700 Camp Street, LLC v. Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Plaintiff: 700 Camp Street, LLC
Defendant: MT Hawley Insurance Company
Interested Party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Case Number: 1:2024cv03060
Filed: April 22, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Arun Subramanian
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 in Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #29 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . . Document filed by MT Hawley Insurance Company..(Winslett, Greg)
June 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #29 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . . Document filed by 700 Camp Street, LLC..(Freiberg, Peter)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 DECLARATION of Adam Kotara in Support re: #29 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings .. Document filed by MT Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-A (Policy), #2 Exhibit 1-B (Loss Notice Email), #3 Exhibit 1-C (2023 0918 Transmission Email), #4 Exhibit 1-D (2023 1026 Transmission Email), #5 Exhibit 1-E (2023 1128 Transmission Email)).(Winslett, Greg)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #29 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . . Document filed by MT Hawley Insurance Company..(Winslett, Greg)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Document filed by MT Hawley Insurance Company..(Winslett, Greg)
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: As discussed at today's conference, Defendant may file a motion for judgment on the pleadings by May 24, 2024, with the response due June 7, 2024, and the reply due June 14, 2024. The parties should address whether there are any other pending cases in the Southern District of New York that raise similar issues as those implicated in this motion. The Court will enter a case management plan after the motion is decided. ( Motions due by 5/24/2024., Responses due by 6/7/2024, Replies due by 6/14/2024.) (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 5/14/2024) (rro)
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Arun Subramanian: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/14/2024. Peter Freiberg present for Plaintiff. Greg Winslett present for Defendant. (kh)
May 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: An initial pretrial conference in this case is set for May 14, 2024, at 11:00 AM. At that conference, the parties should be prepared to discuss defendant's contention that the claim is barred because the subject insurance policy states that "in no event may a claim be filed with us later than one year after the date of the loss or damage that is the subject of the claim." The parties should also be prepared to discuss what discovery is necessary and how best to expedite the resolution of this case. The Court does not think that a ten-month discovery period, as proposed in the case management plan, is necessary. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 5/9/2024) (vfr)
May 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Peter N. Freiberg dated May 9, 2024 re: Joint Status Letter in anticipation of Scheduling Conference. Document filed by 700 Camp Street, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Civil Case Management Plan).(Freiberg, Peter)
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #19 Motion for Richard L. Smith, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 5/2/2024) (vfr)
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #18 Motion for Greg K. Winslett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 5/2/2024) (vfr)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. This request does not comply with this Court's Individual Practices. The parties are ordered to review those Practices and comply in the future. The Court will adjourn the pretrial conference to May 14, 2024, at 11 :00 AM. The joint letter will be due May 9, 2024. No further extensions The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at Dkt. 22. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 5/14/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Arun Subramanian. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 5/1/2024) (vfr)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for May 6, 2024 addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Peter N. Freiberg dated May 1, 2024. Document filed by 700 Camp Street, LLC. Return Date set for 5/1/2024 at 05:00 PM..(Freiberg, Peter)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Jesse Furman on behalf of MT Hawley Insurance Company..(Furman, Andrew)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew David Kraus on behalf of MT Hawley Insurance Company..(Kraus, Matthew)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Richard L. Smith, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29269493. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by MT Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order proposed Order).(Smith, Richard)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Greg K. Winslett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29269359. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by MT Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order proposed Order).(Winslett, Greg)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #19 MOTION for Richard L. Smith, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29269493. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #18 MOTION for Greg K. Winslett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29269359. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/6/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Arun Subramanian. The parties should dial in by calling (646) 453-4442 and entering the Phone Conference ID: 302 803 819, followed by the pound (#) sign. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 4/23/2024) (vfr)
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Newton Freiberg on behalf of 700 Camp Street, LLC..(Freiberg, Peter)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number: 2:23-cv-06304. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received.
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (vba)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vba)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Arun Subramanian. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vba)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER AND REASONS granting #8 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue. The motion is granted, as set forth herein, and this matter is transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 04/01/2024.(ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/22/2024.]
