Donoghue v. ZScaler, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dennis J. Donoghue
Defendant: William Fraser Brown
Nominal Defendant: ZScaler, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv05903
Filed: July 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Rochon
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda S. Coleman on behalf of William Fraser Brown..(Coleman, Amanda)
August 22, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harlan Andrew Levy on behalf of William Fraser Brown..(Levy, Harlan)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for EVAN L. SEITE to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon)(Text Only Order) (aba)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for IGNACIO E. SALCEDA to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon)(Text Only Order) (aba)
August 16, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for EVAN L. SEITE to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28156201. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ZScaler, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Seite, Evan)
August 16, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for IGNACIO E. SALCEDA to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28156139. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ZScaler, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Salceda, Ignacio)
August 16, 2023 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by ZScaler, Inc...(Bricker, Sara)
August 16, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sara Bricker on behalf of ZScaler, Inc...(Bricker, Sara)
August 16, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for EVAN L. SEITE to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28156201. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (dsh)
August 16, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION for IGNACIO E. SALCEDA to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28156139. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (dsh)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT, It is HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED: 1. Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended up to and including September 22, 2023. 2. No provision of this Stipulation and Order shall be construed as a waiver of, and Defendants expressly reserve, any and all defenses. 3. An executed facsimile or PDF copy of this Stipulation shall have the same force and effect as an original. SO ORDERED. William Fraser Brown answer due 9/22/2023; ZScaler, Inc. answer due 9/22/2023. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 8/14/2023) (kv)
August 14, 2023 Filing 8 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Dennis J. Donoghue..(Tauber, Miriam)
August 9, 2023 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Initial Pre-Trial Conference Order (Dkt 6) served on Brown (Defendant); ZScaler (Nominal Defendant) on 8/9/2023. Service was accepted by Evan Seite (Counsel for ZScaler); Harlan Levy (Counsel for Brown). Service was made by (EMAIL). Document filed by Dennis J. Donoghue..(Tauber, Miriam)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 8/9/2023) (jca)
August 9, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. William Fraser Brown waiver sent on 7/10/2023, answer due 9/8/2023. Document filed by Dennis J. Donoghue..(Tauber, Miriam)
August 8, 2023 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. ZScaler, Inc. waiver sent on 7/10/2023, answer due 9/8/2023. Document filed by Dennis J. Donoghue..(Tauber, Miriam)
July 11, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
July 11, 2023 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
July 11, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
July 10, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Lopez on behalf of Dennis J. Donoghue..(Lopez, David)
July 10, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tauber, Miriam)
July 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Fraser Brown, ZScaler, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27980264)Document filed by Dennis J. Donoghue..(Tauber, Miriam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donoghue v. ZScaler, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis J. Donoghue
Represented By: David Lopez
Represented By: Miriam Deborah Tauber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Fraser Brown
Represented By: Harlan Andrew Levy
Represented By: Amanda S. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: ZScaler, Inc.
Represented By: Ignacio E. Salceda
Represented By: Evan L. Seite
Represented By: Sara Bricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?