Parker v. Bursor et al
Plaintiff: Angelica Parker
Defendant: Scott Bursor and Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00245
Filed: January 11, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jessica G L Clarke
Referring Judge: Robyn F Tarnofsky
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 nr Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #39 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline for objections to the Report & Recommendation (ECF No. 25) is hereby EXTENDED to March 5, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke on 2/1/2024) (ks)
February 1, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Objections to R&R due by 3/5/2024 (ks)
January 31, 2024 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Memo Endorsement (Doc. No. 38); Letter Motion (Doc. No. 39) served on Plaintiff Angelica Parker on 01/29/2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Scott Bursor, Bursor & Fisher, P.A...(Burstein, Judd)
January 31, 2024 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Memo Endorsement (Doc. No. 38); Letter Motion (Doc. No. 39) served on Plaintiff Angelica Parker on 01/29/2024. Service was made by E-Mail. Document filed by Scott Bursor, Bursor & Fisher, P.A...(Burstein, Judd)
January 30, 2024 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael John Willemin on behalf of Angelica Parker..(Willemin, Michael)
January 30, 2024 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeanne-Marie Bates Christensen on behalf of Angelica Parker..(Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
January 29, 2024 Filing 39 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to Report and Recommendation addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Judd Burstein dated 01/29/2024. Document filed by Scott Bursor, Bursor & Fisher, P.A...(Burstein, Judd)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #37 Letter, filed by Angelica Parker ENDORSEMENT Plaintiff's request for an extension is GRANTED. Plaintiff must submit her Complaint by February 12, 2024. The submission shall be to the Pro Se Intake Office unless Plaintiff retains counsel before then. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky on 1/29/2024) (jca)
January 29, 2024 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 34. Mailed to: Angelica Parker 400 East 57th Street Apt 15A. New York, NY 10022. (mt)
January 26, 2024 Filing 37 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky from A. Parker, dated 1/25/24 re: I am emailing you for a request for a short extension on the time orignally agreed to (1/29/24) to electronically file my /Complaint without missing any due dates. My case is being extraordinarily rushed and moved through several jurisdictions by defendant and their counsel etc. Document filed by Angelica Parker.(sc)
January 26, 2024 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 25. Mailed to: Angelica Parker 400 East 57th Street Apt 15A. New York, NY 10022. (mt)
January 26, 2024 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 30. Mailed to: Angelica Parker 400 East 57th Street Apt 15A. New York, NY 10022. (mt)
January 25, 2024 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order (Doc. No. 34) served on Plaintiff Angelica Parker on 01/25/2024. Service was accepted by John Doe, building doorman. Document filed by Scott Bursor, Bursor & Fisher, P.A...(Burstein, Judd)
January 25, 2024 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order (Doc. No. 34) served on Plaintiff Angelica Parker on 01/25/2024. Service was made by E-Mail. Document filed by Scott Bursor, Bursor & Fisher, P.A...(Burstein, Judd)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER terminating #31 Letter Motion to Stay re: #31 AMENDED LETTER MOTION to Stay re: #25 Report and Recommendations, Corrected Version addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Judd Burstein dated 01/24/2024., #27 LETTER MOTION to Stay re: #25 Report and Recommendations, addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Judd Burstein dated 01/24/2024. ; terminating #27 Letter Motion to Stay re: #31 AMENDED LETTER MOTION to Stay re: #25 Report and Recommendations, Corrected Version addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Judd Burstein dated 01/24/2024., #27 LETTER MOTION to Stay re: #25 Report and Recommendations, addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Judd Burstein dated 01/24/2024. At this juncture, this Court has neither adopted nor rejected Magistrate Judge Tarnofsky's Report & Recommendation (ECF No. 25), and thus there is no need for a stay. The Court will determine whether to adopt the Report & Recommendation, after receiving objections, which are due no later than February 7, 2024. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to file any forthcoming complaint fully under seal. The Court will determine whether to unseal the complaint, in whole or in part, when considering the Report & Recommendation and any objections thereto. In the meantime, the Court will temporarily seal the Report & Recommendation. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF Nos. 27 and 31 and to seal ECF No. 25. Access is restricted to attorneys appearing for the parties and court personnel. (Signed by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke on 1/25/2024) (rro)
