Greater St. Stephen Ministries v. Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Greater St. Stephen Ministries
Defendant: MT Hawley Insurance Company
Interested Party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Case Number: 1:2024cv03130
Filed: April 24, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Arun Subramanian
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 in Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #25 Motion for Kiley Aycock to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 5/29/2024) (vfr)
May 29, 2024 Filing 25 MOTION for Kiley Anne Aycock to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29411526. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by MT Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of the Supreme Court of Texas, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Aycock, Kiley)
May 29, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #25 MOTION for Kiley Anne Aycock to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29411526. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The case is to be tried to a jury. Post-discovery summary judgment motions in the form prescribed by the Court's Individual Practices shall be served by 1/31/25, answering papers by 2/28/25, and reply papers by 3/15/25. Each party must file its respective papers on the same date that such papers are served. The initial pretrial conference is hereby CANCELED. SO ORDERED. Amended Pleadings due by 6/15/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 6/15/2024. Motions due by 1/31/2025. Responses due by 2/28/2025 Replies due by 3/15/2025. Depositions due by 12/15/2024. Discovery due by 12/31/2024. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 5/24/2024) (vfr)
May 23, 2024 Filing 23 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Peter N. Freiberg dated May 23, 2024 re: Joint Letter submitted in advance of Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Greater St. Stephen Ministries..(Freiberg, Peter)
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #21 Motion for Greg K. Winslett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 4/30/2024) (vfr)
April 30, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #21 MOTION for Greg K. Winslett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29285279. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
April 29, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION for Greg K. Winslett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29285279. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by MT Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order proposed Order).(Winslett, Greg)
April 26, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Jesse Furman on behalf of MT Hawley Insurance Company..(Furman, Andrew)
April 26, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew David Kraus on behalf of MT Hawley Insurance Company..(Kraus, Matthew)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The conference will be held via Microsoft Teams. The parties should dial in by calling (646) 453-4442 and entering the Phone Conference ID: 250 534 186, followed by the pound (#) sign. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as Lead Trial Counsel. As further set forth by this Order. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 5/28/2024 at 12:30 PM before Judge Arun Subramanian. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 4/25/2024) (tg)
April 25, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Newton Freiberg on behalf of Greater St. Stephen Ministries..(Freiberg, Peter)
April 24, 2024 Filing 16 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number: 2:23-cv-06662. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received.
April 24, 2024 Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
April 24, 2024 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (vba)
April 24, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (vba)
April 24, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Arun Subramanian. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vba)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's #9 Motion to Transfer is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), this matter is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/15/2024.(pp) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/24/2024.]
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Magistrate Judge Eva J. Dossier. Magistrate Judge Michael North no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 04/12/2024.(my) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/24/2024.]
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Julie Schwartzwald Meaders terminated, Hannah L. R. Quicksell is hereby enrolled, as co-counsel of record for Mt. Hawley in this matter. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 2/5/2024. (cs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/24/2024.]
February 1, 2024 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw and to Enroll Counsel of Record by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schmeeckle, Seth) Modified text on 2/2/2024 (pp). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/24/2024.]
January 26, 2024 Filing 11 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Support filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Meaders, Julie) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/24/2024.]
January 22, 2024 Filing 10 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Greater St. Stephen Ministries re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue . (Freiberg, Peter) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/24/2024.]
January 2, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/31/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Exhibit A Certified Policy, #5 Exhibit B In re Mt Hawley Insurance Company, #6 Exhibit C Starlight Studios, #7 Exhibit D Brown's Village Plaza, #8 Exhibit E Brooks & Brooks, #9 Exhibit F SR Hospitality, #10 Exhibit G Canal@Camp, #11 Exhibit H Esplanade 2018 Partners, #12 Exhibit I KMT Painting and Decorating, #13 Exhibit J Domingue, #14 Exhibit K William B. Coleman, #15 Exhibit L Burk Holding, #16 Exhibit M UMMIID, #17 Exhibit N SR Hospitality, #18 Exhibit O Capital One First Management, #19 Exhibit P Valdes, #20 Exhibit Q Krishiv, #21 Exhibit R Smith, #22 Exhibit S Ninora, #23 Exhibit T Recovery Performance, #24 Exhibit U 421 NW 12 St, #25 Exhibit V Oasis Beauty, #26 Exhibit W La Teresita, #27 Exhibit X Murray Hill Presbyterian, #28 Exhibit Y Storm Damage Solutions, #29 Exhibit Z Summerwind, #30 Exhibit AA Doral City, #31 Exhibit BB Pinto, #32 Exhibit CC New Hope Missionary Baptist Church, #33 Exhibit DD US Rubber, #34 Exhibit EE Davilyn, #35 Exhibit FF La Porte, #36 Exhibit GG Amusam)(Meaders, Julie) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/24/2024.]
January 2, 2024 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, and Affirmative Defenses by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company.(Meaders, Julie) Modified on 1/3/2024 (pp). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/24/2024.]
December 27, 2023 Filing 7 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Fourth Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/12/2023.(lag) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/24/2024.]
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court reallot this matter to another Section of this Court. Judge Wendy B Vitter recused. Case reassigned to Judge Susie Morgan. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 11/6/2023.(mmv) (J Morgan, Case Mgr) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/24/2024.]
November 3, 2023 Filing 5 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Third Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/14/2023.(mmv) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/24/2024.]
November 3, 2023 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/24/2024.]
November 3, 2023 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Black Rock, Inc., Corporate Parent Vanguard Group, Inc., Corporate Parent RLI Corp., Corporate Parent RLI Insurance Company, Corporate Parent State Street Corporation for Mt. Hawley Insurance Company (Meaders, Julie) Modified text on 11/3/2023 (mmv). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/24/2024.]
November 3, 2023 Filing 2 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Diversity Jurisdiction. (Meaders, Julie) Modified text on 11/3/2023 (mmv). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/24/2024.]
November 3, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th JDC, Jefferson Parish, case number 844-863 Div. D (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10254310) filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Certified Copy of State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B Estimate, #4 Exhibit C Notice to State Court, #5 Exhibit D Notice of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(b))Attorney Julie Schwartzwald Meaders added to party Mt. Hawley Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Meaders, Julie) Modified text on 11/3/2023 (mmv). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/24/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greater St. Stephen Ministries v. Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greater St. Stephen Ministries
Represented By: Peter Newton Freiberg
Represented By: Laci N Hamilton
Represented By: Rajan Pandit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MT Hawley Insurance Company
Represented By: Seth Andrew Schmeeckle
Represented By: Hannah Quicksell
Represented By: Julie Schwartzwald Meaders
Represented By: Greg K Winslett
Represented By: Andrew Jesse Furman
Represented By: Kiley Anne Aycock
Represented By: Matthew David Kraus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By: Francis Joseph Lobrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?