Saliba et al v. Hanover Capital Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Layla Saliba, Geoffrey Kigongo, George Rauch, Kwaine Thompson and Kwaine Thompson Jr.
Defendant: Hanover Capital Group LLC, PREMIUM MERCHANT FUNDING ONE, LLC, Haim Llalouz and Yanathon Llalouz
Case Number: 1:2024cv00401
Filed: January 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2024 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Carl E. Zapffe, Esq. in Support re: #22 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,. Document filed by Geoffrey Kigongo, Kwaine Thompson Jr., George Rauch, Layla Saliba..(Zapffe, Carl)
March 15, 2024 Filing 22 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Geoffrey Kigongo, Kwaine Thompson Jr., George Rauch, Layla Saliba..(Zapffe, Carl) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
March 15, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney Carl Zapffe. RE-FILE Document No. #21 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Please refer to ECF Rule 16.1. Re-file the proposed clerk's certificate as one entry (Filed under Proposed Orders, Proposed Clerk's Certificate of default). The declaration in support is filed as a separate entry. (Filed under other answers, declaration in support of a non-motion. The signature date for the Deputy Clerk needs to be changed to March. (km)
March 14, 2024 Filing 21 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Geoffrey Kigongo, Kwaine Thompson Jr., George Rauch, Layla Saliba. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Request for Certificate of Default (as against Co-Defendant Hanover Capital Group LLC Only)).(Zapffe, Carl) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 3/15/2024 (km).
March 14, 2024 Filing 20 LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Carl E. Zapffe, Esq. dated March 14, 2024 re: Letter as requested by the Order to Show Cause. Document filed by Geoffrey Kigongo, Kwaine Thompson Jr., George Rauch, Layla Saliba..(Zapffe, Carl)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiffs initiated this action by filing a complaint on January 18, 2024. [ECF No. 1]. Affidavits of service of summons and complaint were filed on the docket on September 14, 2023. [ECF No. 11]. According to those summons, Defendant Hanover Capital Group LLC's response to the complaint was due February 26, 2024. [ECF No. 11]. No response was filed, and Plaintiffs have not prosecuted this case against Defendant Hanover Capital Group LLC to date. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, by March 25, 2024, Plaintiffs shall file a letter showing cause why this case should not be dismissed against Defendant Hanover Capital Group LLC pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiffs are on notice that they are ultimately responsible for prosecuting their case, and this case may be dismissed because of their chosen counsel's failure to prosecute this case. See Link v. Wabash R. Co., 370 U.S. 626, 633-34 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/11/2024) (tg)
March 5, 2024 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Yanathon Llalouz served on 3/5/2024, answer due 3/26/2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by George Rauch; Geoffrey Kigongo; Kwaine Thompson Jr. ; Layla Saliba..(Hines, Philip)
March 5, 2024 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Haim Llalouz served on 3/5/2024, answer due 3/26/2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by George Rauch; Geoffrey Kigongo; Kwaine Thompson Jr. ; Layla Saliba..(Hines, Philip)
March 4, 2024 Filing 16 LETTER from H. LLouz, re: We got a class action for labor. We cannot afford a lawyer. I would like to be able to represent myself. Document filed by Haim Llalouz.(sc)
March 4, 2024 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Haim Llalouz.(sc)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiffs and/or their counsel, hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily discontinued against defendant Premium Merchant Funding One, LLC only and without prejudice. Granted. SO ORDERED. Premium Merchant Funding One, LLC terminated. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/4/2024) (tg)
February 29, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carl Edward Zapffe on behalf of Geoffrey Kigongo, Kwaine Thompson Jr., George Rauch, Layla Saliba..(Zapffe, Carl)
February 29, 2024 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal,, was reviewed and referred to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety; the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal in a Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA) case. (tp)
February 28, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Premium Merchant Funding One, LLC. Document filed by George Rauch, Geoffrey Kigongo, Kwaine Thompson Jr., Layla Saliba. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Hines, Philip)
February 20, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Hanover Capital Group LLC served on 2/5/2024, answer due 2/26/2024. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, authorized agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by George Rauch; Geoffrey Kigongo; Kwaine Thompson Jr. ; Layla Saliba..(Hines, Philip)
January 19, 2024 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yanathon Llalouz. (vf)
January 19, 2024 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Haim Llalouz. (vf)
January 19, 2024 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Premium Merchant Funding One, LLC. (vf)
January 19, 2024 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hanover Capital Group LLC. (vf)
January 19, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Philip Michael Hines. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: PREMIUM MERCHANT FUNDING ONE, LLC, George Rauch, Geoffrey Kigongo, Layla Saliba, Kwaine Thompson. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted. (vf)
January 19, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Philip Michael Hines. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $50000000; Arbitration code e (Exempt). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 9,999,000; the Arbitration code has been deleted. (vf)
January 19, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
January 19, 2024 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
January 19, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
January 18, 2024 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Yanathon Llalouz, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Geoffrey Kigongo, George Rauch, Layla Saliba, Kwaine Thompson..(Hines, Philip)
January 18, 2024 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Haim Llalouz, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Geoffrey Kigongo, George Rauch, Layla Saliba, Kwaine Thompson..(Hines, Philip)
January 18, 2024 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Premium Merchant Funding One, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Geoffrey Kigongo, George Rauch, Layla Saliba, Kwaine Thompson..(Hines, Philip)
January 18, 2024 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hanover Capital Group LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Geoffrey Kigongo, George Rauch, Layla Saliba, Kwaine Thompson..(Hines, Philip)
January 18, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hines, Philip)
January 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hanover Capital Group LLC, Haim Llalouz, Yanathon Llalouz, PREMIUM MERCHANT FUNDING ONE, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28829272)Document filed by George Rauch, Geoffrey Kigongo, Layla Saliba, Kwaine Thompson..(Hines, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saliba et al v. Hanover Capital Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Layla Saliba
Represented By: Philip Michael Hines
Represented By: Carl Edward Zapffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geoffrey Kigongo
Represented By: Philip Michael Hines
Represented By: Carl Edward Zapffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Rauch
Represented By: Philip Michael Hines
Represented By: Carl Edward Zapffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kwaine Thompson
Represented By: Philip Michael Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kwaine Thompson Jr.
Represented By: Carl Edward Zapffe
Represented By: Philip Michael Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanover Capital Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PREMIUM MERCHANT FUNDING ONE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haim Llalouz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yanathon Llalouz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?