The Travelers Indemnity Company v. Trisura Specialty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: The Travelers Indemnity Company
Defendant: Trisura Insurance Company, Trisura Specialty Insurance Company and Utica National Insurance of Ohio
Cross Defendant: Utica National Insurance Company of Ohio
Case Number: 1:2023cv08255
Filed: September 19, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. § 1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Civil Enforcement of Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2023 Filing 32 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against Utica National Insurance Company of Ohio. Document filed by Trisura Specialty Insurance Company..(Fridegotto, Linda)
November 6, 2023 Filing 31 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Trisura Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Trisura U.S. Holding Company, Corporate Parent Trisura Group Ltd. for Trisura Specialty Insurance Company. Document filed by Trisura Specialty Insurance Company..(Fridegotto, Linda)
October 27, 2023 Filing 30 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Utica National Insurance Company of Ohio..(Pavloff, Sherri)
October 11, 2023 Filing 29 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Utica National Insurance Company of Ohio served on 10/2/2023, answer due 11/1/2023. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Premisler, Andrew)
October 11, 2023 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. Utica National Insurance Company of Ohio served on 10/6/2023, answer due 11/1/2023. Service was accepted by Evan Gallagher, Authorized Agent. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Premisler, Andrew)
October 11, 2023 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Utica National Insurance Company of Ohio served on 9/25/2023, answer due 11/1/2023. Service was accepted by Evan Gallagher, Authorized Agent. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Premisler, Andrew)
October 10, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED ORDER. Notice to attorney Linda Fridegotto to RE-FILE Document No. #26 Proposed Order. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the proposed order. Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Stipulation and Order found under the event list Proposed Orders - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed (scanned signature image) and dated PDF. (tp)
October 9, 2023 Filing 26 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Trisura Specialty Insurance Company..(Fridegotto, Linda) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 10/10/2023 (tp).
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #11 Amended Complaint, #19 Affidavit of Service Complaints addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Sherri N. Pavloff dated October 3, 2023. Application GRANTED. Defendant shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint on or before November 1, 2023. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket number 23. SO ORDERED. #11 Amended Complaint,. Utica National Insurance Company of Ohio answer due 11/1/2023. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/4/2023) (vfr)
October 3, 2023 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. Utica National Insurance Company of Ohio served on 9/28/2023, answer due 10/19/2023. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Premisler, Andrew)
October 3, 2023 Filing 23 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #11 Amended Complaint, #19 Affidavit of Service Complaints addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Sherri N. Pavloff dated October 3, 2023. Document filed by Utica National Insurance Company of Ohio..(Pavloff, Sherri)
October 3, 2023 Filing 22 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Utica National Insurance Company of Ohio..(Pavloff, Sherri)
October 3, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sherri N. Pavloff on behalf of Utica National Insurance Company of Ohio..(Pavloff, Sherri)
October 2, 2023 Filing 20 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint served. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Premisler, Andrew)
October 2, 2023 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Utica National Insurance Company of Ohio served on 9/22/2023, answer due 10/13/2023. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Premisler, Andrew)
September 29, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/15/2023 at 02:30 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/29/2023) (kgo)
September 25, 2023 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for The Travelers Indemnity Company. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Premisler, Andrew)
September 25, 2023 Filing 16 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Premisler, Andrew)
September 25, 2023 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Utica National Insurance Company of Ohio..(jgo)
September 25, 2023 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Trisura Specialty Insurance Company..(jgo)
September 22, 2023 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Utica National Insurance Company of Ohio, re: #11 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Premisler, Andrew)
September 22, 2023 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Trisura Specialty Insurance Company, re: #11 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Premisler, Andrew)
September 22, 2023 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #8 Amended Complaint, against Trisura Specialty Insurance Company, Utica National Insurance Company of Ohio with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company. Related document: #8 Amended Complaint,..(Premisler, Andrew)
September 21, 2023 Filing 10 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Utica National Insurance Company of Ohio, re: #8 Amended Complaint. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Premisler, Andrew) Modified on 9/21/2023 (jgo).
September 21, 2023 Filing 9 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Trisura Specialty Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Premisler, Andrew) Modified on 9/21/2023 (jgo).
September 21, 2023 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #7 Complaint against Trisura Specialty Insurance Company, Utica National Insurance of Ohio with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company. Related document: #7 Complaint..(Premisler, Andrew) Modified on 9/21/2023 (jgo).
September 20, 2023 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Trisura Insurance Company, Utica National Insurance Company of Ohio. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Premisler, Andrew)
September 20, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Andrew M. Premisler. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
September 20, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Andrew M. Premisler to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
September 20, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
September 20, 2023 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
September 20, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
September 20, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Andrew M. Premisler. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Utica National Insurance Company of Ohio. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name entered incorrectly. (vf)
September 20, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Andrew M. Premisler to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons and #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Defendant party name listed on Summons PDF and ECF Docket Entry does not correspond exactly to pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf) Modified on 9/20/2023 (gp).
September 20, 2023 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (gp)
September 19, 2023 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for The Travelers Indemnity Company. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Premisler, Andrew)
September 19, 2023 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Premisler, Andrew) Modified on 9/19/2023 (lb).
September 19, 2023 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Premisler, Andrew)
September 19, 2023 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Utica National Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Premisler, Andrew) Modified on 9/20/2023 (vf).
September 19, 2023 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Trisura Specialty Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Premisler, Andrew) Modified on 9/20/2023 (gp).
September 19, 2023 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28306512)Document filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company..(Premisler, Andrew) Modified on 9/20/2023 (vf).
September 19, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Andrew M. Premisler to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Travelers Indemnity Company v. Trisura Specialty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Andrew M. Premisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trisura Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trisura Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Linda Fridegotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utica National Insurance of Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Utica National Insurance Company of Ohio
Represented By: Sherri N. Pavloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?