The Commissioner of the New York City Department of Social Services v. Buckeye Coach LLC et al
Plaintiff: The Commissioner of the New York City Department of Social Services
Defendant: Buckeye Coach LLC, Carduan Tours LLC, Classic Elegance Coaches LLC, Coastal Crew Change Company LLC, Ejecutivo Enterprises Inc., El Paso United Charters LLC, Garcia and Garcia Enterprises Inc. DBA Francisco Tours, JY Charter Bus Inc., Lily's Bus Lines Inc., Mayo Tours, Inc., Norteno Express LLC, Roadrunner Charters Inc, Southwest Crew Change Company LLC, Transportes Regiomontanos Inc. DBA Autobuses Regiomontanos, VLP Charter LLC, Windstar Lines Inc. and Wynne Transportation LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv00326
Filed: January 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2024 CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via UPS Tracking Number 1Z E22 E53 02 1005 491 7 on 2/16/2024..(rro)
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: It is therefore ORDERED that the case is REMANDED to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 2/14/2024) (rro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
February 8, 2024 Filing 38 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Elliot J. Kudisch dated February 8, 2024 re: Court's Disclosure of Pre-Existing Relationship with Counsel. Document filed by Buckeye Coach LLC, Carduan Tours LLC, Classic Elegance Coaches LLC, Coastal Crew Change Company LLC, Ejecutivo Enterprises Inc., El Paso United Charters LLC, Garcia and Garcia Enterprises Inc. DBA Francisco Tours, JY Charter Bus Inc., Lily's Bus Lines Inc., Mayo Tours, Inc., Norteno Express LLC, Southwest Crew Change Company LLC, Transportes Regiomontanos Inc. DBA Autobuses Regiomontanos, VLP Charter LLC, Windstar Lines Inc., Wynne Transportation LLC..(Kudisch, Elliot)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties may file any motions for disqualification by February 9, 2024. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 2/9/2024.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 2/7/2024) (tg)
February 6, 2024 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hamed Moradi Roodposhti on behalf of Buckeye Coach LLC, Carduan Tours LLC, Classic Elegance Coaches LLC, Coastal Crew Change Company LLC, Ejecutivo Enterprises Inc., El Paso United Charters LLC, Garcia and Garcia Enterprises Inc. DBA Francisco Tours, JY Charter Bus Inc., Lily's Bus Lines Inc., Mayo Tours, Inc., Norteno Express LLC, Roadrunner Charters Inc, Southwest Crew Change Company LLC, Transportes Regiomontanos Inc. DBA Autobuses Regiomontanos, VLP Charter LLC, Windstar Lines Inc., Wynne Transportation LLC..(Moradi Roodposhti, Hamed)
February 6, 2024 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark J Levine on behalf of Buckeye Coach LLC, Carduan Tours LLC, Classic Elegance Coaches LLC, Coastal Crew Change Company LLC, Ejecutivo Enterprises Inc., El Paso United Charters LLC, Garcia and Garcia Enterprises Inc. DBA Francisco Tours, JY Charter Bus Inc., Lily's Bus Lines Inc., Mayo Tours, Inc., Norteno Express LLC, Roadrunner Charters Inc, Southwest Crew Change Company LLC, Transportes Regiomontanos Inc. DBA Autobuses Regiomontanos, VLP Charter LLC, Windstar Lines Inc., Wynne Transportation LLC..(Levine, Mark)
February 6, 2024 Filing 34 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Steven Banks dated February 6, 2024 re: #33 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing on Preliminary Injunction or, alternatively Leave to File Sur-Reply addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Elliot Kudisch dated February 6, 2024. . Document filed by The Commissioner of the New York City Department of Social Services..(Banks, Steven)
February 6, 2024 Filing 33 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing on Preliminary Injunction or, alternatively Leave to File Sur-Reply addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Elliot Kudisch dated February 6, 2024. Document filed by Buckeye Coach LLC, Carduan Tours LLC, Classic Elegance Coaches LLC, Coastal Crew Change Company LLC, Ejecutivo Enterprises Inc., El Paso United Charters LLC, Garcia and Garcia Enterprises Inc. DBA Francisco Tours, JY Charter Bus Inc., Lily's Bus Lines Inc., Mayo Tours, Inc., Norteno Express LLC, Southwest Crew Change Company LLC, Transportes Regiomontanos Inc. DBA Autobuses Regiomontanos, VLP Charter LLC, Windstar Lines Inc., Wynne Transportation LLC..(Kudisch, Elliot)
February 5, 2024 Filing 32 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Steven Banks dated February 5, 2024 re: #8 LETTER MOTION for Conference re Plaintiff's January 4, 2024 Application for a Preliminary Injunction addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Steven Banks dated January 22, 2024. . Document filed by The Commissioner of the New York City Department of Social Services..(Banks, Steven)
