Wynne Transportation LLC v. City of New York
Plaintiff: Wynne Transportation LLC
Defendant: City of New York
Case Number: 1:2024cv01062
Filed: February 13, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 cm Fed. Question: Interstate Commerce Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2024 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. . Document filed by City of New York..(Moston, Rachel)
April 12, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Document filed by City of New York..(Moston, Rachel)
April 12, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Kane Moston on behalf of City of New York..(Moston, Rachel)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Conference re: #10 LETTER MOTION for Conference regarding permission to file a pre-answer motion to dismiss addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Rachel K. Moston dated 3/19/2024. The request is granted. Defendant shall file its motion to dismiss by April 12, 2024, Plaintiff shall file its opposition by May 10, 2024, and Defendant shall file any reply by May 31, 2024. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close Docket Number 10. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 3/21/2024) (jca)
March 21, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scali Riggs on behalf of City of New York..(Riggs, Scali)
March 21, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 4/12/2024. Responses due by 5/10/2024 Replies due by 5/31/2024. (jca)
March 20, 2024 Filing 11 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Elliot J. Kudisch dated March 20, 2024 re: Briefing Schedule. Document filed by Wynne Transportation LLC..(Kudisch, Elliot)
March 19, 2024 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Conference regarding permission to file a pre-answer motion to dismiss addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Rachel K. Moston dated 3/19/2024. Document filed by City of New York..(Moston, Rachel)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Hamed Moradi to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge John P. Cronan)(Text Only Order) (mhe)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Mark J. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge John P. Cronan)(Text Only Order) (mhe)
February 21, 2024 Filing 7 FIRST MOTION for Hamed Moradi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28972533. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Wynne Transportation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order Order).(Moradi Roodposhti, Hamed)
February 21, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 FIRST MOTION for Hamed Moradi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28972533. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
February 20, 2024 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York..(pc)
February 16, 2024 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Wynne Transportation LLC..(Levine, Mark)
February 16, 2024 Filing 4 FIRST MOTION for Mark J. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28960353. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Wynne Transportation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order Order).(Levine, Mark)
February 16, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4 FIRST MOTION for Mark J. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28960353. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
February 16, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Elliot J. Kudisch to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Filing Court Title Error. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
February 15, 2024 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT- SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Wynne Transportation LLC..(Kudisch, Elliot) Modified on 2/16/2024 (vf).
February 14, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kudisch, Elliot)
February 14, 2024 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 14, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 14, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 14, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Elliot J. Kudisch. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Wynne Transportation LLC, City of New York. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
February 14, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Elliot J. Kudisch to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet; civil cover sheet is blank;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pc)
February 13, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wynne Transportation LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28943297)Document filed by Wynne Transportation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet).(Kudisch, Elliot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wynne Transportation LLC v. City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wynne Transportation LLC
Represented By: Elliot J. Kudisch
Represented By: Mark J Levine
Represented By: Hamed Moradi Roodposhti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Rachel Kane Moston
Represented By: Scali Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?