Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc. v. The Federal Reserve Bank of New York et al
Plaintiff: Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc.
Defendant: The Federal Reserve Bank of New York and The Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System
Case Number: 1:2023cv06414
Filed: July 25, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER: The parties are directed to appear, in-person, for a hearing on the pending preliminary injunction motion on October 16, 2023 at 11:00 am. ( Status Conference set for 10/16/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/20/2023) (ate)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 96 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Joshua P. Chadwick dated 9/12/2023 re: Availability for Hearing on Pending Preliminary Injunction Motion. Document filed by The Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System..(Chadwick, Joshua)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 95 RESPONSE re: #84 Letter . Document filed by The Federal Reserve Bank of New York..(Youngwood, Jonathan)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #87 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Upon the motion for Carmine Boccuzzi for leave to withdraw from this action as counsel for Defendant the Federal Reserve Bank of New York, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The motion is granted. SO ORDERED. The Clerk should close Docket No. 87. So Ordered. Attorney Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr terminated. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/11/2023) (tg)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #90 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Upon the motion for Caroline James Soussloff for leave to withdraw from this action as counsel for Defendant the Federal Reserve Bank of New York, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The motion is granted. SO ORDERED. The Clerk should close Docket No. 90. SO ORDERED. Attorney Caroline James Soussloff terminated. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/11/2023) (tg)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 92 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by The Federal Reserve Bank of New York. Related Document Number: #90 ..(Soussloff, Caroline)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 DECLARATION of Caroline James Soussloff in Support re: #90 MOTION for Caroline James Soussloff to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by The Federal Reserve Bank of New York..(Soussloff, Caroline)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION for Caroline James Soussloff to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by The Federal Reserve Bank of New York..(Soussloff, Caroline)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 89 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by The Federal Reserve Bank of New York. Related Document Number: #87 ..(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 DECLARATION of Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr. in Support re: #87 MOTION for Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by The Federal Reserve Bank of New York..(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION for Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by The Federal Reserve Bank of New York..(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Meredith Dawn Karp on behalf of The Federal Reserve Bank of New York..(Karp, Meredith)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan K. Youngwood on behalf of The Federal Reserve Bank of New York..(Youngwood, Jonathan)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Abbe D. Lowell dated September 7, 2023 re: Scheduling of Hearing on pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc...(Lowell, Abbe)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #71 Letter Motion to Seal. APPLICATION GRANTED SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/7/2023) (ate)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER: The plaintiff is directed to provide the Court with paper courtesy copies of all papers filed in connection with the fully briefed motion for a preliminary injunction. The parties should ensure that the Court is provided with unredacted paper copies of all memoranda of law and exhibits filed under seal. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/7/2023) (ate)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 DECLARATION of AML RightSource, LLC (Independent Review Audit Report Attestation) in Support re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - AML RightSource BSJI Account Review, September 2023 (Filed Under Seal)).(Lowell, Abbe)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of AML RightSource, LLC (Independent Review Audit Report Attestation) in Support re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc., The Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, The Federal Reserve Bank of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - AML RightSource BSJI Account Review, September 2023)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #71 .(Lowell, Abbe)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 DECLARATION of Christopher Laursen (Second Supplemental) (Redacted) in Support re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Regulatory Memorandum from Collas Crill, August 31, 2023 (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit B - Emails between C. Armstrong and M. Eichner, April 2023 (Redacted)).(Lowell, Abbe)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Christopher Laursen (Second Supplemental) in Support re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc., The Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, The Federal Reserve Bank of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Regulatory Memorandum from Collas Crill, August 31, 2023, #2 Exhibit B - Emails between C. Armstrong and M. Eichner, April 2023)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #71 .(Lowell, Abbe)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 DECLARATION of Hector J. Vazquez (Supplemental) (Redacted) in Support re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - BSJI's Historical and Forecasted Summarized Financial Information (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit B - Communication with Regulator, December 19, 2022 (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit C - Communication with Regulator, February 3, 2023 (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit D - Communication with Regulator, February 16, 2023 (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit E - K2 Integrity BSJI Issue Validation Worksheet (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit F - K2 Integrity BSJI Issue Validation Worksheet (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit G - K2 Integrity BSJI Issue Validation Worksheet (Filed Under Seal)).