February 5, 2024 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Alicia Berenyi in Support re: #8 LETTER MOTION for Conference re Plaintiff's January 4, 2024 Application for a Preliminary Injunction addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Steven Banks dated January 22, 2024.. Document filed by The Commissioner of the New York City Department of Social Services..(Banks, Steven)
February 5, 2024 Filing 30 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #8 LETTER MOTION for Conference re Plaintiff's January 4, 2024 Application for a Preliminary Injunction addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Steven Banks dated January 22, 2024. . Document filed by The Commissioner of the New York City Department of Social Services..(Banks, Steven)
February 5, 2024 Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion re: #8 LETTER MOTION for Conference re Plaintiff's January 4, 2024 Application for a Preliminary Injunction addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Steven Banks dated January 22, 2024. Supplemental Letter Brief in Opposition to Application for Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Buckeye Coach LLC, Carduan Tours LLC, Classic Elegance Coaches LLC, Coastal Crew Change Company LLC, Ejecutivo Enterprises Inc., El Paso United Charters LLC, Garcia and Garcia Enterprises Inc. DBA Francisco Tours, JY Charter Bus Inc., Lily's Bus Lines Inc., Mayo Tours, Inc., Norteno Express LLC, Southwest Crew Change Company LLC, Transportes Regiomontanos Inc. DBA Autobuses Regiomontanos, VLP Charter LLC, Windstar Lines Inc., Wynne Transportation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Herkert v. State).(Kudisch, Elliot)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Katherine S. Stewart to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (al)
February 1, 2024 Filing 27 MOTION for Katherine S. Stewart to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28892084. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The Commissioner of the New York City Department of Social Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Katherine S. Stewart, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Stewart, Katherine)
February 1, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #27 MOTION for Katherine S. Stewart to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28892084. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
January 31, 2024 Filing 26 SECOND LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Robert J Hantman Esq dated 01/31/24 re: Opposition to Request for an Injunction. Document filed by Roadrunner Charters Inc..(Hantman, Robert)
January 31, 2024 Filing 25 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Steven Banks dated January 31, 2024 re: Response to January 24, 2024 Order #9 . Document filed by The Commissioner of the New York City Department of Social Services..(Atkins, Robert)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Hamed Moradi to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (al)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Mark J. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (al)
January 31, 2024 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #8 LETTER MOTION for Conference re Plaintiff's January 4, 2024 Application for a Preliminary Injunction addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Steven Banks dated January 22, 2024. . Document filed by Buckeye Coach LLC, Carduan Tours LLC, Classic Elegance Coaches LLC, Coastal Crew Change Company LLC, Ejecutivo Enterprises Inc., El Paso United Charters LLC, Garcia and Garcia Enterprises Inc. DBA Francisco Tours, JY Charter Bus Inc., Lily's Bus Lines Inc., Mayo Tours, Inc., Norteno Express LLC, Southwest Crew Change Company LLC, Transportes Regiomontanos Inc. DBA Autobuses Regiomontanos, VLP Charter LLC, Windstar Lines Inc., Wynne Transportation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - NYC Executive Order 124, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - NYC Executive Order 224, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - NYC Executive Order 538, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Rumblings of Reform: Northern, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - Attorney General of California's Brief, Edwards v. California, 314 U.S. 160 (1941), #6 Exhibit Ex. F - Depression Migrants and the States, 53 Harv. L. Rev. 1031 (Apr. 1940)).(Kudisch, Elliot)
