Doe v. A360 Media LLC
Plaintiff: Police Officer "Jane" Doe and Amanda Bloom
Defendant: A360 MEDIA LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv11024
Filed: December 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 lb Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ORAL ARGUMENT proceeding held on 1/24/2024 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 50 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ORAL ARGUMENT held on 1/24/2024 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/8/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/18/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2024..(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 49 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #19 Pursuant to the Court's January 30, 2024 Order. Document filed by Amanda Bloom..(Clare, Thomas)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #19 Pursuant to the Court's January 30, 2024 Order. Document filed by A360 MEDIA LLC..(Schell, Jacquelyn)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 4/29/2024. Responses due by 5/13/2024. Replies due by 5/20/2024. (va)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 47 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #45 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, against A360 MEDIA LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Amanda Bloom. Related document: #45 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Who is Shivon Zilis Publication, #2 Exhibit B - Elon Musk Welcomed Twins Publication, #3 Exhibit C - Instagram Publication, #4 Exhibit D - Docket 041 Order).(Clare, Thomas)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Thomas Clare to RE-FILE re: Document No. #45 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; The attached PDF reflects pleading title "Complaint"; all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Amanda Bloom added. Party added pursuant to #45 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Amanda Bloom. Related document: #45 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,..(Clare, Thomas)
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 46 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Ready for Trial by 6/10/2024. The case is to be tried to a jury. Deposition due by 4/19/2024. Discovery due by 4/22/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/28/2024 at 02:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Oral Argument set for 5/28/2024 at 02:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/24/2024) (va)
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 45 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against A360 MEDIA LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by "Jane" Doe. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Who is Shivon Zilis Publication, #2 Exhibit B - Elon Musk Welcomed Twins Publication, #3 Exhibit C - Instagram Publication, #4 Exhibit D - Docket 041 Order).(Clare, Thomas) Modified on 1/29/2024 (vf).
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anna Kaul on behalf of A360 MEDIA LLC..(Kaul, Anna)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff:. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/28/2024 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Kotowski, Linda)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying #21 Motion to Seal. On January 8, 2024, the Court denied plaintiff's motion to proceed pseudonymously as moot, after plaintiff withdrew the motion. See 1/8/24 Order, ECF No. 41. When plaintiff's motion to proceed pseudonymously was still pending, defendant filed a motion to file certain documents under seal to protect plaintiff's identity. See Def. Mot. for Leave to File Under Seal, ECF No. 21. Because plaintiff's motion to proceed pseudonymously has now been denied, defendant's motion to file certain documents under seal is also denied. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to unseal docket entry number 20 and is directed to close docket entry number 21. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/11/2024) (vfr)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL granting #37 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the request to withdraw G. Taylor Wilson as counsel for Plaintiff Jane Doe, is granted, and the appearance of Mr. Wilson is withdrawn as of the date of this Order. Attorney G. Taylor Wilson terminated. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/11/2024) (vfr)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying as moot #4 Motion to proceed pseudonymously . On January 8, 2024, plaintiff's counsel informed the Court that plaintiff would like to withdraw the motion to proceed pseudonyrnously. See ECF No. 4. Accordingly, plaintiff's motion to proceed pseudonymously is denied as moot. On consent of defense counsel, plaintiff will have until January 26, 2024, to file an amended complaint. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close docket entry number 4. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/8/2024) (vfr)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #35 Motion for Thomas A. Clare to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Thomas A. Clare for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys.(Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/8/24) (yv)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #38 Motion for Kathryn Gordon Humphrey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Kathryn G. Humphrey for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/8/24) (yv)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/26/2024. (vfr)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: ( Oral Argument set for 1/23/2024 at 12:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff in courtroom 14B of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York City, New York..). (Kotowski, Linda)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 38 AMENDED MOTION for Kathryn Gordon Humphrey to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by "Jane" Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Kathryn G. Humphrey, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (MD), #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (VA), #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Humphrey, Kathryn)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #38 AMENDED MOTION for Kathryn Gordon Humphrey to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for G. Taylor Wilson to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by "Jane" Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of G. Taylor Wilson, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Clare, Thomas)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Kathryn G. Humphrey to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28768074. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by "Jane" Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Kathryn G. Humphrey in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - MD, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - VA, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Clare, Thomas) Modified on 1/4/2024 (rju).
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Thomas A. Clare, P.C. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28767980. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by "Jane" Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Thomas A. Clare in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - DC, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - VA, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Clare, Thomas)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #36 MOTION for Kathryn G. Humphrey to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28768074. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from District of Columbia; Filing under an another individual's Pacer account requires a wet signature on the documents;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (rju)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #35 MOTION for Thomas A. Clare, P.C. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28767980. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff:. Oral Argument set for 1/10/2024 at 05:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff in courtroom 14B of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York City, New York. (Kotowski, Linda)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Georgia Northern; Case Number: 1:23-cv-02954. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received.
