Chosen Figure LLC v. Prabal Gurung, LLC
Plaintiff: Chosen Figure LLC
Defendant: Prabal Gurung, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv08657
Filed: October 2, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Accordingly, by December 22, 2023, the parties shall submit their joint letter and proposed case management plan, and indicate whether they consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/5/2023) (jca)
November 7, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jaymie Brooke Sabilia-Heffert on behalf of Chosen Figure LLC..(Sabilia-Heffert, Jaymie)
October 11, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Prabal Gurung, LLC served on 10/11/2023, answer due 11/1/2023. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Clerk. Document filed by Chosen Figure LLC..(Sanders, Craig)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by December 4, 2023, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/4/2023) (jca)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by December 4, 2023, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER AND THE COURT'S INDIVIDUAL PRACTICES TO ALL PARTIES. If this case has been settled or otherwise terminated, counsel are required to file a stipulation of discontinuance, voluntary dismissal, or other proof of termination electronically on ECF, with a courtesy copy emailed to chambers in accordance with the Court's Individual Practices. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/4/2023) (jca)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/4/2023) (jca)
October 3, 2023 Filing 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (vf)
October 3, 2023 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Prabal Gurung, LLC. (vf)
October 3, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
October 3, 2023 Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
October 3, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
October 2, 2023 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Sanders, Craig)
October 2, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Prabal Gurung, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Chosen Figure LLC..(Sanders, Craig)
October 2, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sanders, Craig)
October 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Prabal Gurung, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28369084)Document filed by Chosen Figure LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Photograph, #2 Exhibit Infringing Use of Photograph).(Sanders, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chosen Figure LLC v. Prabal Gurung, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chosen Figure LLC
Represented By: Craig B. Sanders
Represented By: Jaymie Brooke Sabilia-Heffert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prabal Gurung, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?