January 31, 2024 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re: #8 LETTER MOTION for Conference re Plaintiff's January 4, 2024 Application for a Preliminary Injunction addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Steven Banks dated January 22, 2024. Letter Response Regarding Subject-Matter Jurisdiction. Document filed by Buckeye Coach LLC, Carduan Tours LLC, Classic Elegance Coaches LLC, Coastal Crew Change Company LLC, Ejecutivo Enterprises Inc., El Paso United Charters LLC, Garcia and Garcia Enterprises Inc. DBA Francisco Tours, JY Charter Bus Inc., Lily's Bus Lines Inc., Mayo Tours, Inc., Norteno Express LLC, Southwest Crew Change Company LLC, Transportes Regiomontanos Inc. DBA Autobuses Regiomontanos, VLP Charter LLC, Windstar Lines Inc., Wynne Transportation LLC..(Kudisch, Elliot)
January 31, 2024 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Ron Wills Regarding Defendant. Document filed by Roadrunner Charters Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Hantman, Robert)
January 30, 2024 Filing 19 FIRST BRIEF . Document filed by Roadrunner Charters Inc..(Hantman, Robert)
January 30, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION for Hamed Moradi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Buckeye Coach LLC, Carduan Tours LLC, Classic Elegance Coaches LLC, Coastal Crew Change Company LLC, Ejecutivo Enterprises Inc., El Paso United Charters LLC, Garcia and Garcia Enterprises Inc. DBA Francisco Tours, JY Charter Bus Inc., Lily's Bus Lines Inc., Mayo Tours, Inc., Norteno Express LLC, Southwest Crew Change Company LLC, Transportes Regiomontanos Inc. DBA Autobuses Regiomontanos, VLP Charter LLC, Windstar Lines Inc., Wynne Transportation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Hamed Moradi, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order HMR Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice).(Kudisch, Elliot)
January 30, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Mark J. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Buckeye Coach LLC, Carduan Tours LLC, Classic Elegance Coaches LLC, Coastal Crew Change Company LLC, Ejecutivo Enterprises Inc., El Paso United Charters LLC, Garcia and Garcia Enterprises Inc. DBA Francisco Tours, JY Charter Bus Inc., Lily's Bus Lines Inc., Mayo Tours, Inc., Norteno Express LLC, Southwest Crew Change Company LLC, Transportes Regiomontanos Inc. DBA Autobuses Regiomontanos, VLP Charter LLC, Windstar Lines Inc., Wynne Transportation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Mark J. Levine, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order MJL Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice).(Kudisch, Elliot)
January 30, 2024 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - MOTION for Hamed Moradi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Buckeye Coach LLC, Carduan Tours LLC, Classic Elegance Coaches LLC, Coastal Crew Change Company LLC, Ejecutivo Enterprises Inc., El Paso United Charters LLC, Garcia and Garcia Enterprises Inc. DBA Francisco Tours, JY Charter Bus Inc., Lily's Bus Lines Inc., Mayo Tours, Inc., Norteno Express LLC, Southwest Crew Change Company LLC, Transportes Regiomontanos Inc. DBA Autobuses Regiomontanos, VLP Charter LLC, Windstar Lines Inc., Wynne Transportation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Hamed Moradi, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order HMR Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice).(Kudisch, Elliot) Modified on 1/30/2024 (bc).
January 30, 2024 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - MOTION for Mark J. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Buckeye Coach LLC, Carduan Tours LLC, Classic Elegance Coaches LLC, Coastal Crew Change Company LLC, Ejecutivo Enterprises Inc., El Paso United Charters LLC, Garcia and Garcia Enterprises Inc. DBA Francisco Tours, JY Charter Bus Inc., Lily's Bus Lines Inc., Mayo Tours, Inc., Norteno Express LLC, Southwest Crew Change Company LLC, Transportes Regiomontanos Inc. DBA Autobuses Regiomontanos, VLP Charter LLC, Windstar Lines Inc., Wynne Transportation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Mark J. Levine, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order MJL Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice).(Kudisch, Elliot) Modified on 1/30/2024 (bc).
January 30, 2024 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - MOTION for Hamed Moradi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28876963. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Buckeye Coach LLC, Carduan Tours LLC, Classic Elegance Coaches LLC, Coastal Crew Change Company LLC, Ejecutivo Enterprises Inc., El Paso United Charters LLC, Garcia and Garcia Enterprises Inc. DBA Francisco Tours, JY Charter Bus Inc., Lily's Bus Lines Inc., Mayo Tours, Inc., Norteno Express LLC, Southwest Crew Change Company LLC, Transportes Regiomontanos Inc. DBA Autobuses Regiomontanos, VLP Charter LLC, Windstar Lines Inc., Wynne Transportation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Hamed Moradi, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order HMR Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice).(Kudisch, Elliot) Modified on 1/30/2024 (bc).
