Safavieh Intl LLC v. Chengdu Junsen Fengrui Technology Co, Ltd.-Tao Shen et al
Plaintiff: Safavieh Intl LLC
Defendant: Chengdu Junsen Fengrui Technology Co, Ltd.-Tao Shen and Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2023cv03960
Filed: May 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE: This constitutes the decision and order of the court. It is a written opinion. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at Docket Number 10. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/13/2023) (tg)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #10 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (nd)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #10 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief for alternate service by email. Document filed by Safavieh Intl LLC..(Kaufman, Mark)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Bjorn Tuazon in Support re: #10 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief. Document filed by Safavieh Intl LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amazon Order for infringing rugs, #2 Exhibit 2 - Photos of infringing rugs).(Kaufman, Mark)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIRMATION of Mark S. Kaufman in Support re: #10 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief. Document filed by Safavieh Intl LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amazon-Chengdu Junsen email, consent to jurisdiction, #2 Exhibit 2 - HCCH article re service of process in China, #3 Exhibit 3 - Hague Law Blog re service of process in China, #4 Exhibit 4 - Catch Me If You Can article re service of process in China).(Kaufman, Mark)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Safavieh Intl LLC. Related Document Number: #1 ..(Kaufman, Mark) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This action having been assigned to me for all purposes, it is hereby, ORDERED as follows: If a conforming case management plan is submitted at least two business days prior to the scheduled initial conference and subsequently approved by the Court, the initial conference will be canceled automatically. If a motion has been filed either before or after the case management plan is approved, and the parties desire a conference, a letter must be submitted to the Court via ECF specifically asking that the initial conference not be canceled. If the parties fail to agree upon such a plan or fail to submit the plan to the Court within the time provided (at least two business days before the conference date), the parties must participate in a telephone conference on 9/14/2023 at 11:15 a.m. Parties should dial in at 1(888)363-4749, access code (9054506) to join the conference. Initial Conference set for 9/14/2023 at 11:15 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/17/2023) (rro)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(pc)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Mark S. Kaufman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: DOES 1-10. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Kaufman, Mark)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chengdu Junsen Fengrui Technology Co, Ltd.-Tao Shen. (vf)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents DOES 1-10 added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Safavieh Intl LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Kaufman, Mark)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT COPYRIGHT FORM. Notice to Attorney Mark S. Kaufman to RE-FILE Document No. #5 AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the AO 121 Copyright form is not correct. Do not use the instructional form. Re-file the document using the event type AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct AO 121 Copyright PDF form. (vf)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Mark S. Kaufman re: Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add party Does 1-10. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (vf)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Kaufman, Mark) Modified on 5/12/2023 (vf).
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Safavieh Intl LLC..(Kaufman, Mark)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CHENGDU JUNSEN FENGRUI TECHNOLOGY CO, LTD.-TAO SHEN, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Safavieh Intl LLC..(Kaufman, Mark)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kaufman, Mark)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chengdu Junsen Fengrui Technology Co, Ltd.-Tao Shen. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27728837)Document filed by Safavieh Intl LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Photo of Safavieh's MNC222, #2 Exhibit B - Photo of Safavieh's MNC243, #3 Exhibit C - Photo of D's Bohemian Medallion Area Rug, #4 Exhibit D - Photo of D's Runner, #5 Exhibit E - ASINs of Infringing Designs).(Kaufman, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safavieh Intl LLC v. Chengdu Junsen Fengrui Technology Co, Ltd.-Tao Shen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safavieh Intl LLC
Represented By: Mark S. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chengdu Junsen Fengrui Technology Co, Ltd.-Tao Shen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?