Bowers v. Grupo Televisa, S.A.B.
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Defendant: Grupo Televisa, S.A.B.
Case Number: 1:2023cv10870
Filed: December 14, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. § 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #19 Letter filed by Grupo Televisa, S.A.B. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff shall file a response, not to exceed three pages, by February 12, 2024. Defendant is advised that the filing of this pre-motion letter stays the time to answer or move until further order of this Court. A telephonic conference will be held to discuss this pre- motion letter on February 21, 2024, at 4:00 P.M. At that time, the parties shall call 888-363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. So Ordered. ( Telephone Conference set for 2/21/2024 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/5/2024) (vfr)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Ross Q. Panko to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (jcs)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary Stein: A Telephone Pre-Settlement Conference was held on February 5,2024. Ross Panko appeared on behalf of the Defendant. (ate)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Ross Q. Panko dated February 1, 2024 re: Defendant's forthcoming Motion to Dismiss the Complaint. Document filed by Grupo Televisa, S.A.B...(Peikes, Ariel)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL REPORT OF PARTIES BEFORE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Document filed by Eric Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (CMO)).(Parker, Robert)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRE-SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: This action is scheduled for a Telephone Conference on Monday, February 5, 2024 at 11:00 a.m., to discuss the scheduling of and preparation for a Settlement Conference. The parties are directed to consult the undersigned's Settlement Conference Procedures, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-gary-stein. Counsel is directed to join the conference via Microsoft Teams at the scheduled time. Please dial (646) 453-4442, Access Code: 179 220 1#. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 2/5/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Gary Stein.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary Stein on 1/29/2024) (tg)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the January 31, 2024, initial pretrial conference is CANCELLED. If the parties believe that a conference would nevertheless be useful, they should inform the court immediately so the conference can be reinstated. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall resubmit their case management plan and scheduling order with the proper signatures on the fifth page by January 29, 2024. The case management plan and scheduling order subsequently will issue separately. The parties attention is directed to the provisions for periodic status letters, and the need for a pre-motion letter to avoid cancellation of the final conference and setting of a trial date. It is further ORDERED that, if Defendant seeks to file a motion to dismiss, it shall file a pre-motion letter pursuant to Individual Rules III.A.1 and III.C.2. It is further ORDERED, regarding settlement discussions, the request for a referral to a settlement conference is GRANTED. The referral will issue in a separate order. The parties are apprised that participation in mediation does not provide cause to stay discovery. The parties should be aware that the Court does not extend the deadlines for fact and expert discovery absent compelling circumstances. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/25/24) (yv)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Gary Stein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/25/2024) (vfr)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL REPORT OF PARTIES BEFORE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Document filed by Eric Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed CMO).(Parker, Robert)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Ross Q. Panko to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28786766. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Grupo Televisa, S.A.B.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order approving Pro Hac Admission).(Peikes, Ariel)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Ross Q. Panko to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28786766. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Ariel Peikes dated January 8, 2024 re: Deadline for Defendant's Response to the Complaint and Summons, pursuant to FRCP Rule 4(d)(3). Document filed by Grupo Televisa, S.A.B...(Peikes, Ariel)
January 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Grupo Televisa, S.A.B...(Peikes, Ariel)
January 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ariel S. Peikes on behalf of Grupo Televisa, S.A.B...(Peikes, Ariel)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of IPTC Order and Individual Practices served on Grupo Televisa, S.A.B. on 12/26/2023. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Eric Bowers..(Parker, Robert)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(jgo)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that a telephonic conference will be held on January 31, 2024 at 4:00p.m. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. Initial Conference set for 1/31/2024 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/18/2023) (mml)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Parker, Robert)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Grupo Televisa, S.A.B...(jgo)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT COPYRIGHT FORM. Notice to Attorney Robert Terry Parker to RE-FILE re: Document No. #3 AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s):. the PDF attached to the docket entry for the AO 121 Copyright form is not correct; the Docket Number field on the AO 121 Copyright form was not completed by the attorney; the Date Filed field on the AO 121 Copyright form was not completed by the attorney. Re-file the document using the event type AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct AO 121 Copyright PDF form Do not re-file the form. (jgo)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Grupo Televisa S.A.B., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Eric Bowers..(Parker, Robert)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Parker, Robert) Modified on 12/15/2023 (jgo).
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Parker, Robert)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Grupo Televisa, S.A.B.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28695531)Document filed by Eric Bowers..(Parker, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. Grupo Televisa, S.A.B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Represented By: Robert Terry Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grupo Televisa, S.A.B.
Represented By: Ariel S. Peikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?