D'Arrigo Bros Co. of New York, Inc. v. Gramercy Produce Inc. et al
Plaintiff: D'Arrigo Bros Co. of New York, Inc.
Defendant: Gramercy Produce Inc., Anthony J. Vivacqua, Jr., Salvatore V. Vivacqua and Anthony J. Vivacqua, Sr.
Case Number: 1:2024cv04841
Filed: June 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Dale E Ho
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. § 499 Agricultural Commodities Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2024 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Gramercy Produce Inc., Anthony J. Vivacqua, Jr, Anthony J. Vivacqua, Sr, Salvatore V. Vivacqua..(Barbieri, Guy)
July 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: It is hereby stipulated by and between the attomeys for the above captioned parties that Defendants' time to respond to the complaint is extended to August 1, 2024 or such other date as ordered by the court. In consideration thereto, Defendants waive personal jurisdiction defenses. Facsimile or email signatures shall be deemed as originals for all purposes. So Ordered. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 25., Motions terminated: #25 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Dale E. Ho from Guy Barbieri, Esq. dated July 16, 2024. filed by Salvatore V. Vivacqua, Gramercy Produce Inc., Anthony J. Vivacqua, Sr., Anthony J. Vivacqua, Jr.., (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 7/17/2024) Gramercy Produce Inc. answer due 8/1/2024; Anthony J. Vivacqua, Jr answer due 8/1/2024; Anthony J. Vivacqua, Sr answer due 8/1/2024; Salvatore V. Vivacqua answer due 8/1/2024. (ks)
July 16, 2024 Filing 25 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Dale E. Ho from Guy Barbieri, Esq. dated July 16, 2024. Document filed by Gramercy Produce Inc., Anthony J. Vivacqua, Jr, Anthony J. Vivacqua, Sr, Salvatore V. Vivacqua. (Attachments: #1 Supplement EXECUTED STIP ON CONSENT).(Barbieri, Guy)
July 16, 2024 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #24 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (tp)
July 15, 2024 Filing 24 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by D'Arrigo Bros Co. of New York, Inc.. Related Document Number: #10 ..(Brown, Gregory) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
July 15, 2024 Filing 23 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ., #8 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . . Document filed by D'Arrigo Bros Co. of New York, Inc...(Brown, Gregory)
July 12, 2024 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Anthony J. Vivacqua, Sr. in Opposition re: #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Gramercy Produce Inc., Anthony J. Vivacqua, Jr, Anthony J. Vivacqua, Sr, Salvatore V. Vivacqua. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Barbieri, Guy)
July 12, 2024 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Gramercy Produce Inc., Anthony J. Vivacqua, Jr, Anthony J. Vivacqua, Sr, Salvatore V. Vivacqua..(Barbieri, Guy)
July 12, 2024 Filing 20 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Gramercy Produce Inc...(Barbieri, Guy)
July 12, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Guy Barbieri on behalf of Gramercy Produce Inc., Anthony J. Vivacqua, Jr, Anthony J. Vivacqua, Sr, Salvatore V. Vivacqua..(Barbieri, Guy)
June 27, 2024 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Gramercy Produce Inc. served on 6/27/2024, answer due 7/18/2024; Anthony J. Vivacqua, Jr served on 6/27/2024, answer due 7/18/2024; Anthony J. Vivacqua, Sr served on 6/27/2024, answer due 7/18/2024; Salvatore V. Vivacqua served on 6/27/2024, answer due 7/18/2024. Service was made by Federal Express. Document filed by D'Arrigo Bros Co. of New York, Inc.., AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Courts Order dated June 26, 2024 (Docket No. 17), together with plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction, all supporting papers, the Summonses, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement and Civil Cover Sheet and a copy of the Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases of the Hon. Dale E. Ho served on Gramercy Produce Inc., Anthony J. Vivacqua, Sr., Anthony J. Vivacqua, Jr. and Salvatore V. Vivacqua on June 27, 2024. Service was made by Federal Express. Document filed by D'Arrigo Bros Co. of New York, Inc...(Brown, Gregory)
June 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #8 Motion for TRO. Accordingly, the Court DENIES Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order. On June 26, 2024, Plaintiff also filed a motion for preliminary injunction. See ECF No. 10. By July 12, 2024, Defendants shall file an opposition to the motion, not to exceed fifteen pages. Plaintiff shall file a reply, if any, not to exceed fifteen pages, by July 19, 2024. Plaintiff is ORDERED (1) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action who have not yet appeared by serving upon each of them a copy of this order by Federal Express or other delivery service and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court by July 1, 2024. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and the Courts Individual Practices to that party personally. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 8. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 6/26/2024) (ks)