January 25, 2024 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Corrected Report and Recommendation and Opinion and Order (Doc. No. 25); Corrected Letter Motion (Doc. No. 31) served on Plaintiff Angelica Parker on 01/25/2024. Service was accepted by John Doe, building doorman. Document filed by Scott Bursor, Bursor & Fisher, P.A...(Burstein, Judd)
January 25, 2024 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Corrected Report and Recommendation and Opinion and Order (Doc. No. 25); Corrected Letter Motion (Doc. No. 31) served on Plaintiff Angelica Parker on 01/24/2024 and 01/25/2024. Service was made by E-Mail. Document filed by Scott Bursor, Bursor & Fisher, P.A...(Burstein, Judd)
January 25, 2024 Filing 31 AMENDED LETTER MOTION to Stay re: #25 Report and Recommendations,,,,,,,, Corrected Version addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Judd Burstein dated 01/24/2024. Document filed by Scott Bursor, Bursor & Fisher, P.A...(Burstein, Judd)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying as moot #26 Letter Motion to Seal: The application is made moot by the issuance of a corrected order. So Ordered.(HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky)(Text Only Order) Copies of Notice of Electronic Filing Mailed By Chambers. (ah)
January 24, 2024 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Letter Motion (Doc. No. 26); Letter Motion (Doc. No. 27) served on Plaintiff Angelica Parker on 01/24/2024. Service was accepted by Ray, building doorman. Document filed by Scott Bursor, Bursor & Fisher, P.A...(Burstein, Judd)
January 24, 2024 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Letter Motion (Doc. No. 26); Letter Motion (Doc. No. 27) served on Plaintiff Angelica Parker on 01/24/2024. Service was made by E-Mail. Document filed by Scott Bursor, Bursor & Fisher, P.A...(Burstein, Judd)
January 24, 2024 Filing 27 LETTER MOTION to Stay re: #25 Report and Recommendations,,,,,,, addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Judd Burstein dated 01/24/2024. Document filed by Scott Bursor, Bursor & Fisher, P.A...(Burstein, Judd)
January 24, 2024 Filing 26 LETTER MOTION to Seal /Redact the Report and Recommendation (Doc. No. 25) addressed to Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky from Judd Burstein dated 01/24/2024. Document filed by Scott Bursor, Bursor & Fisher, P.A...(Burstein, Judd)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CORRECTED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND OPINION AND ORDER re: #12 LETTER MOTION to Seal Defendants' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order addressed to Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky from Judd Burstein dated 01/19/2024. filed by Scott Bursor, Bursor & Fisher, P.A. For the foregoing reasons, I respectfully recommend that Defendants' application to seal the filings in support of their motion for a TRO and PI (ECF 13, 14, 15, and 16) be GRANTED IN PART to the extent that those filings be permitted to remain sealed; and that Defendants application to seal the filings in support of their motion for a TRO and PI be DENIED IN PART to the extent that Defendants be ordered to file on the public docket, within seven days of an order addressing their sealing application, versions of ECF Document Numbers 13, 14, 15, and 16 that redact all references to the allegations that could identify or harm minor children. I further respectfully recommend that Defendants' motion for a TRO and PI requiring Plaintiff to file the complaint under seal be GRANTED IN PART to the extent that Plaintiff be ordered not to file a complaint on the public docket without first redacting any minor's identifying information and any allegations that could cause harm to minors if publicly disclosed; and DENIED IN PART in all other regards, without prejudice to their refiling their motion once the complaint has been filed. Notwithstanding any of the foregoing, it is ORDERED that if Plaintiff files her complaint before Judge Clarke has an opportunity to review this Report and Recommendation and issue an order addressing Defendants' motion for a TRO and PI, that complaint shall be held under seal by the Clerk of Court temporarily, until such time as Judge Clarke issues such order. SO ORDERED. Objections to R&R due by 2/7/2024 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky on 1/24/2024) (jca) (Main Document 25 replaced on 1/24/2024) (tro). (Main Document 25 replaced on 1/24/2024) (tro). Modified on 1/24/2024 (tro).