(Lowell, Abbe)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Hector J. Vazquez (Supplemental) in Support re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc., The Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, The Federal Reserve Bank of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - BSJI's Historical and Forecasted Summarized Financial Information, #2 Exhibit B - Communication with Regulator, December 19, 2022, #3 Exhibit C - Communication with Regulator, February 3, 2023, #4 Exhibit D - Communication with Regulator, February 16, 2023, #5 Exhibit E - K2 Integrity BSJI Issue Validation Worksheet, #6 Exhibit F - K2 Integrity BSJI Issue Validation Worksheet, #7 Exhibit G - K2 Integrity BSJI Issue Validation Worksheet)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #71 .(Lowell, Abbe)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 DECLARATION of Abbe David Lowell in Support re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum from E. Silva to S. Benvenuto, C. Bridgewater, and M. Saxenian, March 31, 2023 (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit B - Memorandum from M. Saxenian and C. Bridgewater to C. Armstrong, April 1, 2023 (Filed Under Seal)).(Lowell, Abbe)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Abbe David Lowell in Support re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc., The Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, The Federal Reserve Bank of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum from E. Silva to S. Benvenuto, C. Bridgewater, and M. Saxenian, March 31, 2023, #2 Exhibit B - Memorandum from M. Saxenian and C. Bridgewater to C. Armstrong, April 1, 2023)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #71 .(Lowell, Abbe)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief (Redacted). Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc...(Lowell, Abbe)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief . Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc., The Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, The Federal Reserve Bank of New York. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #71 .(Lowell, Abbe)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Seal Re: Reply Brief and Certain Declarations and Exhibits in Support, addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Abbe David Lowell dated September 6, 2023. Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc...(Lowell, Abbe)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #68 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/5/2023) (tg)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #67 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/5/2023) (tg)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: The Federal Reserve Bank of New York answer due 10/10/2023. (tg)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Re: Combined Reply to Oppositions to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Abbe David Lowell dated September 1, 2023. Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc...(Lowell, Abbe)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to October 10, 2023 for FRBNY to move, answer or otherwise respond to Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Michele Kalstein dated September 1, 2023. Document filed by The Federal Reserve Bank of New York..(Kalstein, Michele)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #65 Letter filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: No action on the plaintiff's letter, ECF No. 61, is requested or required. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/30/2023) (ama)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Abbe David Lowell dated August 29, 2023 re: Response to August 29, 2023 letter (Docket No. 64). Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc...(Lowell, Abbe)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Michele Kalstein dated August 29, 2023 re: Letter in Response to BSJI's Request for Clarification. Document filed by The Federal Reserve Bank of New York..(Kalstein, Michele)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #62 Letter Motion to Seal. Application granted. The requested redactions should be applied to the transcript. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/25/2023) (ate)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Seal Re: Redaction to July 26, 2023 Hearing Transcript, addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Abbe David Lowell dated August 25, 2023. Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc...(Lowell, Abbe)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Abbe David Lowell dated August 25, 2023 re: Request for clarification of August 11, 2023 pre-discovery motion conference ruling. Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc...(Lowell, Abbe)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #50 Letter Motion to Seal. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/23/2023) (jca)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr. dated August 23, 2023 re: corrected filings ( #55 #56 #57 #58 ). Document filed by The Federal Reserve Bank of New York..(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief [REDACTED]. Document filed by The Federal Reserve Bank of New York..(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief . Document filed by The Federal Reserve Bank of New York, Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc., The Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #50 .(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT#58) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief [REDACTED]. Document filed by The Federal Reserve Bank of New York..(Boccuzzi, Carmine) Modified on 8/24/2023 (lb).
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT#57) ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief . Document filed by The Federal Reserve Bank of New York, Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc., The Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #50 .(Boccuzzi, Carmine) Modified on 8/24/2023 (lb).