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Hannah Quicksell for Mt. Hawley Insurance Company, in place of Attorney Julie Schwartzwald Meaders. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 2/2/2024. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/22/2024.]
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Julie S. Meaders as Attorney , MOTION to Substitute Attorney Hannah L. R. Quicksell by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schmeeckle, Seth) Modified on 2/2/2024 (sa). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/22/2024.]
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Support filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - LDOI Search, #2 Exhibit B - Mt. H's Petition for Writ of Mandamus in Ram Krishana, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus in Ram Krishana, #4 Exhibit D - Court Order Granting Petition for Writ of Mandamus in Ram Krishana)(Meaders, Julie) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/22/2024.]
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by 700 Camp Street, LLC re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue . (Freiberg, Peter) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/22/2024.]
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Fourth Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/12/2023.(lag) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/22/2024.]
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/17/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Exhibit Policy, #5 Exhibit In re Mt Hawley Insurance Company, #6 Exhibit Brown's Village Plaza, LLC, #7 Exhibit Brooks & Brooks, #8 Exhibit SR Hospitality, #9 Exhibit Canal@Camp, #10 Exhibit Esplanade 2018 Partners, #11 Exhibit Starlight Studios, #12 Exhibit Domingue, #13 Exhibit William B. Coleman, Inc., #14 Exhibit Burk Holding, #15 Exhibit UMMIID, #16 Exhibit S R Hospitality, #17 Exhibit Storm Damage Solutions, #18 Exhibit Capital One First Management, #19 Exhibit Valdes, #20 Exhibit Krishiv, #21 Exhibit Smith, #22 Exhibit Ninora, #23 Exhibit Recovery Performance, #24 Exhibit 421 NW 12 St, #25 Exhibit Oasis Beauty, #26 Exhibit La Teresita, #27 Exhibit Murray Hill Presbyterian, #28 Exhibit Storm Damage Solutions, #29 Exhibit Summerwind, #30 Exhibit Doral City, #31 Exhibit Pinto, #32 Exhibit New Hope Missionary Baptist Church, #33 Exhibit US Rubber, #34 Exhibit Davilyn, #35 Exhibit La Porte, #36 Exhibit Amusam)(Meaders, Julie) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/22/2024.]
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, and Affirmative Defenses by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company.(Meaders, Julie) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/22/2024.]
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS THIRD AMENDMENT TO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/14/2023.(am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/22/2024.]
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL: The Clerk of Court is ORDERED to reallot the above captioned case to another section of this court. All dates remain in effect unless modified by the judge to whom this case is transferred. Judge Lance M Africk recused. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 10/19/2023.(pp)(NEF:Sections H & I) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/22/2024.]
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/22/2024.]
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Black Rock, Inc., Corporate Parent The Vanguard Group, Inc., Corporate Parent RLI Corp., Corporate Parent RLI Insurance Company, Corporate Parent State Street Corporation for Mt. Hawley Insurance Company (Meaders, Julie) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/22/2024.]
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal . (Meaders, Julie) Modified on 10/20/2023 (am). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/22/2024.]
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court Orleans Parish, case number 2023-10167 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10225091) filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Certified Copy of State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B Notice to State Court, #4 Exhibit C Listing)Attorney Julie Schwartzwald Meaders added to party Mt. Hawley Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Meaders, Julie) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/22/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 700 Camp Street, LLC v. Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 700 Camp Street, LLC
Represented By: Jessie Braud Callahan
Represented By: Matthew M. Mize
Represented By: Peter Newton Freiberg
Represented By: Rajan Pandit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MT Hawley Insurance Company
Represented By: Seth Andrew Schmeeckle
Represented By: Hannah Quicksell
Represented By: Julie Schwartzwald Meaders
Represented By: Greg K Winslett
Represented By: Andrew Jesse Furman
Represented By: Matthew David Kraus
Represented By: Richard Lee Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By: Francis Joseph Lobrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?