Albaneze et al v. Biegel et al
Plaintiff: Jeffery T. Albaneze, Matthew B. Cochran and Kaitlyn P. Weatherly
Defendant: Mark D. Biegel and BDO USA, P.A.
Case Number: 1:2023cv07197
Filed: August 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will hold a PreSettlement Conference Scheduling Call on Tuesday, October 31, 2023 at 3:30 p.m. The dial in information is (866) 3901828, access code 1582687. Telephone Conference set for 10/31/2023 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 10/10/2023) (rro)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The plaintiffs are directed to file an amended complaint by October 20, 2023. The defendants' time to move or answer is November 10, 2023. The plaintiffs must respond to any motion by November 28, 2023. The defendants' time to reply is December 8, 2023. If the defendants answer, the parties are directed to file a Rule 26(f) report by November 28, 2023. SO ORDERED. ( Amended Pleadings due by 10/20/2023., Replies due by 12/8/2023., Responses due by 11/28/2023) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 10/3/2023) (tg)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 10/3/2023) (tg)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF MICHAEL J. SHEEHAN: The motion of Michael J. Sheehan for admission to practice Pro Hae Vice in the above captioned action is granted. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 10/3/2023) (ate)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF BRIAN MEAD: The motion of Brian Mead for admission to practice Pro Hae Vice in the above captioned action is granted. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 10/3/2023) (ate) Modified on 10/3/2023 (ate).
October 3, 2023 Filing 15 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Richard A. Hubell dated 10.3.23 re: Conference scheduled for 10.3.23. Document filed by Jeffery T. Albaneze, Matthew B. Cochran, Kaitlyn P. Weatherly..(Hubell, Richard)
October 2, 2023 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #9 Order on Motion for Conference, addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Richard A. Hubell dated October 2, 2023. Document filed by Jeffery T. Albaneze, Matthew B. Cochran, Kaitlyn P. Weatherly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email to Ferrara 9.20.23).(Hubell, Richard)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF BRIAN MEAD granting #11 Motion for Brian Mead to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Brian Mead for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 09/27/2023) (yv)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF MICHAEL J. SHEEHAN granting #10 Motion for Michael J. Sheehan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Michael J. Sheehan for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 09/27/2023) (yv)
September 27, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Brian Mead to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28343762. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BDO USA, P.A., Mark D. Biegel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support, #2 Exhibit 1: Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Mead, Brian)
September 27, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Michael J. Sheehan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28343664. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BDO USA, P.A., Mark D. Biegel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support, #2 Exhibit 1: IL Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit 2: NY Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Sheehan, Michael)
September 27, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Brian Mead to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28343762. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (va)
September 27, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Michael J. Sheehan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28343664. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (va)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Conference re: #8 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Lindsay F. Ditlow dated September 21, 2023. A pre-motion conference will be held on Tuesday October 3, 2023, at 03:00 PM. Dial-In: (888) 363-4749. Access Code: 8140049. So Ordered. (Telephone Conference set for 10/3/2023 at 03:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/22/23) (yv)
September 21, 2023 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Lindsay F. Ditlow dated September 21, 2023. Document filed by BDO USA, P.A., Mark D. Biegel..(Ditlow, Lindsay)
September 20, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay Faye Ditlow on behalf of BDO USA, P.A., Mark D. Biegel..(Ditlow, Lindsay)
September 8, 2023 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against BDO USA, P.A., Mark D. Biegel with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Jeffery T. Albaneze, Kaitlyn P. Weatherly, Matthew B. Cochran. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BDO USA, LLP MANAGER AGREEMENT).(Hubell, Richard)
September 5, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl:. Initial Conference set for 12/7/2023 at 12:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie)
August 18, 2023 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BDO USA, P.A.. (vf)
August 17, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BDO USA P.A., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jeffery T. Albaneze, Matthew B. Cochran, Kaitlyn P. Weatherly..(Hubell, Richard)
August 17, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hubell, Richard)
August 16, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Richard Adam Hubell. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
August 16, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard Adam Hubell. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: BDO USA, P.A., Mark B. Biegel, Jeffery T. Albaneze, Kaitlyn P. Weatherly, Matthew B. Cochran. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly. (vf)
August 16, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Adam Hubell. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
August 16, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
August 16, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Richard Adam Hubell to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF for the request for issuance of summons is not viewable; the date field on the official A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
August 16, 2023 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
August 16, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
August 15, 2023 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT- SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mark B. Biegel and BDO USA, P.A., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jeffery T. Albaneze, Matthew B. Cochran, Kaitlyn P. Weatherly..(Hubell, Richard) Modified on 8/16/2023 (vf).
August 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BDO USA, P.A., Mark B. Biegel. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28149475)Document filed by Jeffery T. Albaneze, Kaitlyn P. Weatherly, Matthew B. Cochran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BDO USA LLP Manager Agreement).(Hubell, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albaneze et al v. Biegel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery T. Albaneze
Represented By: Richard Adam Hubell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew B. Cochran
Represented By: Richard Adam Hubell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaitlyn P. Weatherly
Represented By: Richard Adam Hubell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark D. Biegel
Represented By: Michael J. Sheehan
Represented By: Brian Mead
Represented By: Lindsay Faye Ditlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BDO USA, P.A.
Represented By: Michael J. Sheehan
Represented By: Brian Mead
Represented By: Lindsay Faye Ditlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?