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 OPPOSITION BRIEF re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief . Document filed by The Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System..(Chadwick, Joshua)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 DECLARATION of Michael M. Brennan [REDACTED] in Opposition re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by The Federal Reserve Bank of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Guidelines for Evaluating Account and Service Requests, #2 Exhibit B Master Account Agreement, #3 Exhibit C Operating Circular 1, #4 Exhibit D Supplemental Terms and Conditions Governing the Provisions of Financial Services to High-Risk Cusomers, #5 Exhibit E Account and Financial Services Handbook, #6 Exhibit F National Money Laundering Risk Assessment, #7 Exhibit G BSJI Certificate of Registry, #8 Exhibit H BSJI Audit and Legal Compliance Committee Minutes, #9 Exhibit I June 30, 2023 Letter, #10 Exhibit J May 8, 2020 Email, #11 Exhibit K March 5, 2020 KYC Questionnaire Responses, #12 Exhibit L May 12, 2021 KYC Questionnaire Responses, #13 Exhibit M BSJI Financial Statement Exceprts, #14 Exhibit N March 31, 2023 Memo, #15 Exhibit O July 18, 2022 Letter, #16 Exhibit P August 17, 2022 Letter, #17 Exhibit Q September 19, 2022 Letter, #18 Exhibit R Request for Information to BSJI Concerning High-Risk Transaction Activity, #19 Exhibit S April 1, 2023 Memo, #20 Exhibit T April 12, 2023 Email, #21 Exhibit U April 24, 2023 Letter).(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Michael M. Brennan in Opposition re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by The Federal Reserve Bank of New York, Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc., The Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Guidelines for Evaluating Account and Service Requests, #2 Exhibit B - Master Account Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Operating Circular 1, #4 Exhibit D - Supplemental Terms and Conditions Governing the Provisions of Financial Services to High-Risk Customers, #5 Exhibit E - Account and Financial Services Handbook, #6 Exhibit F - National Money Laundering Risk Assessment, #7 Exhibit G - BSJI Certificate of Registry, #8 Exhibit H - BSJI Audit and Legal Compliance Committee Minutes, #9 Exhibit I - June 30, 2023 Letter, #10 Exhibit J - May 8, 2020 Email, #11 Exhibit K - March 5, 2020 KYC Questionnaire Responses, #12 Exhibit L - May 12, 2021 KYC Questionnaire Responses, #13 Exhibit M - BSJI Financial Statement Excerpts, #14 Exhibit N - March 31, 2023 Memo, #15 Exhibit O - July 18, 2022 Letter, #16 Exhibit P - August 17, 2022 Letter, #17 Exhibit Q - September 19, 2022 Letter, #18 Exhibit R - Request for Information to BSJI Concerning High-Risk Transaction Activity, #19 Exhibit S - April 1, 2023 Memo, #20 Exhibit T - April 12, 2023 Email, #21 Exhibit U - April 24, 2023 Letter)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #50 .(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 DECLARATION of Suzanne Benvenuto in Opposition re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by The Federal Reserve Bank of New York..(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr. dated August 22, 2023. Document filed by The Federal Reserve Bank of New York..(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yvonne Facchina Mizusawa on behalf of The Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System..(Mizusawa, Yvonne)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Nicholas Jabbour to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/22/2023) (ate)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michele H. Kalstein on behalf of The Federal Reserve Bank of New York..(Kalstein, Michele)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #46 MOTION for Nicholas Jabbour to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for Nicholas Jabbour to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Nicholas Jabbour, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Jabbour, Nicholas)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served. Service was accepted by Elissa Fondiller, Legal (Dep't). Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc...(Librera, Kelly)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. The Federal Reserve Bank of New York served on 8/16/2023, answer due 10/16/2023. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc...(Librera, Kelly)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. The Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System served on 8/10/2023, answer due 10/10/2023. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc...(Librera, Kelly)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 8/11/2023 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 8/11/2023 before Judge John G. Koeltl. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/11/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/21/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2023..(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #38 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/21/2023) (ate)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caroline James Soussloff on behalf of The Federal Reserve Bank of New York..(Soussloff, Caroline)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr. dated August 18, 2023. Document filed by The Federal Reserve Bank of New York..(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr on behalf of The Federal Reserve Bank of New York..(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: The reference to the magistrate judge for general pretrial purposes (ECF No. 31) is withdrawn. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/11/2023) (tro)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Abbe David Lowell re #27 Transcript,,..(Lowell, Abbe)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Michael M. Brennan dated 8/11/2023 re: In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery. Document filed by The Federal Reserve Bank of New York..(Brennan, Michael)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Joshua P. Chadwick dated August 11, 2023 re: Pre-Motion Discovery Conference. Document filed by The Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System..(Chadwick, Joshua)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Pre-Motion Conference held on 8/11/2023. (Fletcher, Donnie)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: The parties are directed to appear by telephone tomorrow, August 11, 2023, at 11:30 a.m., to discuss the plaintiff's August 9, 2023, letter requesting a pre-motion discovery conference (ECF No. 30). Dial-in: 888-363-4749, with access code 8140049. ( Telephone Conference set for 8/11/2023 at 11:30 AM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/10/2023) (ate)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. Motions referred to James L. Cott. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/10/2023) (kv)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference regarding document production as to BSJI's preliminary injunction motion, addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Abbe David Lowell dated August 9, 2023. Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc...(Lowell, Abbe)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #26 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Michael Brennan dated 8/3/2023. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 8/22/2023 Replies due by 9/6/2023. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/4/2023) (mml)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 7/26/2023 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNECE held on 7/26/2023 before Judge John G. Koeltl. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rebecca Forman, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/25/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/5/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2023..(McGuirk, Kelly) (Main Document 27 replaced on 8/30/2023) (js).
