Holloway Burgess v. The New School University et al
Plaintiff: M. Holloway Burgess
Defendant: The New School University, Katherine Wolkoff, Rachel Schrieber, Rhonnie Yaus, Arlene De La Rosa, Jennifer Penley, Dwight A. McBride, Renee T. White, Sonya Williams, Sarah Bogucki, Shana Agid, Kate Evanishyn and Yasamin Ghanbari
Case Number: 1:2024cv00368
Filed: January 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e-2e Job Discrimination (Unlawful Employment Practices)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to M. Holloway Burgess at 114 West 27th Street Apt. 5N New York, NY 10001, on 3/4/2024 Re: #11 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, a copy of the Mediation Referral Order for Pro Se Employment Discrimination Cases, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases), one or more summonses (only if you have paid the fee in person or if the judge has ordered that a summons be issued to you) - 13 Summons(es) mailed. (sha)
March 4, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS ISSUED as to New School University; Katherine Wolkoff; Rachel Schrieber; Rhonnie Yaus; Arlene De La Rosa; Jennifer Penley; Dwight A. McBride; Renee T. White; Sonya Williams; Sarah Bogucki; Shana Agid; Kate Evanishyn; and Yasamin Ghanbari. (sha)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF SERVICE: Motions terminated: #4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:23-cv-04944-JGK. MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Letter. filed by M. Holloway Burgess, #7 MOTION for Permission for M. Holloway Burgess to participate in electronic case filing in this case. filed by M. Holloway Burgess. Plaintiff, who is proceeding prose, paid the filing fees to commence this action. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue summonses as to Defendants the New School University; Katherine Wolkoff; Rachel Schrieber; Rhonnie Yaus; Arlene De La Rosa; Jennifer Penley; Dwight A. McBride; Renee T. White; Sonya Williams; Sarah Bogucki; Shana Agid; Kate Evanishyn; and Yasamin Ghanbari. Plaintiff is directed to serve the summons and complaint on each Defendant within 90 days of the issuance of the summonses. If within those 90 days, Plaintiff has not either served Defendants or requested an extension of time to do so, the Court may dismiss the claims against Defendants under Rules 4 and 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to prosecute. Plaintiff submitted a motion for permission for electronic case filing but left blank the question as to whether Plaintiff had completed the Court's CM/ECF introduction course. (ECF 7, P, 2.) The motion is denied without prejudice to renewal once Plaintiff submits a new motion indicating that they have completed that course. The motion for consolidation is denied as moot, because this matter has been assigned to me as related to Burgess v. New School Univ., No. 23-CV-4944 (JGK). The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate both motions. (ECF 4, 7.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 2/27/2024) (ks) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. Modified on 2/28/2024 (ks).
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR PRO SE EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION CASES: IT IS ORDERED that this pro se case is referred for mediation to the Court's Mediation Program. Local Civil Rule 83.9 and the Mediation Program Procedures shall govern the mediation. Unless otherwise ordered, the mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling order issued by this Court, and all parties are obligated to continue to litigate the case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall attempt to locate pro bona counsel to represent Plaintiff at the mediation. Pro bona counsel will contact Plaintiff directly. The time to assign a mediator under Local Civil Rule 83.9 and the Court's Mediation Program Procedures will be deferred until pro bona counsel has filed a Notice of Limited Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel. Pro bona counsel will represent Plaintiff solely for purposes of the mediation, and that representation will terminate at the conclusion of the mediation process. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any objection by Plaintiff either to the mediation or to the Court's request for pro bona counsel to represent Plaintiff in the mediation must be filed within 14 days of this order. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 2/27/2024) (rro)
February 23, 2024 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:23-cv-04944-JGK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba)
February 23, 2024 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John G. Koeltl. Judge Laura Taylor Swain is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
February 23, 2024 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
February 16, 2024 Pro Se Payment of Fee Processed: $405.00 Check processed by the Finance Department on 2/16/2024, Receipt Number 26454. (ss)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 2/20/2024. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 2/20/2024. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/18/2024) (sha)
January 18, 2024 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sgz)
January 16, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION re for Permission for M. Holloway Burgess to participate in electronic case filing in this case. Document filed by M. Holloway Burgess. (sac)
January 16, 2024 Filing 5 DECLARATION of M. Holloway Burgess in Support re: #4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:23-cv-04944-JGK. MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Letter. Document filed by M. Holloway Burgess. (sac)
January 16, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION re to Consolidate Cases 1:23-cv-04944-(JGK), MOTION re for Leave to File a Sealed Document Letter. Document filed by M. Holloway Burgess. (sac)
January 16, 2024 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:23-cv-04944-JGK. Document filed by M. Holloway Burgess. (sac)
January 16, 2024 Filing 2 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: M. Holloway Burgess consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by M. Holloway Burgess. (sac)
January 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shana Agid, Sarah Bogucki, Arlene De La Rosa, Kate Evanishyn, Yasamin Ghanbari, Dwight A. McBride, Jennifer Penley, Rachel Schrieber, The New School University, Renee T. White, Sonya Williams, Katherine Wolkoff, Rhonnie Yaus. Document filed by M. Holloway Burgess. (sac)
January 16, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
January 16, 2024 CASE REFERRED TO Judge John G. Koeltl as possibly related to 1:23-cv-04944-JGK. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holloway Burgess v. The New School University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. Holloway Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The New School University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Wolkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Schrieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonnie Yaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlene De La Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Penley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight A. McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee T. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonya Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Bogucki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shana Agid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate Evanishyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yasamin Ghanbari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?