The People of the State of New York v. Bey
Plaintiff: The People of the State of New York
Defendant: Akwa Azeem Bey
Case Number: 1:2024cv01779
Filed: March 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 nr Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2024 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 3. Mailed to: Akwa Azeem Bey c/o Post Office Box 138 Hurleyville, NY 12747. (sha)
April 16, 2024 CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Village Court of the State of New York, County of Monticello. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via UPS Tracking Number 1Z E22 E53 02 1005 050 0 on 4/16/2024..(rro)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Because removal of traffic tickets and criminal charges is untimely and improper, the state-court proceeding is remanded under 28 U.S.C. 1455(4) to the Monticello Village Court. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order to that court and to close this action. All other pending matters in this case are terminated. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/15/2024) (rro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
March 11, 2024 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
March 6, 2024 Filing 2 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Akwa Azeem Bey. (sac)
March 6, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Monticello Village Court, Inc., County of Sullivan. Case Number: 23120007. Document filed by Akwa Azeem Bey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sac)
March 6, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The People of the State of New York v. Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The People of the State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akwa Azeem Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?