon Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, ECF Rules April 24, 2023, Edition, Stipulation and Order filed on June 1, 2023 mailed to DEFENDANT Ron Kleinfeld, 39/4 HaMesilah Street, Herzliya, 4658044, Isreal on 6/9/2023 by Federal Express tracking # 7723 6269 2160, to the individual of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of FRCP 4(f)2(c)(ii).(ehn)
June 9, 2023 Filing 44 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Notice of the Initial Pretrial Conference, Statement of Relatedness, Rule 7.1 Statement, JLR Rochon Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, ECF Rules April 24, 2023, Edition, Stipulation and Order filed on June 1, 2023 mailed to DEFENDANT Amit Dror, 12/11 Remez Street, Tel Aviv Yafo 6219116, Isreal on 6/9/2023 by Federal Express tracking # 7723 6293 9650, to the individual of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of FRCP 4(f)2(c)(ii).(ehn) (Main Document 44 replaced on 6/9/2023) (ehn). Modified on 6/9/2023 (ehn). (Main Document 44 replaced on 6/9/2023) (ehn).
June 9, 2023 Filing 43 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Notice of the Initial Pretrial Conference, Statement of Relatedness, Rule 7.1 Statement, JLR Rochon Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, ECF Rules April 24, 2023, Edition, Stipulation and Order filed on June 1, 2023 mailed to DEFENDANT Oded Gera, House Number 41, Kefar Vitkin, 402000, Isreal, on 6/9/2023 by Federal Express tracking # 7723 6240 0495, to the individual of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of FRCP 4(f)2(c)(ii).(ehn) Modified on 6/9/2023 (ehn). (Main Document 43 replaced on 6/9/2023) (ehn). Modified on 6/9/2023 (ehn). (Main Document 43 replaced on 6/9/2023) (ehn).
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned parties, that: 1. Defendants Yoav Stern and Christopher Moran will not contest the validity of service. 2. The deadline for Nano, Mr. Stern, and Mr. Moran to file an answer or motion in response to the Complaint shall be extended to August 9, 2023. 3. This stipulation may be executed in counterparts via email or by /s/ signature of an authorized party, each of which shall be deemed an original for all purposes. In light of this extension, the initial pretrial conference is hereby adjourned to August 17, 2023 at 12 p.m. SO ORDERED. J. Christopher Moran answer due 8/9/2023; Nano Dimension Ltd. answer due 8/9/2023; Yoav Stern answer due 8/9/2023. (Initial Conference set for 8/17/2023 at 12:00 PM before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon.), Motions terminated: #41 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 6/1/2023) (jca)
May 31, 2023 Filing 41 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Jonathan Kortmansky dated May 31, 2023. Document filed by J. Christopher Moran, Nano Dimension Ltd., Yoav Stern. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order)).(Kortmansky, Jonathan)
May 31, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan G. Kortmansky on behalf of J. Christopher Moran, Yoav Stern..(Kortmansky, Jonathan)
May 31, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa Rae Ginsberg on behalf of J. Christopher Moran, Yoav Stern..(Ginsberg, Melissa)
May 31, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonas Noah Hagey on behalf of J. Christopher Moran, Yoav Stern..(Hagey, Jonas)
May 24, 2023 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. J. Christopher Moran served on 5/12/2023, answer due 6/2/2023. Service was accepted by John Doe/Security. Document filed by Nomis Bay Ltd.; EOM Management LTD.; BPY Limited; Murchinson Ltd...(Farahati, Sahand)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned parties, through their respective counsel, that: 1. The deadline for Nano to file an answer or motion in response to the Complaint shall be extended to July 14, 2023. 2. This stipulation may be executed in counterparts via email or by /s/ signature of an authorized party, each of which shall be deemed an original for all purposes. SO STIPULATED AND AGREED. SO ORDERED. Nano Dimension Ltd. answer due 7/14/2023., Motions terminated: #33 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Jonathan Kortmansky dated May 19, 2023. filed by Nano Dimension Ltd.. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 5/22/2023) (jca)
May 19, 2023 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Yoav Stern served on 5/12/2023, answer due 6/2/2023. Document filed by Nomis Bay Ltd.; EOM Management LTD.; BPY Limited; Murchinson Ltd...(Farahati, Sahand)
May 19, 2023 Filing 34 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Nano Dimension Ltd...(Kortmansky, Jonathan)
May 19, 2023 Filing 33 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Jonathan Kortmansky dated May 19, 2023. Document filed by Nano Dimension Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order)).(Kortmansky, Jonathan)
May 19, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan G. Kortmansky on behalf of Nano Dimension Ltd...(Kortmansky, Jonathan)
May 19, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa Rae Ginsberg on behalf of Nano Dimension Ltd...(Ginsberg, Melissa)
May 19, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonas Noah Hagey on behalf of Nano Dimension Ltd...(Hagey, Jonas)
May 17, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sahand Farahati on behalf of BPY Limited, EOM Management LTD., Murchinson Ltd., Nomis Bay Ltd...(Farahati, Sahand)
May 17, 2023 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Nano Dimension Ltd. served on 5/15/2023, answer due 6/5/2023. Service was accepted by Melissa Ginsberg, Agent. Service was made by Mail/eMail. Document filed by Nomis Bay Ltd.; EOM Management LTD.; BPY Limited; Murchinson Ltd...(Farahati, Sahand)
May 10, 2023 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Igal Rotem..(pc)
May 10, 2023 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Oded Gera..(pc)
May 10, 2023 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yoav Nissan-Cohen..(pc)
May 10, 2023 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Simon Anthony-Fried..(pc)
May 10, 2023 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to J. Christopher Moran..(pc)
May 10, 2023 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Roni Kleinfeld..(pc)
May 10, 2023 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Channa Caspi..(pc)
