Association of Contracting Plumbers of The City of New York, Inc. et al v. City of New York
Plaintiff: Association of Contracting Plumbers of The City of New York, Inc., Plumbing-Heating-Cooling Contractors-National Association, Plumbers Local Union No. 1, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, New York State Energy Coalition, Inc., Plumbing Foundation City of New York, Inc., Licensed Plumbing Association of New York City, Inc., Building Industry Association of New York City, Inc. and Licensed Plumbing Association of New York City, Inc. doing business as Master Plumbers Council of the City of New York
Defendant: CITY OF NEW YORK
Case Number: 1:2023cv11292
Filed: December 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 6201 Energy Policy & Conservation Act (statement of purpose)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/25/2024) (ks)
January 25, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Motions due by 3/1/2024., Responses due by 3/29/2024, Replies due by 4/19/2024.) (ks)
January 23, 2024 Filing 17 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time and to Adjourn Case Management Conference addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Sarah Jorgensen dated 1/23/24. Document filed by Association of Contracting Plumbers of The City of New York, Inc., Building Industry Association of New York City, Inc., Licensed Plumbing Association of New York City, Inc., New York State Energy Coalition, Inc., Plumbers Local Union No. 1, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, Plumbing Foundation City of New York, Inc., Plumbing-Heating-Cooling Contractors-National Association..(Jorgensen, Sarah)
January 23, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alice R Baker on behalf of City of New York..(Baker, Alice)
January 22, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christian Chase Harned on behalf of City of New York..(Harned, Christian)
January 22, 2024 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order and Notice of Initial Conference (Doc. 13) served on City of New York on January 18, 2024. Service was made by Email. Document filed by Association of Contracting Plumbers of The City of New York, Inc., Building Industry Association of New York City, Inc., Licensed Plumbing Association of New York City, Inc., New York State Energy Coalition, Inc., Plumbers Local Union No. 1, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, Plumbing Foundation City of New York, Inc., Plumbing-Heating-Cooling Contractors-National Association..(Jorgensen, Sarah)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/15/2024 at 02:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. The parties shall use the following dial-in information to call in to the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. This conference line is open to the public. Plaintiff is ordered to serve Defendant with a copy of this order and to file an affidavit on ECF certifying that such service has been effectuated. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/18/2024) (mml)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Courtland L. Reichman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (arc)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Brian C. Baran to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (arc)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Sarah O. Jorgensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (arc)
January 16, 2024 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Ronnie Abrams and Judge Ronnie Abrams. Judge Gregory H. Woods is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
January 11, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Courtland L. Reichman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28796654. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Association of Contracting Plumbers of The City of New York, Inc., Building Industry Association of New York City, Inc., Licensed Plumbing Association of New York City, Inc., New York State Energy Coalition, Inc., Plumbers Local Union No. 1, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, Plumbing Foundation City of New York, Inc., Plumbing-Heating-Cooling Contractors-National Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Courtland L. Reichman, #2 Proposed Order for Admission PHV of Courtland L. Reichman).(Reichman, Courtland)
January 11, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Courtland L. Reichman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28796654. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
January 9, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Brian C. Baran to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28783394. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
January 8, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Brian C. Baran to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28783394. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Association of Contracting Plumbers of The City of New York, Inc., Building Industry Association of New York City, Inc., Licensed Plumbing Association of New York City, Inc., New York State Energy Coalition, Inc., Plumbers Local Union No. 1, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, Plumbing Foundation City of New York, Inc., Plumbing-Heating-Cooling Contractors-National Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Brian C. Baran, #2 Proposed Order for Admission PHV of Brian C. Baran).(Baran, Brian)
January 4, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. City of New York served on 1/4/2024, answer due 1/25/2024. Document filed by Licensed Plumbing Association of New York City, Inc.; Plumbers Local Union No. 1, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada; Plumbing-Heating-Cooling Contractors-National Association; Building Industry Association of New York City, Inc.; Association of Contracting Plumbers of The City of New York, Inc.; New York State Energy Coalition, Inc.; Plumbing Foundation City of New York, Inc...(Walters, Caroline)
January 4, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Sarah O. Jorgensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28767095. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Association of Contracting Plumbers of The City of New York, Inc., Building Industry Association of New York City, Inc., Licensed Plumbing Association of New York City, Inc., New York State Energy Coalition, Inc., Plumbers Local Union No. 1, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, Plumbing Foundation City of New York, Inc., Plumbing-Heating-Cooling Contractors-National Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sarah O. Jorgensen, #2 Proposed Order for Admission PHV of Sarah O. Jorgensen).(Jorgensen, Sarah)
January 4, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Sarah O. Jorgensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28767095. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
January 2, 2024 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York. (vf)
January 2, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Caroline Walters. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Licensed Plumbing Association of New York City, Inc., CITY OF NEW YORK. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; alias party type was entered incorrectly. (vf)
January 2, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
January 2, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
January 2, 2024 Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
December 29, 2023 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Association of Contracting Plumbers of The City of New York, Inc., Building Industry Association of New York City, Inc., Licensed Plumbing Association of New York City, Inc., New York State Energy Coalition, Inc., Plumbers Local Union No. 1, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, Plumbing Foundation City of New York, Inc., Plumbing-Heating-Cooling Contractors-National Association..(Walters, Caroline)
December 29, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Association of Contracting Plumbers of The City of New York, Inc., Building Industry Association of New York City, Inc., Licensed Plumbing Association of New York City, Inc., New York State Energy Coalition, Inc., Plumbers Local Union No. 1, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, Plumbing Foundation City of New York, Inc., Plumbing-Heating-Cooling Contractors-National Association..(Walters, Caroline)
December 29, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Walters, Caroline)
December 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF NEW YORK. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28751038)Document filed by Licensed Plumbing Association of New York City, Inc., Plumbers Local Union No. 1, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, Plumbing-Heating-Cooling Contractors-National Association, Building Industry Association of New York City, Inc., Association of Contracting Plumbers of The City of New York, Inc., New York State Energy Coalition, Inc., Plumbing Foundation City of New York, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D).(Walters, Caroline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Association of Contracting Plumbers of The City of New York, Inc. et al v. City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association of Contracting Plumbers of The City of New York, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline Walters
Represented By: Courtland Reichman
Represented By: Sarah O. Jorgensen
Represented By: Brian C. Baran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbing-Heating-Cooling Contractors-National Association
Represented By: Caroline Walters
Represented By: Courtland Reichman
Represented By: Sarah O. Jorgensen
Represented By: Brian C. Baran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers Local Union No. 1, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada
Represented By: Caroline Walters
Represented By: Courtland Reichman
Represented By: Sarah O. Jorgensen
Represented By: Brian C. Baran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York State Energy Coalition, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline Walters
Represented By: Courtland Reichman
Represented By: Sarah O. Jorgensen
Represented By: Brian C. Baran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbing Foundation City of New York, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline Walters
Represented By: Courtland Reichman
Represented By: Sarah O. Jorgensen
Represented By: Brian C. Baran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Licensed Plumbing Association of New York City, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Building Industry Association of New York City, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline Walters
Represented By: Courtland Reichman
Represented By: Sarah O. Jorgensen
Represented By: Brian C. Baran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Licensed Plumbing Association of New York City, Inc. doing business as Master Plumbers Council of the City of New York
Represented By: Courtland Reichman
Represented By: Sarah O. Jorgensen
Represented By: Brian C. Baran
Represented By: Caroline Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Alice R Baker
Represented By: Christian Chase Harned
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?