January 30, 2024 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - MOTION for Mark J. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28876811. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Buckeye Coach LLC, Carduan Tours LLC, Classic Elegance Coaches LLC, Coastal Crew Change Company LLC, Ejecutivo Enterprises Inc., El Paso United Charters LLC, Garcia and Garcia Enterprises Inc. DBA Francisco Tours, JY Charter Bus Inc., Lily's Bus Lines Inc., Mayo Tours, Inc., Norteno Express LLC, Southwest Crew Change Company LLC, Transportes Regiomontanos Inc. DBA Autobuses Regiomontanos, VLP Charter LLC, Windstar Lines Inc., Wynne Transportation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Mark J. Levine, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order MJL Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice).(Kudisch, Elliot) Modified on 1/30/2024 (bc).
January 30, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #13 MOTION for Mark J. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28876811. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the motion was not signed; Wet Signature needed by Attorney;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bc)
January 30, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #14 MOTION for Hamed Moradi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28876963. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the motion was not signed; Wet Signature needed by Attorney;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bc)
January 30, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #16 MOTION for Hamed Moradi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Wet Signature needed by Attorney - Please call Attorney Services for assistance at 212-805-0800 ext 2. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bc)
January 30, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #17 MOTION for Mark J. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
January 30, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #15 MOTION for Mark J. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Wet Signature needed by Attorney;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bc)
January 30, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #18 MOTION for Hamed Moradi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
January 29, 2024 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Tanaz Moghadam re Service on Defendants. Document filed by The Commissioner of the New York City Department of Social Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Information on Defendant Buckeye Coach LLC).(Banks, Steven)
January 26, 2024 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Buckeye Coach LLC, Carduan Tours LLC, Classic Elegance Coaches LLC, Coastal Crew Change Company LLC, Ejecutivo Enterprises Inc., El Paso United Charters LLC, Garcia and Garcia Enterprises Inc. DBA Francisco Tours, JY Charter Bus Inc., Lily's Bus Lines Inc., Mayo Tours, Inc., Norteno Express LLC, Southwest Crew Change Company LLC, Transportes Regiomontanos Inc. DBA Autobuses Regiomontanos, VLP Charter LLC, Windstar Lines Inc., Wynne Transportation LLC..(Kudisch, Elliot)
January 25, 2024 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order Granting Letter Motion for Conference #9 served on Buckeye Coach LLC, Carduan Tours LLC, Classic Elegance Coaches LLC, Coastal Crew Change Company LLC, Ejecutivo Enterprises Inc., El Paso United Charters LLC, Garcia and Garcia Enterprises Inc. (d.b.a. Francisco Tours), JY Charter Bus Inc., Lily's Bus Lines Inc, Mayo Tours, Inc., Norteno Express LLC, Roadrunners Charters Inc., Southwest Crew Change Company LLC, Transportes Regiomontanos Inc. (d.b.a Autobuses Regiomontanos), VLP Charter LLC, Windstar Lines Inc., Wynne Transportation LLC on January 25, 2024. Service was made by FedEx and U.S. Mail. Document filed by The Commissioner of the New York City Department of Social Services..(Banks, Steven)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Conference re: #8 LETTER MOTION for Conference re Plaintiff's January 4, 2024 Application for a Preliminary Injunction addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Steven Banks dated January 22, 2024. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction by January 31, 2024, and Plaintiff shall file its reply papers in support of its motion by February 5, 2024. Before scheduling a hearing, the Court directs the parties to submit supplemental briefing addressing Defendant Roadrunner Charters Inc.'s contention that I have subject-matter jurisdiction over this action. To the extent the parties believe that diversity jurisdiction exists, they must demonstrate that all the members of each LLC are citizens of different states than all opposing parties. See Dumann Realty, LLC v. Faust, No. 09-cv-7651, 2013 WL 30672, at *2 (S.D.N.Y. Jan. 3, 2013). If the Court lacks jurisdiction, the parties shall explain why this case should not be remanded before a conference on the motion is held. The parties' letters shall be filed by January 31, 2024. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on all Defendants. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 1/24/2024) (rro)
January 24, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 1/31/2024 Replies due by 2/5/2024. (rro)
January 22, 2024 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Conference re Plaintiff's January 4, 2024 Application for a Preliminary Injunction addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Steven Banks dated January 22, 2024. Document filed by The Commissioner of the New York City Department of Social Services..(Banks, Steven)
January 19, 2024 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Tanaz Moghadam re Service of Process on Defendants. Document filed by The Commissioner of the New York City Department of Social Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavits of Service on Designated Agents, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavits of Service on NY Secretary of State, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavits of Service and Notice of Service by Registered Mail).(Banks, Steven)
January 19, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Darren Wright Johnson on behalf of The Commissioner of the New York City Department of Social Services..(Johnson, Darren)
January 19, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michele S. Hirshman on behalf of The Commissioner of the New York City Department of Social Services..(Hirshman, Michele)
January 19, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven R. Banks on behalf of The Commissioner of the New York City Department of Social Services..(Banks, Steven)
January 17, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Robert J Hantman to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; section (b) of the Origin code was incorrectly selected on the PDF;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
January 17, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert J Hantman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $708,000,000,000; Arbitration code v (Voluntary); Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to none; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
January 17, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
January 17, 2024 Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
January 17, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
January 16, 2024 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Roadrunner Charters Inc..(Hantman, Robert)
January 16, 2024 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hantman, Robert) Modified on 1/17/2024 (jgo).
