United States of America v. Apex Building Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Apex Building Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv07838
Filed: September 5, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jennifer H Rearden
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2616 Toxic Substance control; seizure of chemical
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth M. Abell on behalf of Apex Building Company, Inc...(Abell, Kenneth)
October 31, 2023 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4 MOTION for Settlement - Motion to Enter Consent Decree. . Document filed by United States of America..(Folch, Monica)
October 31, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Settlement - Motion to Enter Consent Decree. Document filed by United States of America..(Folch, Monica)
September 6, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
September 6, 2023 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
September 6, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 6, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Zachary Bannon. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); Cause of Action code 15:2601; Fee Status code none (no fee required);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 1 (U.S. Government Plaintiff); the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:2616; the Fee Status code has been modified to wv (waived);. (pc)
September 5, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lodging of Proposed Consent Decree. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 - Proposed Consent Decree).(Bannon, Zachary)
September 5, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bannon, Zachary)
September 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apex Building Company, Inc.. Document filed by United States of America..(Bannon, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Apex Building Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Zachary Bannon
Represented By: Monica Pilar Folch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apex Building Company, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth M. Abell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?