Association of American Railroads et al v. Seggos et al
Plaintiff: Association of American Railroads, American Short Line and Regional Railroad Association and National Waste & Recycling Association - New York State Chapter
Defendant: Basil Seggos and Letitia James
Case Number: 1:2024cv00135
Filed: January 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2024 Filing 28 AFFIRMATION of Philip Bein in Support re: #26 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Letitia James, Basil Seggos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Morgan, Elizabeth)
March 6, 2024 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #26 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Letitia James, Basil Seggos..(Morgan, Elizabeth)
March 6, 2024 Filing 26 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Letitia James, Basil Seggos. Responses due by 3/20/2024.(Morgan, Elizabeth)
March 4, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Morgan on behalf of Letitia James, Basil Seggos..(Morgan, Elizabeth)
February 14, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Slaughter on behalf of National Waste & Recycling Association - New York State Chapter..(Slaughter, James)
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for James B. Slaughter to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (arc)
February 13, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #22 MOTION for James B. Slaughter to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (laq)
February 12, 2024 Filing 22 MOTION for James B. Slaughter to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by National Waste & Recycling Association - New York State Chapter. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of J. Slaughter in Support, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing DC and VA Sup. Ct, #3 Proposed Order granting J. Slaughter admission to practice Pro Hac Vice).(Slaughter, James)
January 29, 2024 Filing 21 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for James B. Slaughter to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28870488. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by National Waste & Recycling Association - New York State Chapter. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James Slaughter in Support, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing DC and VA Bars, #3 Proposed Order granting J. Slaughter admission to practice Pro Hac Vice).(Slaughter, James) Modified on 1/29/2024 (vba).
January 29, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #21 MOTION for James B. Slaughter to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28870488. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Virginia;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (vba)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/25/2024) (ks)
January 25, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Letitia James answer due 3/6/2024; Basil Seggos answer due 3/6/2024. (ks)
January 24, 2024 Filing 19 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to answer or move addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Philp Bein dated January 24, 2024. Document filed by Letitia James, Basil Seggos..(Bein, Philip)
January 24, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Philip Michael Bein on behalf of Letitia James, Basil Seggos..(Bein, Philip)
January 22, 2024 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order and Notice of Initial Conference (Dkt. 16) served on Defendants Basil Seggos and Letitia James on January 18, 2024. Service was accepted by Philip Bein, counsel for both Defendants. Document filed by American Short Line and Regional Railroad Association, Association of American Railroads..(Dupree, Thomas)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that, by April 5, 2024, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs, as further set forth in this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by April 5, 2024, the parties jointly submit to the Court a proposed case management plan and scheduling order. Initial Status Conference set for 4/12/2024 at 02:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.The parties shall use the following dial-in information to call in to the conference: Call-in Number: (888)363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. This conference line is open to the public. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/18/2024) (tro)
January 17, 2024 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Letitia James served on 1/10/2024, answer due 1/31/2024. Service was accepted by Amber Schofield/ Co-Worker. Document filed by Association of American Railroads; American Short Line and Regional Railroad Association..(Dupree, Thomas)
January 17, 2024 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Basil Seggos served on 1/10/2024, answer due 1/31/2024. Service was accepted by Mark Sanza, Esq./ Co-Worker. Document filed by Association of American Railroads; American Short Line and Regional Railroad Association..(Dupree, Thomas)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Thomas H. Dupree Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (arc)
January 9, 2024 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by National Waste & Recycling Association - New York State Chapter..(Brillault, Megan)
January 9, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Gerard Murphy on behalf of National Waste & Recycling Association - New York State Chapter..(Murphy, Michael)
January 9, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Megan Rose Brillault on behalf of National Waste & Recycling Association - New York State Chapter..(Brillault, Megan)
January 9, 2024 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Letitia James..(pc)
January 9, 2024 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Basil Seggos..(pc)
January 9, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Thomas H. Dupree Jr., to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28783628. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
January 9, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
January 9, 2024 Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
January 9, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Thomas Henderson Dupree, Jr. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Letitia James, Basil Seggos. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
January 9, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 8, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Thomas H. Dupree Jr., to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28783628. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Short Line and Regional Railroad Association, Association of American Railroads. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Thomas H. Dupree Jr., #2 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Dupree, Thomas)
January 8, 2024 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Letitia James, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Short Line and Regional Railroad Association, Association of American Railroads..(Dupree, Thomas)
January 8, 2024 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Basil Seggos, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Short Line and Regional Railroad Association, Association of American Railroads..(Dupree, Thomas)
January 8, 2024 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Association of American Railroads..(Dupree, Thomas)
January 8, 2024 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Short Line and Regional Railroad Association..(Dupree, Thomas)
January 8, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Dupree, Thomas)
January 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Letitia James, Basil Seggos. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28782093)Document filed by Association of American Railroads, National Waste & Recycling Association - New York State Chapter, American Short Line and Regional Railroad Association..(Dupree, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Association of American Railroads et al v. Seggos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association of American Railroads
Represented By: Thomas Henderson Dupree, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Short Line and Regional Railroad Association
Represented By: Thomas Henderson Dupree, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Waste & Recycling Association - New York State Chapter
Represented By: Megan Rose Brillault
Represented By: Michael Gerard Murphy
Represented By: James Slaughter
Represented By: Thomas Henderson Dupree, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Basil Seggos
Represented By: Philip Michael Bein
Represented By: Elizabeth Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Letitia James
Represented By: Elizabeth Morgan
Represented By: Philip Michael Bein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?