Cromitie v. KNS International LLC
Plaintiff: Seana Cromitie
Defendant: KNS International LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv04140
Filed: May 18, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Sean J. Kirby dated June 13, 2023., #1 Complaint. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. KNS International LLC answer due 7/17/2023. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 6/14/2023) (tg)
June 13, 2023 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Sean J. Kirby dated June 13, 2023. Document filed by KNS International LLC..(Kirby, Sean)
June 2, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. KNS International LLC served on 5/25/2023, answer due 6/15/2023. Document filed by Seana Cromitie..(Rozenberg, Mark)
May 19, 2023 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to KNS International LLC..(gp)
May 19, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
May 19, 2023 Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
May 19, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
May 18, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to KNS International LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Seana Cromitie..(Rozenberg, Mark)
May 18, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rozenberg, Mark)
May 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KNS International LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27759855)Document filed by Seana Cromitie..(Rozenberg, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cromitie v. KNS International LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seana Cromitie
Represented By: Mark Rozenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KNS International LLC
Represented By: Sean Joseph Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?