Ramos v. Afgan Paper & Food Products, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Luis Ramos
Defendant: Afgan Paper & Food Products, Inc. and Faizurahman Aminy
Case Number: 1:2023cv09063
Filed: October 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Referring Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys that the time for Defendants, AFGAN PAPER & FOOD PRODUCTS, INC. AND FAIZURAHMAN AMINY, to file an answer, move or to otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and includes December 28, 2023. SO ORDERED. Afgan Paper & Food Products, Inc. answer due 12/28/2023; Faizurahman Aminy answer due 12/28/2023. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/1/2023) (tg)
December 1, 2023 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Afgan Paper & Food Products, Inc., Faizurahman Aminy..(Schlein, Stanley)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The time for defendant Faizurahman Aminy to answer was November 8, 2023. ECF No. 5. The time for defendant Afgan Paper & Food Products, Inc. to answer was November 21, 2023. ECF No. 6. To date, no answer has been filed. The time for the defendants to answer or respond to the complaint is extended to December 5, 2023. SO ORDERED. Afgan Paper & Food Products, Inc. answer due 12/5/2023; Faizurahman Aminy answer due 12/5/2023. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 11/27/2023) (tg)
November 6, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Afgan Paper & Food Products, Inc. served on 10/31/2023, answer due 11/21/2023. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State, State of New York. Document filed by Luis Ramos..(Gangat, Mohammed)
November 3, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 2/27/2024 at 04:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie)
October 23, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Faizurahman Aminy served on 10/18/2023, answer due 11/8/2023. Service was accepted by Jane Doe, a person of suitable age and discretion, at subject's dwelling house. Document filed by Luis Ramos..(Gangat, Mohammed)
October 17, 2023 NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Katherine H. Parker to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (tro)
October 17, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John G. Koeltl. Judge Cathy Seibel is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
October 16, 2023 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Afgan Paper & Food Products, Inc., Faizurahman Aminy..(jgo)
October 16, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Mohammed Ahmed Gangat. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Kings;. (jgo)
October 16, 2023 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
October 16, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
October 16, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 15, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Afgan Paper & Food Products, Inc., Faizurahman Aminy, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Luis Ramos..(Gangat, Mohammed)
October 15, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gangat, Mohammed)
October 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Afgan Paper & Food Products, Inc., Faizurahman Aminy. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28426361)Document filed by Luis Ramos..(Gangat, Mohammed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos v. Afgan Paper & Food Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Ramos
Represented By: Mohammed Ahmed Gangat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Afgan Paper & Food Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faizurahman Aminy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?