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Michael Brennan dated 8/3/2023. Document filed by The Federal Reserve Bank of New York..(Brennan, Michael)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Michael Brennan dated 7/28/2023 re: Agreement Obviating Need to Rule on TRO Motion. Document filed by The Federal Reserve Bank of New York..(Brennan, Michael)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: As discussed during today's telephone conference, the defendants shall respond to the plaintiff's motion for emergency relief by Friday, July 28, 2023, at 10 a.m. If the parties have not reached an agreement that would obviate the need for the Court to rule on the plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order by that time, the plaintiff may reply to the defense submission by Friday, July 28, 2023, at 5 p.m. SO ORDERED., ( Responses due by 7/28/2023, Replies due by 7/28/2023.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/26/2023) (ama)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Telephone Conference held on 7/26/2023. (Fletcher, Donnie)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Paul Chadwick on behalf of The Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System..(Chadwick, Joshua)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Michael Brennan dated 7/26/2023 re: Today's telephonic conference. Document filed by The Federal Reserve Bank of New York..(Brennan, Michael)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Federal Reserve Bank of New York..(Brennan, Michael)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Martin Brennan on behalf of The Federal Reserve Bank of New York..(Brennan, Michael)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Abbe David Lowell dated July 25, 2023. Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc...(Lowell, Abbe)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DECLARATION of Richard J. Wolf in Support re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (redacted), #2 Exhibit 2).(Lowell, Abbe)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DECLARATION of Marcelino Bellosta Varady in Support re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc...(Lowell, Abbe)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DECLARATION of James C. Watkins in Support re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Lowell, Abbe)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DECLARATION of AML RightSource LLC in Support re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc...(Lowell, Abbe)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DECLARATION of Christopher Laursen in Support re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (redacted)).(Lowell, Abbe)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DECLARATION of Francisco Aponte in Support re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8 (redacted), #9 Exhibit 9 (redacted), #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11 (under seal)).(Lowell, Abbe)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DECLARATION of Samson Leung (Supplemental) in Support re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (under seal), #3 Exhibit C (under seal), #4 Exhibit D (under seal), #5 Exhibit E (under seal), #6 Exhibit F (under seal), #7 Exhibit G (under seal), #8 Exhibit H (under seal), #9 Exhibit I (under seal), #10 Exhibit J (under seal), #11 Exhibit K (under seal)).(Lowell, Abbe)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DECLARATION of William M. Isaac in Support re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Lowell, Abbe)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DECLARATION of Hector J. Vazquez in Support re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13 (under seal), #14 Exhibit 14 (redacted), #15 Exhibit 15 (redacted), #16 Exhibit 16 (redacted), #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18 (under seal), #19 Exhibit 19 (redacted), #20 Exhibit 20 (redacted), #21 Exhibit 21 (redacted), #22 Exhibit 22 (redacted), #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24).(Lowell, Abbe)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Court will hear the parties by telephone on the plaintiff's proposed order to show cause with emergency relief (ECF No. 6) tomorrow, Wednesday, July 26, 2023, at 5 p.m. Dial-in: 888-363-4749, with access code 8140049. The plaintiff should see that unredacted copies of all papers filed in this action are provided to the defendants, and the plaintiff should provide prompt notice to the defendants of tomorrow's proceeding. SO ORDERED., ( Telephone Conference set for 7/26/2023 at 05:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/25/2023) (ama)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DECLARATION of Abbe David Lowell in Support re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4).(Lowell, Abbe)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief . Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc...(Lowell, Abbe)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc...(Lowell, Abbe) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc...(Lowell, Abbe)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nmo)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kelly Anne Librera on behalf of Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc...(Librera, Kelly)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(jgo) (jgo).
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, The Federal Reserve Bank of New York. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number 19038)Document filed by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc...(jgo) (jgo).
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE REDACTED COMPLAINT ORDER filed in 23mc241..(jgo)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Federal Reserve Bank of New York..(jgo)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System..(jgo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc. v. The Federal Reserve Bank of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc.
Represented By: Abbe David Lowell
Represented By: Kelly Anne Librera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Federal Reserve Bank of New York
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Represented By: Michael Martin Brennan
Represented By: Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr
Represented By: Caroline James Soussloff
Represented By: Meredith Dawn Karp
Represented By: Michele H. Kalstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System
Represented By: Joshua Paul Chadwick
Represented By: Nicholas Jabbour
Represented By: Yvonne Facchina Mizusawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?