Spinelli et al v. Boucher et al
Plaintiff: Scott Boehm, Paul Spinelli and David Stluka
Defendant: Brian Albert Boucher doing business as Fotovinting, John Doe 1 doing business as Plaquelady, John Doe 2 doing business as Autographsandmore_Justlook, John Doe 3 doing business as Autographsmadeasy, John Doe 4 doing business as Coast to Coast Collectibles, John Doe 5 doing business as Europetraveller, John Doe 6 doing business as Joycestreasures2008, John Doe 7 doing business as Misterinksignatures, John Doe 8 doing business as Showman Collectibles, John Doe 9 doing business as Sports Action Shots doing business as 4Legendsonly, John Doe 10 doing business as jcgsports and John Doe 11 doing business as Sportsaveny
Case Number: 1:2024cv02562
Filed: April 4, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2024 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Kevin McCulloch dated 5/31/2024., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint,,, addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Kevin McCulloch dated 5/31/2024. Document filed by Scott Boehm, Paul Spinelli, David Stluka..(McCulloch, Kevin)
April 19, 2024 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Brian Albert Boucher served on 4/13/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. Service was accepted by Brian Boucher. Document filed by David Stluka; Paul Spinelli; Scott Boehm..(Kleinman, Nathaniel)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial status conference on June 7, 2024 at 2:30 p.m. If Defendants have been properly served and the parties are available to proceed with an initial status conference prior to June 7, 2024, the parties shall notify the Court and propose an earlier date for the conference. If Defendants have not yet been properly served, have not filed a responsive pleading, and/or the parties otherwise seek to adjourn the conference, they shall notify the Court by no later than May 31, 2024. Unless the parties request otherwise, the Court will hold this conference by telephone. The parties shall use the following dial-in information to call in to the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. This conference line is open to the public. Initial Conference set for 6/7/2024 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/9/2024) (ate)
April 5, 2024 Filing 7 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(jgo)
April 5, 2024 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brian Albert Boucher..(jgo)
April 5, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
April 5, 2024 Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
April 5, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
April 4, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Patrick McCulloch on behalf of Scott Boehm, Paul Spinelli, David Stluka..(McCulloch, Kevin)
April 4, 2024 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brian Albert Boucher d/b/a Fotovinting, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Scott Boehm, Paul Spinelli, David Stluka..(Kleinman, Nathaniel)
April 4, 2024 Filing 3 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Kleinman, Nathaniel)
April 4, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kleinman, Nathaniel)
April 4, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brian Albert Boucher, John Doe 1, John Doe 10, John Doe 11, John Doe 2, John Doe 3, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 6, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29174080)Document filed by David Stluka, Paul Spinelli, Scott Boehm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Fotovinting Chart, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaquelady Chart, #3 Exhibit 3 - AutographsandMore Chart, #4 Exhibit 4 - Autographsmadeasy Chart, #5 Exhibit 5 - Coast to Coast Collectibles Chart, #6 Exhibit 6 - EuropeTraveller Chart, #7 Exhibit 7 - Joycestreasures2008 Chart, #8 Exhibit 8 - Misterinksignatures Chart, #9 Exhibit 9 - Showman Collectibles Chart, #10 Exhibit 10 - Sportsactionshots Chart, #11 Exhibit 11 - SportsAveNY Chart).(Kleinman, Nathaniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spinelli et al v. Boucher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Boehm
Represented By: Kevin Patrick McCulloch
Represented By: Nathaniel Kleinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Spinelli
Represented By: Kevin Patrick McCulloch
Represented By: Nathaniel Kleinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Stluka
Represented By: Kevin Patrick McCulloch
Represented By: Nathaniel Kleinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Albert Boucher doing business as Fotovinting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1 doing business as Plaquelady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2 doing business as Autographsandmore_Justlook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3 doing business as Autographsmadeasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 4 doing business as Coast to Coast Collectibles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 5 doing business as Europetraveller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 6 doing business as Joycestreasures2008
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 7 doing business as Misterinksignatures
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 8 doing business as Showman Collectibles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 9 doing business as Sports Action Shots doing business as 4Legendsonly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 10 doing business as jcgsports
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 11 doing business as Sportsaveny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?