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(tro)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (tro)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions..(tro)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (tro)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. It is ORDERED that Defendant A360 Media's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue #19 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART AS MOOT. The Motion is GRANTED as to Defendant's motion to transfer the case to the Southern District of New York. The Motion is otherwise DENIED AS MOOT in light of the transfer. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this action and Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed Pseudonymously #4 are TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 12/12/2023. (dnb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Submission of #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to District Judge Victoria M. Calvert. (dnb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by A360 Media LLC. (Schell, Jacquelyn) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Submission of #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to District Judge Victoria M. Calvert. (vs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of filing of Mark Thomson's Certificate of Consent to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Jane Doe (Thomson, Mark) Modified to edit docket text on 10/3/2023 (dnb). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Submission of #21 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #20 Notice of Filing, of Provisionally Sealed Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, to District Judge Victoria M. Calvert. (vs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPLY BRIEF re #4 MOTION to proceed pseudonymously filed by Jane Doe. (Clare, Thomas) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jane Doe. (Clare, Thomas) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Submission of #4 MOTION to proceed pseudonymously , to District Judge Victoria M. Calvert. (vs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Isabella Salomao Nascimento. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 8/28/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dnb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #27 APPLICATION for Admission of Isabella Salomao Nascimento Pro Hac Vice(Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12828825). Attorney Isabella Nascimento added appearing on behalf of A360 Media LLC. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re #28 Order on Application for Admission PHV to Isabella Salomao Nascimento (dnb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 APPLICATION for Admission of Isabella Salomao Nascimento Pro Hac Vice.by A360 Media LLC. (Schell, Jacquelyn) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #19 , and to reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed Pseudonymously #22 .Time is extended through and until September 22, 2023. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 8/23/2023. (dnb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order RETURN of #25 APPLICATION for Admission of Isabella Salomao Nascimento Pro Hac Vice. to attorney for correction. Reason for return: Local counsels address must match on both the application and CM/ECF. (djs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 APPLICATION for Admission of Isabella Salomao Nascimento Pro Hac Vice.by A360 Media LLC. (Schell, Jacquelyn) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order RETURN of #23 APPLICATION for Admission of Isabella Salomao Nascimento Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12828825) to attorney for correction. Reason for return: Local counsel's address must be within the NDGA. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time re: #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #22 Response in Opposition to Motion to Proceed Pseudonymously by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Pl.'s Unopposed Mot. for Extension of Time)(Clare, Thomas) Modified to edit docket text on 8/23/2023 (dnb). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 APPLICATION for Admission of Isabella Salomao Nascimento Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12828825).by A360 Media LLC. (Schell, Jacquelyn) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to proceed pseudonymously filed by A360 Media LLC. (Schell, Jacquelyn) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #20 Notice of Filing, of Provisionally Sealed Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Brief In Support by A360 Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Schell, Jacquelyn) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PROVISIONALLY SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by A360 Media LLC re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Musk Welcomes Twins with Zilis article, #3 Exhibit B - Who is Zilis article, #4 Exhibit C - Zilis Instagram post, #5 Exhibit D - Zilis Tweet, #6 Exhibit E - Michael Rogge Declaration)(Schell, Jacquelyn) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or Transfer Venue with Brief In Support by A360 Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support - Redacted, #2 Exhibit A - Musk Welcomes Twins with Zilis Article - Redacted, #3 Exhibit B - Who is Zilis article - Redacted, #4 Exhibit C - Zilis Instagram post - Redacted, #5 Exhibit D - Zilis Tweet - Redacted, #6 Exhibit E - Michael Rogge Declaration - Redacted)(Schell, Jacquelyn) Modified on 8/21/2023 (dnb). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. A360 Media LLC Answer due 8/18/2023. A360's time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint and Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed Pseudonymously is extended through and until 8/18/2023. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 7/25/2023. (nmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by A360 Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schell, Jacquelyn) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by A360 Media LLC identifying Corporate Parent Accelerate360 Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent A360 Media Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Accelerate360 Intermediate Holdco, LLC, Corporate Parent Worldwide Media Services Group, Inc. for A360 Media LLC. (Schell, Jacquelyn) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacquelyn Nicole Schell on behalf of A360 Media LLC (Schell, Jacquelyn) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL IN CASES PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE VICTORIA M. CALVERT. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 7/12/23. (vs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe. A360 Media LLC served on 7/7/2023, answer due 7/28/2023. (Wilson, G.) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark Thomson. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on July 12, 2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lwb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas A. Clare. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on July 12, 2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lwb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Attorney Thomas Clare re #11 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (lwb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Attorney Mark Thomson re #12 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (lwb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas A. Clare Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12729960)Attorney Thomas A. Clare added appearing on behalf of Jane Doe. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark Thomson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12726884) Attorney Mark Thomson added appearing on behalf of Jane Doe. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas A. Clare Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12729960).by Jane Doe. (Wilson, G.) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.[Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Thomas A. Clare. Clerk to follow-up by 7/20/2023. (djs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark Thomson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12726884).by Jane Doe. (Wilson, G.) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket text only) granting #7 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Entered by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 7/7/23. (vs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #6 Notice of Filing Provisional De-Anonymized Complaint with Brief In Support by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Wilson, G.) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Provisional De-Anonymized Complaint by Jane Doe (Wilson, G.) Modified on 7/7/2023 (vs). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE by Jane Doe of Filing Provisional De-Anonymized Complaint (Wilson, G.) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed Pseudonymously with Brief In Support by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jane Doe, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilson, G.) Modified on 7/6/2023 (lwb). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jane Doe. (Wilson, G.) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to A360 Media LLC. (tht) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jane Doe (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12713463) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tht) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/20/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. A360 Media LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Police Officer "Jane" Doe
Represented By: G. Taylor Wilson
Represented By: Thomas A. Clare
Represented By: Mark Thomson
Represented By: Thomas Clare
Represented By: Kathryn Gordon Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Bloom
Represented By: Thomas Clare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A360 MEDIA LLC
Represented By: Isabella Salomao Nascimento
Represented By: Jacquelyn Nicole Schell
Represented By: Anna Kaul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?