Biddings v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Derick Biddings
Defendant: City of New York, Correction Officer Grant and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2024cv01732
Filed: March 6, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2024 Filing 15 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for the parties to submit a joint letter and proposed case management plan and respectfully writing in accordance with the Courts March 7, 2024 Order addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Inna Shapovalova dated May 3, 2024. Document filed by City of New York..(Shapovalova, Inna)
April 18, 2024 Filing 14 LETTER from Inna Shapovalova dated April 18, 2024 re: Respectfully writing to request that the docket be updated to accurately reflect the Courts April 1, 2024 Order. Document filed by City of New York..(Shapovalova, Inna)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Inna Shapovalova dated March 28, 2024., #1 Complaint. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (City of New York answer due 5/28/2024; Correction Officer Grant answer due 5/28/2024.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/1/24) (yv) Modified on 4/22/2024 (yv).
March 28, 2024 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Inna Shapovalova dated March 28, 2024. Document filed by City of New York..(Shapovalova, Inna)
March 12, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Christiana on behalf of Derick Biddings..(Christiana, Matthew)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendants shall, by May 6, 2024, file a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/node/754 and attached to this order, on the docket. If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before me. An information sheet on proceedings before magistrate judges is also attached to this order. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by May 6, 2024, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/7/2024) (jca)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER To protect the public health, while promoting the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding, Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28 if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/7/2024) (jca)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by May 6, 2024, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER AND THE COURT'S INDIVIDUAL PRACTICES TO ALL PARTIES. If this case has been settled or otherwise terminated, counsel are required to file a stipulation of discontinuance, voluntary dismissal, or other proof of termination electronically on ECF, with a courtesy copy emailed to chambers in accordance with the Courts Individual Practices. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/7/2024) (jca)
March 7, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. City of New York served on 3/7/2024, answer due 3/28/2024. Service was made by E-Mail to ServiceECF@law.nyc.gov. Document filed by Derick Biddings..(Rastetter, Clyde)
March 7, 2024 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Correction Officer Grant..(jgo)
March 7, 2024 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York..(jgo)
March 7, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 7, 2024 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
March 7, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
March 7, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Clyde Rastetter. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Queens;. (jgo)
March 6, 2024 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Correction Officer Grant, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Derick Biddings..(Rastetter, Clyde)
March 6, 2024 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Derick Biddings..(Rastetter, Clyde)
March 6, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rastetter, Clyde)
March 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Correction Officer Grant, John Doe, The City Of New York,. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29044697)Document filed by Derick Biddings..(Rastetter, Clyde)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biddings v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derick Biddings
Represented By: Clyde Rastetter
Represented By: Matthew Christiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Inna Shapovalova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Officer Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?