Oleo-X LLC v. St. Paul Commodities, Inc.
Plaintiff: Oleo-X LLC
Defendant: St. Paul Commodities, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv04706
Filed: June 20, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(3) or Transfer Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(A). . Document filed by St. Paul Commodities, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Scott M. Rusert, #2 Exhibit AAA Scheduling Order, #3 Exhibit February 2024 Email Correspondence).(Leddy, John)
July 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(3) or Transfer Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(A). . Document filed by Oleo-X LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - AFOA Trade Rules).(Kramer, Jeffrey)
July 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF DANIEL N. MOAK granting #23 Motion for Daniel N. Moak to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Daniel N. Moak for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-referenced captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/15/24) (yv)
July 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremy David Schildcrout on behalf of St. Paul Commodities, Inc...(Schildcrout, Jeremy)
July 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Daniel N. Moak to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29592747. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by St. Paul Commodities, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Daniel N. Moak, #2 Exhibit A (MN Cert of Good Standing), #3 Exhibit B (WI Cert of Good Standing), #4 Proposed Order (D. Moak PHV)).(Moak, Daniel)
July 11, 2024 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #23 MOTION for Daniel N. Moak to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29592747. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #21 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(3) or Transfer Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(A). addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Jeffrey S. Krame, #8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(3) or Transfer Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(A). OK. Responses due by 7/18/2024. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/10/2024) (tg)
July 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(3) or Transfer Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(A). addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Jeffrey S. Kramer dated July 9, 2024. Document filed by Oleo-X LLC..(Kramer, Jeffrey)
July 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John C. Leddy on behalf of St. Paul Commodities, Inc...(Leddy, John)
July 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #18 Letter filed by Oleo-X LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Although the defendant, as the party removing the case, is suppose to be able to establish the elements of federal jurisdiction, it obviously could not do so and so asked the plaintiff for help with its complicated ownership structure-I thank Locke Lord for this information, which I will study carefully. The only issue I have to look into is the citizenship of the trustees. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/2/2024) (tg)
July 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Jeffrey S. Kramer dated July 2, 2024 re: Petitioner's Citizenship Information. Document filed by Oleo-X LLC..(Kramer, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Steven Kramer on behalf of Oleo-X LLC..(Kramer, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Scott M. Rusert dated July 2, 2024 re: Response to June 27, 2024 Memo Endorsement (ECF #11). Document filed by St. Paul Commodities, Inc...(Leddy, John)
July 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by St. Paul Commodities, Inc...(Leddy, John)
July 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ADAM G. CHANDLER granting #6 Motion for Adam G. Chandler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Adam G. Chandler for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-referenced captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court. including the rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/1/24) (yv)
July 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF SCOTT M. RUSERT granting #4 Motion for Scott M. Rusert to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Scott M. Rusert for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above referenced captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/1/24) (yv)
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DECLARATION of Scott M. Rusert in Support re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(3) or Transfer Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(A).. Document filed by St. Paul Commodities, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Petition to Confirm Award, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Oleo's NY Petition, #3 Exhibit Ex C - Oleo's Answer in MS action, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - Arbitration Demand, #6 Exhibit Ex. F - Answering Statement, #7 Exhibit Ex. G - Email, #8 Exhibit Ex. H - Joint Proposed Scheduling Order, #9 Exhibit Ex I - Withdrawal of Counsel, #10 Exhibit Ex. J - Email Chain, #11 Exhibit Ex K - Email Chain, #12 Exhibit Ex. L - Email Chain, #13 Exhibit Ex. M - Arbitration Award, #14 Exhibit Ex. N - Oleo's MOL iso Motion to Stay, #15 Exhibit Ex O - Arbitration Rules).(Leddy, John)
