Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. Related Services LLC
Petitioner: The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund and Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund
Respondent: Related Services LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv03955
Filed: May 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2024 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Petitioners' Motion for Summary Judgment against Respondent Related Services LLC (Dkt. No. 14), Declaration of Jayden N. Peters, Esq. in Support of Petitioners' Motion for Summary Judgment with Exhibits K through N (Dkt. No. 15), Petitioners' Rule 56.1 Statement (Dkt. No. 16), and Memorandum of Law in Support of Petitioners' Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. No. 17) served on Respondent, Related Services LLC on June 27, 2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Peters, Jayden)
June 26, 2024 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment against Respondent Related Services LLC. . Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Peters, Jayden)
June 26, 2024 Filing 16 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Peters, Jayden)
June 26, 2024 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Jayden N. Peters, Esq. in Support re: #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment against Respondent Related Services LLC.. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K - March 11, 2024 Demand Letter, #2 Exhibit L - History Bill for the Court, #3 Exhibit M - Service Invoice & Postage Rates, #4 Exhibit N - Proposed Judgment).(Peters, Jayden)
June 26, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment against Respondent Related Services LLC. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Peters, Jayden)
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Scheduling Order issued by Judge Hellerstein on June 5, 2024 (Dkt. No. 12) served on Respondent, Related Services LLC on June 10, 2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Moosnick, Maura)
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that Petitioners shall file and serve a statement pursuant to Local Civil Rule 56.1 and any additional materials with which they intend to support the petition, including any affidavits or declarations attesting that the exhibits to the petition are true and correct copies of what they purport to be, no later than June 26, 2024. Respondent's opposition is due by July 24, 2024. Petitioners' reply, if any, is due by August 7, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/5/24) (yv)
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Scheduling Order issued by Judge Hellerstein on May 31, 2024 (Dkt. No. 10) served on Respondent, Related Services LLC on June 3, 2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Moosnick, Maura)
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are hereby ordered to appear for a status conference on September 13, 2024, at 10:00 a.m., which will be held via the following call-in number:Call-in number: 888-363-4749, Access code: 7518680. Finally, no later than September 11, 2024 at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall jointly submit to the court (via the email address HellersteinNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) a list of all counsel expected to appear on the record, along with their contact information.SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 9/13/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/31/24) (yv)
May 28, 2024 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons (Dkt. No. 7), Verified Petition to Confirm an Arbitration Award with Exhibits A through M (Dkt. No. 1), Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Dkt. No. 4), and Memorandum of Law in Support of the Verified Petition to Confirm an Arbitration Award (Dkt. No. 5) served on Respondent, Related Services LLC on May 28, 2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Peters, Jayden)
May 28, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,,, served. Related Services LLC served on 5/24/2024, answer due 6/14/2024. Service was accepted by Amy Lesch, an authorized person in the Corporation Division of the Department of State and empowered to receive such service. Document filed by Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund ; The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund..(Peters, Jayden)
May 23, 2024 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Related Services LLC. (vf)
May 23, 2024 Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
May 23, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
May 23, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
May 22, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maura S. Moosnick on behalf of The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Moosnick, Maura)
May 22, 2024 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,,, . Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Peters, Jayden)
May 22, 2024 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Peters, Jayden)
May 22, 2024 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Related Services LLC, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,,,. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Peters, Jayden)
May 22, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Peters, Jayden)
May 22, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29388760).Document filed by Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Signature Pages, #2 Exhibit B - CBA, #3 Exhibit C - Pension Fund Trust Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Welfare Fund Trust Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - Annuity Fund Trust Agreement, #6 Exhibit F - Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining and Educational and Industry Fund Trust Agreement, #7 Exhibit G - Collection Policy, #8 Exhibit H - Estimated Audit Calculation, #9 Exhibit I - February 8, 2024 Notice of Hearing, #10 Exhibit J - March 8, 2024 Award, #11 Exhibit K - March 11, 2024 Demand Letter, #12 Exhibit L - History Bill for the Court, #13 Exhibit M - Proposed Judgment).(Peters, Jayden)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. Related Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York
Represented By: Jayden N. Peters
Represented By: Maura S. Moosnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund
Represented By: Jayden N. Peters
Represented By: Maura S. Moosnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund
Represented By: Jayden N. Peters
Represented By: Maura S. Moosnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Related Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?