Williams v. Does et al
Plaintiff: Jomo Williams
Defendant: Erlon Hodge, Theresa Daniel and BSREP UA 3333 Broadway LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv04794
Filed: June 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sarah L Cave
Referring Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 vc Fed. Question: Violation of Constitutional Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Theresa Daniel, Erlon Hodge, BSREP UA 3333 Broadway LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Jomo Williams. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(kgo)
August 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE. Document filed by Jomo Williams..(rdz)
August 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/7/2024) (tg)
August 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #14 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing for Jomo Williams. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/7/2024) (tg) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
July 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Permission for Jomo Williams to participate in electronic case filing in this case. Document filed by Jomo Williams..(tro)
July 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Jomo Williams re: Letter motion for incorporation and consolidation of state underlying case. Document filed by Jomo Williams.(tro)
July 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Jomo Williams consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Jomo Williams..(tro)
July 25, 2024 Opinion or Order ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #13 IFP. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (tro)
July 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Jomo Williams, at, on 7/19/2024 Re: #9 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (nb)
July 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Theresa Daniel, Erlon Hodge. (nb)
July 19, 2024 Opinion or Order FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 7/19/2024 Re: Judge Paul A. Engelmayer #9 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Complaint, Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s)Theresa Daniel, Erlon Hodge. (nb)
July 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Court directs the Clerk of Court to issue an information package to Plaintiff. The Court also directs the Clerk of Court to add Erlon Hodge and Theresa Daniel as defendants in this action, and to drop, without prejudice, all of the unidentified "John Doe" and "Jane Doe" defendants in this action, pursuant to Rule 21 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Court denies Plaintiff's motion for electronic case filing privileges in this action (ECF 7) without prejudice to Plaintiff's filing another such motion after he has successfully completed the required CM/ECF introduction course. The Court further directs the Clerk of Court to: (1) issue summonses for Hodge and Daniel; (2), complete USM-285 forms with the service addresses for Hodge and Daniel, and; (3) deliver all documents necessary to effect service on Hodge and Daniel to the USMS. The Court certifies, under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and, therefore, IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED., ( Erlon Hodge and Theresa Daniel added. J. Does (of/for Emergency Court Admin.), J. Does (of/for E-Filing Liaison), John/Jane Does (of/for NYS Unified Courts' NYSCEF Office of Court Administration, Attn: E-Filing Resource Center), John/Jane Does (of/for NYS Unified Courts', Access to Justice Initiative), John/Jane Does (of/for NYS Unified Courts', EDDS, and Pro Se Offices), J. Does of/for NYS UCS, John/Jane Doe (of/for NYS Unified Courts', New York State Office of Court Administration, Statewide ADA Coordinator) and J. Does (of/for County Clerk, E-File Department) terminated.), Motions terminated: #7 MOTION for Permission for Jomo Williams to participate in electronic case filing in this case. filed by Jomo Williams. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/16/24) (yv) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
July 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
July 8, 2024 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
June 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Permission for Jomo Williams to participate in electronic case filing in this case. Document filed by Jomo Williams. (vfr)
June 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/26/2024) (vn)
June 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER IN RE CASES FILED BY PRO SE PLAINTIFFS (See 24-MISC-127 Standing Order filed March 18, 2024). To ensure that all cases heard in the Southern District of New York are handled promptly and efficiently, all parties must keep the court apprised of any new contact information. It is a party's obligation to provide an address for service; service of court orders cannot be accomplished if a party does not update the court when a change of address occurs. Accordingly, all self-represented litigants are hereby ORDERED to inform the court of each change in their address or electronic contact information. Parties may #consent to electronic service to receive notifications of court filings by email, rather than relying on regular mail delivery. Parties may also ask the court for #permission to file documents electronically. Forms, including instructions for consenting to electronic service and requesting permission to file documents electronically, may be found by clicking on the hyperlinks in this order, or by accessing the forms on the courts website, nysd.uscourts.gov/forms. The procedures that follow apply only to cases filed by pro se plaintiffs. If the court receives notice from the United States Postal Service that an order has been returned to the court, or otherwise receives information that the address of record for a self-represented plaintiff is no longer valid, the court may issue an Order to Show Cause why the case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with this order. Such order will be sent to the plaintiffs last known address and will also be viewable on the court's electronic docket. A notice directing the parties' attention to this order shall be docketed (and mailed to any self-represented party that has appeared and has not consented to electronic service) upon the opening of each case or miscellaneous matter that is classified as pro se in the court's records. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/18/2024) (sac)
June 25, 2024 Opinion or Order CASE MANAGEMENT NOTE: For each electronic filing made in a case involving a self-represented party who has not consented to electronic service, the filing party must serve the document on such self-represented party in a manner permitted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2) (other than through the ECF system) and file proof of service for each document so served. Please see #Rule 9.2 of the courts ECF Rules & Instructions for further information. (sac)
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 UNSIGNED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Jomo Williams. (sac)
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Jomo Williams consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Jomo Williams. (sac)
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Jomo Williams. (sac)
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John/Jane Doe, J. Does(of/for E-Filing Liaison), J. Does(of/for Emergency Court Admin.), J. Does(of/for County Clerk, E-File Department), John/Jane Does, John/Jane Does(of/for NYS Unified Courts', Access to Justice Initiative), John/Jane Does(of/for NYS Unified Courts', EDDS, and Pro Se Offices). Document filed by Jomo Williams. (sac)
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Does et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erlon Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSREP UA 3333 Broadway LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jomo Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?