Vallesillo v. Premiumcapitalfund.com
Plaintiff: Alejandro Vallesillo
Defendant: Premiumcaptitalfund.com and P.O. "John" Doe
Case Number: 1:2023cv03841
Filed: May 8, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Telephone Consumer Protection Act (TCPA)
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2023 Filing 16 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Nebraska; Case Number: 8:23-cv-00006. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received.
May 8, 2023 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions..(tro)
May 8, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (tro)
May 8, 2023 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (tro)
May 8, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr.. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(tro)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Defendant Premiumcapitalfund.com's unopposed Motion for Venue Transfer (Filing No. 10) is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (TCL) [Transferred from Nebraska on 5/8/2023.]
May 1, 2023 Filing 14 STATEMENT regarding: MOTION to Change Venue #10 Plaintiff's Statement of Non-Opposition by Attorney Mark L. Javitch on behalf of Plaintiff Alejandro Vallesillo.(Javitch, Mark) [Transferred from Nebraska on 5/8/2023.]
April 10, 2023 Filing 13 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Adam R. Gonnelli has not registered for admittance to practice registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (MLF) [Transferred from Nebraska on 5/8/2023.]
April 10, 2023 Filing 12 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING Brief #11 . This filing does not contain a Certificate of Compliance as required by NECivR 7.1(d)(3). This notice is for your information for future filings.(MLF) [Transferred from Nebraska on 5/8/2023.]
April 10, 2023 Filing 11 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Change Venue #10 by Attorney Minja Herian on behalf of Defendant Premiumcaptitalfund.com.(Herian, Minja) [Transferred from Nebraska on 5/8/2023.]
April 10, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Change Venue by Attorney Minja Herian on behalf of Defendant Premiumcaptitalfund.com.(Herian, Minja) [Transferred from Nebraska on 5/8/2023.]
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Stipulation Regarding Motion to Transfer. Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue shall be filed by April 10, 2023. Plaintiff's brief in opposition to the Motion shall be filed by May 1, 2023. Defendant shall submit its reply brief by May 22, 2023. Defendant's responsive pleading is due thirty days after the ruling on the Motion to Transfer. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH) [Transferred from Nebraska on 5/8/2023.]
April 7, 2023 Filing 8 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Premiumcaptitalfund.com. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(MLF) [Transferred from Nebraska on 5/8/2023.]
April 7, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Minja Herian on behalf of Defendant Premiumcaptitalfund.com (Herian, Minja) [Transferred from Nebraska on 5/8/2023.]
April 7, 2023 Filing 6 JOINT STIPULATION to set modified briefing schedule on Defendant's motion to transfer venue by Attorney Mark L. Javitch on behalf of Plaintiff Alejandro Vallesillo.(Javitch, Mark) [Transferred from Nebraska on 5/8/2023.]
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by April 10, 2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH) [Transferred from Nebraska on 5/8/2023.]
February 28, 2023 Filing 4 JOINT STIPULATION to extend Defendant's deadline to respond to the complaint for 30 days to April 10, 2023 by Attorney Mark L. Javitch on behalf of Plaintiff Alejandro Vallesillo.(Javitch, Mark) [Transferred from Nebraska on 5/8/2023.]
January 10, 2023 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Premiumcaptitalfund.com. Waiver sent on 1/9/2023. (Javitch, Mark) [Transferred from Nebraska on 5/8/2023.]
January 5, 2023 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JES) [Transferred from Nebraska on 5/8/2023.]
January 4, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against PREMIUMCAPITALFUND.COM ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4779305), by Attorney Mark L. Javitch on behalf of Alejandro Vallesillo (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Javitch, Mark) [Transferred from Nebraska on 5/8/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vallesillo v. Premiumcapitalfund.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Vallesillo
Represented By: Mark L. Javitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premiumcaptitalfund.com
Represented By: Adam R. Gonnelli
Represented By: Minja Herian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O. "John" Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?