Board of Trustees of the 1199SEIU Greater New York Pension Fund v. McPherson et al
Interpleader: Board of Trustees of the 1199SEIU Greater New York Pension Fund, Jahshawna McPherson and Jacinth Harding
Case Number: 1:2023cv04041
Filed: May 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1002 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2023 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Jacinth Harding served on 6/27/2023, answer due 7/18/2023. Service was accepted by JACINTH HARDING. Document filed by Board of Trustees of the 1199SEIU Greater New York Pension Fund..(Weinberger, Ian)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 8/14/2023 at 12:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 7/5/2023) (jca)
May 22, 2023 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jahshawna McPherson..(pc)
May 22, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jacinth Harding..(pc)
May 19, 2023 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jacinth Harding, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Board of Trustees of the 1199SEIU Greater New York Pension Fund..(Weinberger, Ian)
May 19, 2023 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jahshawna McPherson, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Board of Trustees of the 1199SEIU Greater New York Pension Fund..(Weinberger, Ian)
May 19, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Ian Andrew Weinberger to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party name on the PDF case caption and the PDF 'To' section must match exactly as it appears on the pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
May 18, 2023 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jacinth Harding, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Board of Trustees of the 1199SEIU Greater New York Pension Fund..(Weinberger, Ian) Modified on 5/19/2023 (jgo).
May 18, 2023 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jahshawna McPherson, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Board of Trustees of the 1199SEIU Greater New York Pension Fund..(Weinberger, Ian) Modified on 5/19/2023 (jgo).
May 16, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ian Andrew Weinberger. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jacinth Harding, Jahshawna McPherson, Board of Trustees of the 1199SEIU Greater New York Pension Fund. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (vf)
May 16, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ian Andrew Weinberger. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1331 Fed. Question: Other; County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:1002 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement; the County code has been modified to New York. (vf)
May 16, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
May 16, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
May 16, 2023 Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
May 15, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Weinberger, Ian)
May 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jacinth Harding, Jahshawna McPherson. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27742345)Document filed by Board of Trustees of the 1199SEIU Greater New York Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A: SPD and Plan, #2 Exhibit Ex. B: Daughter's Beneficiary Form, #3 Exhibit Ex. C: Niece's Beneficiary Form, #4 Exhibit Ex. D: June 2020 Letter, #5 Exhibit Ex. E: August Letter, #6 Exhibit Ex. F: Email From Daughter, #7 Exhibit Ex. G: November 2022 Letter, #8 Exhibit Ex. H: December 2022 Letter, #9 Exhibit Ex. I: January 2023 Letter, #10 Exhibit Ex. J: March 2023 Letter, #11 Exhibit Ex. K: March 2023 Letter, #12 Exhibit Ex. L: April 2023 Letter).(Weinberger, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the 1199SEIU Greater New York Pension Fund v. McPherson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: Board of Trustees of the 1199SEIU Greater New York Pension Fund
Represented By: Ian Andrew Weinberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: Jahshawna McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: Jacinth Harding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?