June 26, 2024 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Salvatore V. Vivacqua. (vf)
June 26, 2024 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anthony J. Vivacqua, Jr. (vf)
June 26, 2024 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anthony J. Vivacqua, Sr. (vf)
June 26, 2024 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gramercy Produce Inc.. (vf)
June 26, 2024 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ., #8 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . . Document filed by D'Arrigo Bros Co. of New York, Inc...(Brown, Gregory)
June 26, 2024 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Karina Roman in Support re: #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ., #8 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order .. Document filed by D'Arrigo Bros Co. of New York, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D'Arrigo PACA License, #2 Exhibit B - Gramercy PACA License, #3 Exhibit C (Part 1 of 3) - Account Statement and Invoices, #4 Exhibit C (Part 2 of 3) - Invoices, #5 Exhibit C (Part 3 of 3) - Invoices, #6 Exhibit D - NSF Checks).(Brown, Gregory)
June 26, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by D'Arrigo Bros Co. of New York, Inc...(Brown, Gregory)
June 26, 2024 Filing 9 PROPOSED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Document filed by D'Arrigo Bros Co. of New York, Inc.. Related Document Number: #8 ..(Brown, Gregory) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
June 26, 2024 Filing 8 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Document filed by D'Arrigo Bros Co. of New York, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Errata Certification of Counsel in Support of Emergency Motions for Relief Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65 and Explaining Why Notice Should Not Be Required Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b), #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Be Issued Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 65).(Brown, Gregory) (Refer to ECF Rule 13.19(b) and (c) for directions regarding promptly alerting the court to this filing.)
June 26, 2024 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Salvatore V. Vivacqua, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by D'Arrigo Bros Co. of New York, Inc...(Brown, Gregory)
June 26, 2024 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Anthony J. Vivacqua, Jr., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by D'Arrigo Bros Co. of New York, Inc...(Brown, Gregory)
June 26, 2024 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Anthony J. Vivacqua, Sr., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by D'Arrigo Bros Co. of New York, Inc...(Brown, Gregory)
June 26, 2024 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gramercy Produce Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by D'Arrigo Bros Co. of New York, Inc...(Brown, Gregory)
June 26, 2024 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by D'Arrigo Bros Co. of New York, Inc...(Brown, Gregory)
June 26, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brown, Gregory)
June 26, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gramercy Produce Inc., Anthony J. Vivacqua, Jr, Anthony J. Vivacqua, Sr, Salvatore V. Vivacqua. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29532773)Document filed by D'Arrigo Bros Co. of New York, Inc...(Brown, Gregory)
June 26, 2024 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Document No. #9 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
June 26, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Dale E. Ho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
June 26, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/12/2024 Replies due by 7/19/2024. (ks)
June 26, 2024 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
June 26, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (vf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'Arrigo Bros Co. of New York, Inc. v. Gramercy Produce Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gramercy Produce Inc.
Represented By: Guy Barbieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. Vivacqua, Jr.
Represented By: Guy Barbieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvatore V. Vivacqua
Represented By: Guy Barbieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. Vivacqua, Sr.
Represented By: Guy Barbieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'Arrigo Bros Co. of New York, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Adam Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?