Gil v. 1246 LLC et al
Plaintiff: David Gil
Defendant: Chestnut Holdings of New York, Inc., 1246 LLC and 1230 LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv04763
Filed: June 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2024 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 9/20/2024.(sge)
August 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 9/3/2024. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 10/09/2020) (rpr)
August 16, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robin Rabinowitz on behalf of 1230 LLC, 1246 LLC, Chestnut Holdings of New York, Inc...(Rabinowitz, Robin)
August 16, 2024 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by 1230 LLC, 1246 LLC, Chestnut Holdings of New York, Inc...(Druck, Joshua)
August 16, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua A Druck on behalf of 1230 LLC, 1246 LLC, Chestnut Holdings of New York, Inc...(Druck, Joshua)
July 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.The request is granted. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint by August 16, 2024. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close Docket Number 6. SO ORDERED. 1230 LLC answer due 8/16/2024; 1246 LLC answer due 8/16/2024; Chestnut Holdings of New York, Inc. answer due 8/16/2024. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 7/15/2024) (jca)
July 11, 2024 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Joshua A. Druck dated July 11, 2024. Document filed by 1230 LLC, 1246 LLC, Chestnut Holdings of New York, Inc...(Druck, Joshua)
June 26, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. 1230 LLC served on 6/25/2024, answer due 7/16/2024; 1246 LLC served on 6/25/2024, answer due 7/16/2024; Chestnut Holdings of New York, Inc. served on 6/25/2024, answer due 7/16/2024. Service was accepted by New York Secretary of State. Document filed by David Gil..(Hassan, Abdul)
June 24, 2024 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 1230 LLC, 1246 LLC, Chestnut Holdings of New York, Inc...(pc)
June 24, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
June 24, 2024 Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
June 24, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 23, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hassan, Abdul)
June 23, 2024 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 1246 LLC, 1230 LLC, and Chestnut Holdings of New York, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by David Gil..(Hassan, Abdul)
June 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 1230 LLC, 1246 LLC, Chestnut Holdings of New York, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29519430)Document filed by David Gil..(Hassan, Abdul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gil v. 1246 LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chestnut Holdings of New York, Inc.
Represented By: Robin Rabinowitz
Represented By: Joshua A Druck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1246 LLC
Represented By: Robin Rabinowitz
Represented By: Joshua A Druck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1230 LLC
Represented By: Robin Rabinowitz
Represented By: Joshua A Druck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Gil
Represented By: Abdul Karim Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?