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #5 Letter filed by St. Paul Commodities, Inc. ENDORSEMENT "The removing party (Oleo-X) has until July 2 at 5 pm to provide me with full citizenship details including the names and addresses of every general and limited partner at any level of ownership Of Oleo-X LLC (the owners of the owners of the owners)." (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/27/2024) (jca)
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DECLARATION of John P. Bohn in Support re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(3) or Transfer Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(A).. Document filed by St. Paul Commodities, Inc...(Leddy, John)
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(3) or Transfer Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(A). . Document filed by St. Paul Commodities, Inc...(Leddy, John)
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(3) or Transfer Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(A). Document filed by St. Paul Commodities, Inc...(Leddy, John)
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/26/2024 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/27/2024) (jca)
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Adam G. Chandler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29540221. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by St. Paul Commodities, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Adam G. Chandler, #2 Exhibit A (Cert. of Good Standing), #3 Proposed Order (A. Chandler PHV)).(Chandler, Adam)
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Scott M. Rusert dated June 27, 2024 re: Basis for Diversity Jurisdiction. Document filed by St. Paul Commodities, Inc...(Leddy, John)
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Scott M. Rusert to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29540089. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by St. Paul Commodities, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit S. Rusert, #2 Exhibit A (Cert. of Good Standing), #3 Proposed Order S. Rusert PHV).(Rusert, Scott)
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Adam G. Chandler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29540221. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4 MOTION for Scott M. Rusert to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29540089. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
June 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sullivan, Christopher)
June 21, 2024 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
June 21, 2024 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Christopher James Sullivan to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet; incorrect citizenship for the plaintiff was selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (pc)
June 21, 2024 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Christopher James Sullivan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code y (Yes); County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
June 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John C. Leddy on behalf of St. Paul Commodities, Inc...(Leddy, John)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 652860/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29510159).Document filed by St. Paul Commodities, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Part 1 - Verified Petition, #2 Exhibit Ex A - Part 2 - Verified Petition, #3 Exhibit Ex B - Part 1 - Exhs. to Verified Petition, #4 Exhibit Ex B - Part 2 - Exhs. to Verified Petition, #5 Exhibit Ex B. - Part 3 - Exhs.to Verified Petition, #6 Exhibit Ex. B - Part 4 - Exhs. to Verified Petition, #7 Exhibit Ex. B - Part 5 - Exhs.to Verified Petition, #8 Exhibit Ex. B - Part 6 - Exhs. to Verified Petition, #9 Exhibit Ex B - Part 7 - Exhs. to Verified Petition, #10 Exhibit Ex B. - Part 8 - Exhs. to Verified Petition, #11 Exhibit Ex. B - Part 9 - Exhs. to Verified Petition., #12 Exhibit Ex.B - Part 10 - Exhs to Verified Petition, #13 Exhibit Ex B - Part 11 - Exhs. to Verified Petition, #14 Exhibit Ex. B - Part 12 - Exhs. to Verified Petition, #15 Exhibit Ex. B - Part 13 - Exhs to Verified Petition, #16 Exhibit Ex B - Part 14 - Exhs. to Verified Petition, #17 Exhibit Ex B. - Part 15 - Exhs. to Verified Petition, #18 Exhibit Ex B. - Part 16 - Exhs. to Verified Petition, #19 Exhibit Ex B - Part 17 - Exhs. to Verified Petition, #20 Exhibit Ex B - Part 18 - Exhs. to Verified Petition, #21 Exhibit Ex B - Part 19 - Exhs. to Verified Petition, #22 Exhibit Ex B - Part 20 - Exhs to Verified Petition, #23 Exhibit Ex. C. - Completion of Dkt. Entries in State Court Proceeding, #24 Exhibit Ex. D - Mississippi Action Petition, #25 Exhibit Ex. E - Mississippi Action Answer, #26 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet).(Sullivan, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oleo-X LLC v. St. Paul Commodities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Commodities, Inc.
Represented By: Scott M Rusert
Represented By: Jeremy David Schildcrout
Represented By: Adam Gregory Chandler
Represented By: Daniel Normand Moak
Represented By: Christopher James Sullivan
Represented By: John C. Leddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oleo-X LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Steven Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?