January 16, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 150122/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28816473).Document filed by Roadrunner Charters Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Action Summons and Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Action Filings, #3 Exhibit Notice of filing of notice of removal - for filing in State Action).(Hantman, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Commissioner of the New York City Department of Social Services v. Buckeye Coach LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Commissioner of the New York City Department of Social Services
Represented By: Michele S. Hirshman
Represented By: Steven R. Banks
Represented By: Darren Wright Johnson
Represented By: Katherine Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Coach LLC
Represented By: Mark J Levine
Represented By: Elliot J. Kudisch
Represented By: Hamed Moradi Roodposhti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carduan Tours LLC
Represented By: Mark J Levine
Represented By: Elliot J. Kudisch
Represented By: Hamed Moradi Roodposhti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classic Elegance Coaches LLC
Represented By: Mark J Levine
Represented By: Elliot J. Kudisch
Represented By: Hamed Moradi Roodposhti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Crew Change Company LLC
Represented By: Mark J Levine
Represented By: Hamed Moradi Roodposhti
Represented By: Elliot J. Kudisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ejecutivo Enterprises Inc.
Represented By: Mark J Levine
Represented By: Hamed Moradi Roodposhti
Represented By: Elliot J. Kudisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso United Charters LLC
Represented By: Mark J Levine
Represented By: Elliot J. Kudisch
Represented By: Hamed Moradi Roodposhti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garcia and Garcia Enterprises Inc. DBA Francisco Tours
Represented By: Mark J Levine
Represented By: Elliot J. Kudisch
Represented By: Hamed Moradi Roodposhti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JY Charter Bus Inc.
Represented By: Elliot J. Kudisch
Represented By: Mark J Levine
Represented By: Hamed Moradi Roodposhti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lily's Bus Lines Inc.
Represented By: Mark J Levine
Represented By: Elliot J. Kudisch
Represented By: Hamed Moradi Roodposhti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayo Tours, Inc.
Represented By: Elliot J. Kudisch
Represented By: Mark J Levine
Represented By: Hamed Moradi Roodposhti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norteno Express LLC
Represented By: Elliot J. Kudisch
Represented By: Mark J Levine
Represented By: Hamed Moradi Roodposhti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roadrunner Charters Inc
Represented By: Robert J Hantman
Represented By: Mark J Levine
Represented By: Hamed Moradi Roodposhti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Crew Change Company LLC
Represented By: Mark J Levine
Represented By: Elliot J. Kudisch
Represented By: Hamed Moradi Roodposhti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transportes Regiomontanos Inc. DBA Autobuses Regiomontanos
Represented By: Mark J Levine
Represented By: Elliot J. Kudisch
Represented By: Hamed Moradi Roodposhti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VLP Charter LLC
Represented By: Elliot J. Kudisch
Represented By: Mark J Levine
Represented By: Hamed Moradi Roodposhti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windstar Lines Inc.
Represented By: Mark J Levine
Represented By: Elliot J. Kudisch
Represented By: Hamed Moradi Roodposhti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wynne Transportation LLC
Represented By: Elliot J. Kudisch
Represented By: Hamed Moradi Roodposhti
Represented By: Mark J Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?