May 9, 2023 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Roni Kleinfeld, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by BPY Limited, EOM Management LTD., Murchinson Ltd., Nomis Bay Ltd...(Farahati, Sahand)
May 9, 2023 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Oded Gera, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by BPY Limited, EOM Management LTD., Murchinson Ltd., Nomis Bay Ltd...(Farahati, Sahand)
May 9, 2023 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to J. Christopher Moran, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by BPY Limited, EOM Management LTD., Murchinson Ltd., Nomis Bay Ltd...(Farahati, Sahand)
May 9, 2023 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Igal Rotem, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by BPY Limited, EOM Management LTD., Murchinson Ltd., Nomis Bay Ltd...(Farahati, Sahand)
May 9, 2023 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Channa Caspi, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by BPY Limited, EOM Management LTD., Murchinson Ltd., Nomis Bay Ltd...(Farahati, Sahand)
May 9, 2023 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Yoav Nissan-Cohen, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by BPY Limited, EOM Management LTD., Murchinson Ltd., Nomis Bay Ltd...(Farahati, Sahand)
May 9, 2023 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Simon Anthony-Fried, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by BPY Limited, EOM Management LTD., Murchinson Ltd., Nomis Bay Ltd...(Farahati, Sahand)
May 9, 2023 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sahand Farahati on behalf of BPY Limited, EOM Management LTD., Murchinson Ltd., Nomis Bay Ltd...(Farahati, Sahand) Modified on 5/17/2023 (kj). As Per Email Dated 5/17/2023 12:12 PM -
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Initial Conference set for 8/2/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 5/8/2023) (jca)
May 5, 2023 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
May 5, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
May 5, 2023 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:23-cv-02566-JLR. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba)
May 2, 2023 Filing 11 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 23-cv-02566. Document filed by BPY Limited, EOM Management LTD., Murchinson Ltd., Nomis Bay Ltd...(Ward, Adrienne)
May 2, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adrienne Marie Ward on behalf of BPY Limited, EOM Management LTD., Murchinson Ltd., Nomis Bay Ltd...(Ward, Adrienne)
May 2, 2023 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nano Dimension Ltd.. (vf)
May 2, 2023 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yoav Stern. (vf)
May 2, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amit Dror. (vf)
May 2, 2023 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Jennifer L. Rochon as possibly related to 1:23-cv-2566. (vf)
May 2, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
May 2, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (vf)
May 2, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Thomas James Fleming. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 02:138 Library of Congress Access; County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S. (vf)
May 2, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Thomas James Fleming, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
May 1, 2023 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nano Dimension Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by BPY Limited, EOM Management LTD., Murchinson Ltd., Nomis Bay Ltd...(Fleming, Thomas)
May 1, 2023 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Yoav Stern, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by BPY Limited, EOM Management LTD., Murchinson Ltd., Nomis Bay Ltd...(Fleming, Thomas)
May 1, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amit Dror, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by BPY Limited, EOM Management LTD., Murchinson Ltd., Nomis Bay Ltd...(Fleming, Thomas)
May 1, 2023 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by BPY Limited, EOM Management LTD., Murchinson Ltd., Nomis Bay Ltd...(Fleming, Thomas)
May 1, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fleming, Thomas) Modified on 5/2/2023 (vf). Modified on 5/2/2023 (jgo).
May 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Simon Anthony-Fried, Channa Caspi, Amit Dror, Oded Gera, Roni Kleinfeld, J. Christopher Moran, Nano Dimension Ltd., Yoav Nissan-Cohen, Igal Rotem, Yoav Stern. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27681907)Document filed by Nomis Bay Ltd., EOM Management LTD., BPY Limited, Murchinson Ltd...(Fleming, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murchinson Ltd. et al v. Nano Dimension Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murchinson Ltd.
Represented By: Thomas James Fleming
Represented By: Adrienne Marie Ward
Represented By: Sahand Farahati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EOM Management LTD.
Represented By: Thomas James Fleming
Represented By: Sahand Farahati
Represented By: Adrienne Marie Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nomis Bay Ltd.
Represented By: Thomas James Fleming
Represented By: Adrienne Marie Ward
Represented By: Sahand Farahati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BPY Limited
Represented By: Thomas James Fleming
Represented By: Adrienne Marie Ward
Represented By: Sahand Farahati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nano Dimension Ltd.
Represented By: Jonas Noah Hagey
Represented By: Jonathan G. Kortmansky
Represented By: Melissa Rae Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yoav Stern
Represented By: Melissa Rae Ginsberg
Represented By: Jonas Noah Hagey
Represented By: Jonathan G. Kortmansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amit Dror
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Anthony-Fried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Channa Caspi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oded Gera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yoav Nissan-Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Igal Rotem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roni Kleinfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Christopher Moran
Represented By: Jonathan G. Kortmansky
Represented By: Melissa Rae Ginsberg
Represented By: Jonas Noah Hagey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?