Ballo v. R & J Automotive LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mardie Ballo
Defendant: R & J Automotive LLC, Ramchan Jagnarine, Parts Authority, LLC and Parts Authority, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv01627
Filed: March 4, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE A VERIFIED ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between counsel for the undersigned parties that the time for Defendants R & J AUTOMOTIVE LLC, RAMCHAN JAGNARINE, PARTS AUTHORITY. LLC, and PARTS AUTHORITY, INC., to file a Verified Answer, respond, or otherwise move in response to Plaintiff MARDIE BALLO. on behalf of herself and others similarly situated's Verified Complaint, originally due March 29, 2024, is extended, on consent, for 60 days, to May 28, 2024. Defendants acknowledge they have been served with the Summons and Complaint, and waive all defenses based on service, including jurisdictional defenses. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/1/2024) Ramchan Jagnarine answer due 5/28/2024; Parts Authority, Inc. answer due 5/28/2024; Parts Authority, LLC answer due 5/28/2024; R & J Automotive LLC answer due 5/28/2024. (ks)
March 29, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anne Donnelly Bush on behalf of Ramchan Jagnarine, Parts Authority, Inc., Parts Authority, LLC, R & J Automotive LLC..(Donnelly Bush, Anne)
March 29, 2024 Filing 9 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Stipulation signed by parties addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from ANNE DONNELLY BUSH dated 3/29/24. Document filed by Ramchan Jagnarine, Parts Authority, Inc., Parts Authority, LLC, R & J Automotive LLC..(Donnelly Bush, Anne)
March 28, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Parts Authority, Inc. served on 3/20/2024, answer due 4/10/2024. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Authorized Agent at Office of Secretary of State, State of New York. Document filed by Mardie Ballo..(Gangat, Mohammed)
March 28, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Parts Authority, LLC served on 3/20/2024, answer due 4/10/2024. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Authorized Agent at Office of Secretary of State, State of New York. Document filed by Mardie Ballo..(Gangat, Mohammed)
March 19, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Ramchan Jagnarine served on 3/8/2024, answer due 3/29/2024. Service was accepted by Amanda Balkashun, Wife. Document filed by Mardie Ballo..(Gangat, Mohammed)
March 19, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. R & J Automotive LLC served on 3/8/2024, answer due 3/29/2024. Service was accepted by Amanda Balkashun, Authorized Representative. Document filed by Mardie Ballo..(Gangat, Mohammed)
March 5, 2024 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ramchan Jagnarine, Parts Authority, Inc., Parts Authority, LLC, R & J Automotive LLC..(jgo)
March 5, 2024 NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (tro)
March 5, 2024 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Cathy Seibel is no longer assigned to the case..(tro)
March 5, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Mohammed Ahmed Gangat. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Westchester; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
March 5, 2024 Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
March 5, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
March 5, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 4, 2024 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to R & J AUTOMOTIVE LLC, RAMCHAN JAGNARINE, PARTS AUTHORITY, LLC, and PARTS AUTHORITY, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mardie Ballo..(Gangat, Mohammed)
March 4, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gangat, Mohammed)
March 4, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ramchan Jagnarine, Parts Authority, Inc., Parts Authority, LLC, R & J Automotive LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29026147)Document filed by Mardie Ballo..(Gangat, Mohammed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ballo v. R & J Automotive LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mardie Ballo
Represented By: Mohammed Ahmed Gangat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R & J Automotive LLC
Represented By: Anne Donnelly Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramchan Jagnarine
Represented By: Anne Donnelly Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parts Authority, LLC
Represented By: Anne Donnelly Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parts Authority, Inc.
Represented By: Anne Donnelly Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?