January 24, 2024 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky: Telephone Conference held on 1/24/2024. (ah)
January 24, 2024 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 22. Mailed to: Angelica Parker 400 East 57th Street Apt 15A. New York, NY 10022. (mt)
January 23, 2024 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Letter (Doc. No. 21); Memo Endorsement (Doc. No. 22) served on Plaintiff Angelica Parker on 01/23/2024. Service was accepted by Ray, building doorman. Document filed by Scott Bursor, Bursor & Fisher, P.A...(Burstein, Judd)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #21 Letter filed by Scott Bursor, Bursor & Fisher, P.A., ENDORSEMENT The parties' request to reschedule the telephone conference is GRANTED. The telephone conference is rescheduled for tomorrow, January 24, 2024, at 10:00 AM. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 1/24/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky on 1/23/2024) (jca)
January 23, 2024 Filing 21 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky from Judd Burstein dated 01/23/2024 re: Adjournment of January 24, 2024 Telephone Conference. Document filed by Scott Bursor, Bursor & Fisher, P.A...(Burstein, Judd)
January 23, 2024 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 18. Mailed to: Angelica Parker 400 East 57th Street Apt 15A. New York, NY 10022. (mt)
January 23, 2024 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 10. Mailed to: Angelica Parker 400 East 57th Street Apt 15A. New York, NY 10022. (mt)
January 22, 2024 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Telephone Conference Order (Doc. No. 18) served on Plaintiff Angelica Parker on 01/22/2024. Service was accepted by Ray, building doorman. Document filed by Scott Bursor, Bursor & Fisher, P.A...(Burstein, Judd)
January 22, 2024 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Telephone Conference Order (Doc. No. 18) served on Plaintiff Angelica Parker on 01/22/2024. Service was made by E-Mail. Document filed by Scott Bursor, Bursor & Fisher, P.A...(Burstein, Judd)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE ORDER Plaintiff filed her case against Defendants in state court by summons and notice on November 22, 2023. (ECF 1-1.) Defendants removed the case to this Court on January 11, 2024. (See ECF 1.) By Order of Reference dated January 17, 2024 (ECF 6), Judge Jessica G.L. Clarke referred this case to me for dispositive motions and general pretrial supervision, including scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement. On January 19, 2024, Defendants filed a motion for a preliminary injunction and a temporary restraining order, seeking an order requiring Plaintiff to file her complaint under seal for an amount of time sufficient to allow Defendants to move to strike portions of the complaint. (See ECF 11-16.) The parties will be heard by telephone conference on Wednesday, January 24, 2024, at 8:30 AM. At the conference, Plaintiff should also be prepared to address whether she intends to seek remand of this case back to state court. The parties are directed to join the conference via Microsoft Teams at the scheduled time by dialing (646) 453-4442, Access Code: 512 565 928 #. Additionally, counsel for Defendants is ORDERED to make every reasonable effort to inform Plaintiff of the contents of this Order by 5:00 PM today, January 22, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 1/24/2024 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky on 1/22/2024) (jca)
January 22, 2024 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #16 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief, was reviewed and approved as to form. (tp)
January 22, 2024 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 6. Mailed to: Angelica Parker 400 East 57th Street Apt 15A. New York, NY 10022. (mt)
January 19, 2024 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Letter (Doc. No. 12); Letter Motion (Doc. No. 13); Declaration with Exhibits, filed under seal (Doc. Nos. 13 through 13-10); Declaration with Exhibits, filed under seal (Doc. Nos. 14 through 14-4); Memorandum of Law, filed under seal (Doc. No. 15); Proposed Order to Show Cause, filed under seal (Doc. No. 16) served on Plaintiff Angelica Parker on 01/19/2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Scott Bursor, Bursor & Fisher, P.A...(Burstein, Judd)
January 19, 2024 Filing 16 ***SELECTED PARTIES***PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Bursor & Fisher, P.A., Scott Bursor, Angelica Parker. Related Document Number: #12 . Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #12 .(Burstein, Judd) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 19, 2024 Filing 15 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #12 LETTER MOTION to Seal Defendants' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order addressed to Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky from Judd Burstein dated 01/19/2024. . Document filed by Bursor & Fisher, P.A., Scott Bursor, Angelica Parker. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #12 .(Burstein, Judd)
January 19, 2024 Filing 14 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Scott A. Bursor in Support re: #12 LETTER MOTION to Seal Defendants' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order addressed to Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky from Judd Burstein dated 01/19/2024.. Document filed by Bursor & Fisher, P.A., Scott Bursor, Angelica Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #12 .(Burstein, Judd)
