Burgess v. The New School University et al
Plaintiff: /S/M, ska Martha Holloway Burgess and M. Holloway Burgess
Defendant: The New School University, Katherine Wolkoff, Rachel Schrieber, Rhonnie Yaus, Arlene De La Rosa, Jennifer Penley, Dwight A. McBride, Renee T. White, Sonya Williams, Sarah Bogucki, Shana Agid, Kate Evanishyn and Yasamin Yasi Ghanbari
Case Number: 1:2023cv04944
Filed: June 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Conference re: #10 LETTER MOTION for Conference for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from The New School dated 08/09/2023. The parties are directed to appear, by phone, for a pre-motion conference on Tuesday, September 12, 2023, at 11:00 a.m. Dial-in: 888-363-4749, with access code 8140049. The time to answer or respond to the complaint is stayed pending the conference. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se plaintiff and to note such mailing on the docket. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 9/12/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge John G. Koeltl.. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/9/2023) (kv)
August 9, 2023 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Conference for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from The New School dated 08/09/2023. Document filed by The New School University..(Shmil, Stefanie)
August 9, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stefanie Lynn Shmil on behalf of The New School University..(Shmil, Stefanie)
August 9, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nancy V. Wright on behalf of The New School University..(Wright, Nancy)
July 31, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Yasamin Yasi Ghanbari(Sheriff's Certificate of Attempted Service). Attempted Service of Summons and Complaint. Service was attempted on 7/21/23. Document filed by M. Holloway Burgess. (sc) Modified on 8/2/2023 (sc).
July 31, 2023 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sgz)
July 31, 2023 AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yasamin Yasi Ghanbari.(vn)
July 31, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John G. Koeltl. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sgz)
July 13, 2023 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT,Re: amending #1 Complaint, against Shana Agid, Sarah Bogucki, Arlene De La Rosa, Kate Evanishyn, Yasamin Yasi Ghanbari, Dwight A. McBride, Jennifer Penley, Rachel Schrieber, The New School University, Renee T. White, Sonya Williams, Katherine Wolkoff, Rhonnie Yaus.Document filed by M. Holloway Burgess. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5).(sc)
June 30, 2023 Filing 4 LETTER from M. Burgess dated 6/30/23 re: "RESTRICT ORIGINAL COMPLAINt"- I am requesting access to my original complaint restricted, because I amended the Complaint with my preferred name etc. Document filed by M. Holloway Burgess.(sc)
June 30, 2023 Filing 3 PRO SE MEMORANDUM, dated 6/30/23 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for M. Holloway Burgess. New Address: 119 West 27th St., #5N, New York, NY, 10001. (sc)
June 30, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shana Agid, Sarah Bogucki, Arlene De La Rosa, Kate Evanishyn, Yasamin Yasi Ghanbari, Dwight A. McBride, Jennifer Penley, Rachel Schrieber, The New School University, Renee T. White, Sonya Williams, Katherine Wolkoff, Rhonnie Yaus. (kh)
June 26, 2023 Pro Se Payment of Fee Processed: $402.00 Check processed by the Finance Department on 6/23/2023, Receipt Number 17835. (amf)
June 22, 2023 Filing 2 LETTER from m Burgess, dated 6/22/23 re: In reference to case # 1:23cv04944 Intake form titled, 06/12/23 mBurgess Employment Discrimination pdf, I request that my name read, "m Burgess" or "m Holloway Burgess." The Pro Se Clerk advised that I simply request that the name on the form be the name I am called by, rather than my full legal name. Document filed by m Holloway Burgess.(sc) Modified on 6/23/2023 (sc). Modified on 6/28/2023 (vn).
June 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shana Agid, Sarah Bogucki, Arlene De La Rosa, Kate Evanishyn, Yasamin Yasi Ghanbari, Dwight A. McBride, Jennifer Penley, Rachel Schrieber, The New School University, Renee T. White, Sonya Williams, Katherine Wolkoff, Rhonnie Yaus. Document filed by M. Holloway Burgess. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5).(rdz) Modified on 6/20/2023 (sac).
June 13, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgess v. The New School University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: /S/M, ska Martha Holloway Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. Holloway Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The New School University
Represented By: Stefanie Lynn Shmil
Represented By: Nancy V. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Wolkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Schrieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonnie Yaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlene De La Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Penley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight A. McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee T. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonya Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Bogucki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shana Agid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate Evanishyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yasamin Yasi Ghanbari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?