Jeremiah v. Source Digital, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stefan Jeremiah
Defendant: Source Digital, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv02863
Filed: April 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Dale E Ho
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference set for June 11, 2024 (ECF No. 8) is RESCHEDULED to August 20, 2024 at 10:30 a.m. EST. The conference will be held via Microsoft Teams. The parties should dial in by calling (646) 453-4442 and entering the Phone Conference ID: 339 930 220, followed by the pound (#) sign. Parties are ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter, described at ECF No. 8, as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter, no later than August 13, 2024. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 11. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 6/3/2024) Initial Conference set for 8/20/2024 at 10:30 AM before Judge Dale E. Ho. (ks)
May 31, 2024 Filing 11 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and related deadlines addressed to Judge Dale E. Ho from Renee J. Aragona dated May 31, 2024. Document filed by Stefan Jeremiah..(Aragona, Renee)
May 31, 2024 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Source Digital, Inc. waiver sent on 5/30/2024, answer due 7/29/2024. Document filed by Stefan Jeremiah..(Aragona, Renee)
May 29, 2024 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE served on Source Digital, Inc. on May 29, 2024. Service was made by E-Mail. Document filed by Stefan Jeremiah..(Aragona, Renee)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/11/2024 at 02:00 PM before Judge Dale E. Ho. The conference will be held via Microsoft Teams. The parties should dial in by calling (646) 453-4442 and entering the Phone Conference ID: 339 930 220, followed by the pound (#) sign. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 4/18/2024) (ks)
April 17, 2024 Filing 7 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(pc)
April 17, 2024 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Source Digital, Inc...(pc)
April 17, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 17, 2024 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
April 17, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Dale E. Ho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
April 16, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Renee Jennifer Aragona on behalf of Stefan Jeremiah..(Aragona, Renee)
April 16, 2024 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Sanders, Craig)
April 16, 2024 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Source Digital, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Stefan Jeremiah..(Sanders, Craig)
April 16, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sanders, Craig)
April 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Source Digital, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29225196)Document filed by Stefan Jeremiah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Photograph, #2 Exhibit Infringing Uses of Photograph).(Sanders, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeremiah v. Source Digital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stefan Jeremiah
Represented By: Renee Jennifer Aragona
Represented By: Craig B. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Source Digital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?