Fanatics Collectibles Topco, Inc. v. Panini S.P.A.
Plaintiff: Fanatics Collectibles Topco, Inc.
Defendant: Panini S.P.A.
Case Number: 1:2023cv06895
Filed: August 7, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 oc Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time the parties' Initial Case Management Conference and for entry of a Case Management Order addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Christopher Kercher dated October 6, 2023. Document filed by Fanatics Collectibles Topco, Inc...(Kercher, Christopher)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Panini S.P.A...(Singer, Stuart)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Richard Feinstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil)(Text Only Order) (rz)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Motion for James Denvir to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil)(Text Only Order) (rz)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Jason Hilborn to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil)(Text Only Order) (rz)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Sabrina McElroy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil)(Text Only Order) (rz)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Richard Feinstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-28217038. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Panini S.P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Massachusetts Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Feinstein, Richard)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for James Denvir to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28216893. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Panini S.P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Denvir, James)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Stuart Singer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil)(Text Only Order) (rz)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for Richard Feinstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-28217038. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for James Denvir to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28216893. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Jason Hilborn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28214797. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Jason Hilborn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28214797. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Panini S.P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit NY Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit FL Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Hilborn, Jason)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Sabria McElroy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28213696. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Panini S.P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Florida Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit New York Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(McElroy, Sabria)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Stuart Singer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28213599. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Panini S.P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Florida Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Singer, Stuart)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Boies, II on behalf of Panini S.P.A...(Boies, David)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Stuart Singer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28213599. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION for Sabria McElroy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28213696. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Panini S.P.A. waiver sent on 8/17/2023, answer due 11/15/2023. Document filed by Fanatics Collectibles Topco, Inc...(Carlinsky, Michael)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Panini S.P.A.. (vf)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sami H Rashid on behalf of Fanatics Collectibles Topco, Inc...(Rashid, Sami)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Daniel Kercher on behalf of Fanatics Collectibles Topco, Inc...(Kercher, Christopher)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Derek Lawrence Shaffer on behalf of Fanatics Collectibles Topco, Inc...(Shaffer, Derek)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Panini S.p.A., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Fanatics Collectibles Topco, Inc...(Carlinsky, Michael)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Fanatics Global Holdco, LLC, Corporate Parent Fanatics Holdings, Inc. for Fanatics Collectibles Topco, Inc.. Document filed by Fanatics Collectibles Topco, Inc...(Carlinsky, Michael)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Carlinsky, Michael)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Panini S.P.A.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28107677)Document filed by Fanatics Collectibles Topco, Inc...(Carlinsky, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fanatics Collectibles Topco, Inc. v. Panini S.P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fanatics Collectibles Topco, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Kercher
Represented By: Derek Lawrence Shaffer
Represented By: Sami H Rashid
Represented By: Michael Barry Carlinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panini S.P.A.
Represented By: David Boies, II
Represented By: James Peter Denvir, III
Represented By: Jason H Hilborn
Represented By: Richard A. Feinstein
Represented By: Sabria McElroy
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?