January 19, 2024 Filing 13 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Judd Burstein in Support re: #12 LETTER MOTION to Seal Defendants' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order addressed to Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky from Judd Burstein dated 01/19/2024.. Document filed by Bursor & Fisher, P.A., Scott Bursor, Angelica Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #12 .(Burstein, Judd)
January 19, 2024 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION to Seal Defendants' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order addressed to Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky from Judd Burstein dated 01/19/2024. Document filed by Scott Bursor, Bursor & Fisher, P.A...(Burstein, Judd)
January 19, 2024 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky from Judd Burstein dated 01/19/2024 re: Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order. Document filed by Scott Bursor, Bursor & Fisher, P.A...(Burstein, Judd)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Yesterday, my chambers received an ex parte email communication from counsel for Defendants. I am baffled why counsel made such a communication. When he previously made an ex parte email communication in connection with this mater to the chambers of Judge Clarke, he was directed to file the communication on the docket, which he did. To the extent it is in any way unclear, if counsel has an urgent mater that he believes requires an email to chambers pursuant to my Individual Rules, he should copy the opposing pro se party on that communication. Otherwise, the communication must be filed on the docket. Counsel for Defendant is Ordered to file his email to my chambers on the docket. If he wishes to make an application to make a sealed motion for a temporary restraining order directing Plaintiff to file her complaint under seal, he should, in accordance with Section III(E) of my Individual Rules, make an application, filed on the docket, that explains the reasons for seeking to file that submission under seal and addresses the request in light of the Court of Appeals' opinions in Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. of Onondaga, 435 F.3d 110 (2d Cir. 2006) and Bernstein v. Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossman LLP, 814 F.3d 132 (2d Cir. 2016). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky on 1/19/2024) (jca)
January 18, 2024 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order of Reference to a Magistrate Judge (Doc. No. 6) served on Plaintiff Angelica Parker on 01/18/2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Scott Bursor, Bursor & Fisher, P.A...(Burstein, Judd)
January 18, 2024 Filing 8 ***EX-PARTE*** LETTER addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Judd Burstein dated 01/18/2024 re: Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order. Document filed by Scott Bursor, Bursor & Fisher, P.A..Motion or Order to File Under Seal: .(Burstein, Judd)
January 17, 2024 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Civil Cover Sheet (Doc. No. 2); Rule 7.1 Statement (Doc. No. 3) served on Plaintiff Angelica Parker on 01/17/2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Scott Bursor, Bursor & Fisher, P.A...(Burstein, Judd)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation) All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky. (Signed by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke on 1/17/2024) (tg)
January 12, 2024 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal with Exhibits (Doc. Nos. 1 through 1-6) served on Plaintiff Angelica Parker on 01/12/2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Scott Bursor, Bursor & Fisher, P.A...(Burstein, Judd)
January 12, 2024 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Scott Bursor, Bursor & Fisher, P.A...(Burstein, Judd)
January 12, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Burstein, Judd)
January 12, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Judd Burstein. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Other Court Name NOT ENTERED; Other Court Number Supreme Court of the State of New York County of New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Other Court Name has been modified to NOT ENTERED; the Other Court Number has been modified to 952325/2023. (gp)
January 12, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Judd Burstein. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (gp)
January 12, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
January 12, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
January 12, 2024 Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
January 11, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 952325/2023. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28802532).Document filed by Bursor & Fisher, P.A., Scott Bursor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F).(Burstein, Judd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Bursor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelica Parker
Represented By: Michael John Willemin
Represented By: Jeanne-Marie Bates Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Bursor
Represented By: Judd Burstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
Represented By: Judd Burstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?