Ubri v. Majestic Associates LLC et al
Plaintiff: Eduardo Ubri
Defendant: Majestic Associates LLC and Joshua Balsam
Case Number: 1:2023cv07954
Filed: September 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 020
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Majestic Associates LLC served on 9/15/2023, answer due 10/6/2023. Service was accepted by Secretary of State. Document filed by Eduardo Ubri(on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Maguire, Jeffrey)
September 11, 2023 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joshua Balsam, Majestic Associates LLC..(jgo)
September 11, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 11, 2023 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Eduardo Ubri added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Eduardo Ubri. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Maguire, Jeffrey)
September 11, 2023 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
September 11, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
September 11, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jeffrey Robert Maguire re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; add Eduardo Ubri with party text 'on behalf of all others similarly situated'. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (jgo)
September 8, 2023 Filing 4 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Eduardo Ubri..(Maguire, Jeffrey)
September 8, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Majestic Associates LLC; Joshua Balsam, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Eduardo Ubri..(Maguire, Jeffrey)
September 8, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Maguire, Jeffrey)
September 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joshua Balsam, Majestic Associates LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28258906)Document filed by Eduardo Ubri..(Maguire, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ubri v. Majestic Associates LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Ubri
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Majestic Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Balsam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?