Clark v. New York City Housing Authority et al
Plaintiff: La'Shaun Clark
Defendant: New York City Housing Authority, New York Insulation & Environmental Services Inc. and JLC Environmental Consultants Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv01625
Filed: March 1, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Robyn F Tarnofsky
Referring Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2024 Filing 24 MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. JLC Environmental Consultants Inc. served on 4/16/2024, answer due 6/17/2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by La'Shaun Clark..(rro)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #22 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, and to Set a Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss addressed to Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky from Peter J. Kurshan, Richard Leff and Nitin Sain dated Apr, #15 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Richard Leff, Esq., Nitin Sain, Esq,, and Miriam Skolnik, Esq, dated 04/04/2024., #1 Complaint. terminating #15 Letter Motion for Conference re: #22 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, and to Set a Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss addressed to Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky from Peter J. Kurshan, Richard Leff and Nitin Sain dated Apr, #15 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Richard Leff, Esq., Nitin Sain, Esq, and Miriam Skolnik, Esq, dated 04/04/2024. Application GRANTED. Defendants have until June 17, 2024 to respond to the complaint. Plaintiff has until August 1, 2024 to oppose Defendants' anticipated Motion to Dismiss. Defendants have until August 22, 2024 to submit any reply in further support of their anticipated Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate ECF 15 and ECF 22. JLC Environmental Consultants Inc. answer due 6/17/2024; New York City Housing Authority answer due 6/17/2024; New York Insulation & Environmental Services Inc. answer due 6/17/2024.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky on 4/18/2024) (ate)
April 17, 2024 Filing 22 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, and to Set a Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss addressed to Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky from Peter J. Kurshan, Richard Leff and Nitin Sain dated April 17, 2024. Document filed by New York City Housing Authority..(Kurshan, Peter)
April 15, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Jay Kurshan on behalf of New York City Housing Authority..(Kurshan, Peter)
April 8, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nitin Sain on behalf of JLC Environmental Consultants Inc...(Sain, Nitin)
April 8, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Miriam Skolnik on behalf of New York City Housing Authority..(Skolnik, Miriam)
April 8, 2024 Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is so redesignated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. (laq)
April 8, 2024 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF A REFERRAL TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The referral in the above entitled action has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky, for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis no longer referred to the case. Motions referred to Robyn F. Tarnofsky. (laq)
April 5, 2024 Filing 19 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from LaShaun Clark dated 4/5/2024 re: Plaintiff respectfully asks that the court order defendants to file their answers and or motions in accordance with the federal rule of civil procedure 12, 8 and in compliance with your individual rules and practices. Document filed by La'Shaun Clark..(kgo)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Specific Non-Dispositive Motion/Dispute: ECF No. 15 and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Referred to Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis. Motions referred to Jennifer E. Willis. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/5/2024) (va)
April 4, 2024 Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from LaShaun Clark dated 4/5/2024 re: Plaintiff respectfully asks that the court order defendants to file their answers and or motions in accordance with the federal rule of civil procedure 12, 8 and in compliance with your individual rules and practices. Document filed by La'Shaun Clark..(kgo)
April 4, 2024 Filing 15 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Richard Leff, Esq., Nitin Sain, Esq,, and Miriam Skolnik, Esq, dated 04/04/2024. Document filed by New York Insulation & Environmental Services Inc...(Leff, Richard)
April 4, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Leff on behalf of New York Insulation & Environmental Services Inc...(Leff, Richard)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INFORMATION PACKAGE DELIVERED to La'Shaun Clark, on 3/27/2024 Re: #11 Order of Service,. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases).(sha)
March 27, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JLC Environmental Consultants Inc., New York City Housing Authority, New York Insulation & Environmental Services Inc.. (sha)
March 27, 2024 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 3/27/2024 Re: Judge Analisa Torres #11 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Complaint, Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) JLC Environmental Consultants Inc., New York City Housing Authority, New York Insulation & Environmental Services Inc.. (sha)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is instructed to issue summonses for New York City Housing Authority, New York Insulation & Environmental Services, Inc., and JLC Environmental Consultants, Inc.; complete the USM-285 form with the address for these defendants; and deliver all documents necessary to effect service to the U.S. Marshals Service. The Clerk of Court is also instructed to mail an information package to Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/20/2024) (va) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
March 19, 2024 Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
March 19, 2024 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
March 14, 2024 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Housing Authority, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by La'Shaun Clark. (sc)
March 14, 2024 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JLC Environmental Consultants Inc., NY Secretary of State is, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by La'Shaun Clark. (sc)
March 14, 2024 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
March 14, 2024 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
March 13, 2024 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York Insulation & Environmental Services Inc. - NY Secretary is Agent etc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by La'Shaun Clark. (sc)
March 13, 2024 Filing 6 LETTER from L. Clark dated 3/13/24 re: Please issue and file summons pursuant to FRCP4(b) for all three defendants for plaintiff to have defendants New York Insulation & Environmental Services Inc. and JLC Environmental Services Inc. served through the NY Secretary of State and for NY City Housing Authority etc. Document filed by La'Shaun Clark.(sc)
March 13, 2024 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JLC Environmental Consultants Inc., NY Secretary of State is Agent-One Commerce Plaza, 99 Washington Ave.,Albany,NY re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by La'Shaun Clark..(sc)
March 13, 2024 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing..(sc)
March 13, 2024 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing..(sc)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/5/2024) (vn)
March 1, 2024 Filing 3 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: La'Shaun Clark consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by La'Shaun Clark. (sac)
March 1, 2024 Filing 2 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by La'Shaun Clark. (sac)
March 1, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JLC Environmental Consultants Inc., New York City Housing Authority, New York Insulation & Environmental Services Inc. Document filed by La'Shaun Clark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (sac)
March 1, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. New York City Housing Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La'Shaun Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Housing Authority
Represented By: Miriam Skolnik
Represented By: Peter Jay Kurshan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Insulation & Environmental Services Inc.
Represented By: Richard Leff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JLC Environmental Consultants Inc.
Represented By: Nitin Sain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?