Grullon v. Lewis et al
Plaintiff: Luis Grullon
Defendant: UMG Recordings, Inc., Steven D Lewis, Galactic Records, Republic Records and Giuseppe Zappala
Case Number: 1:2024cv04892
Filed: June 27, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. § 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for August 23, 2024, is hereby ADJOURNED to Friday, September 27, 2024, at 10:00 A.M. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, 10007. The pre-conference joint letter is due September 20, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/12/2024) Initial Conference set for 9/27/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (ks)
August 9, 2024 Filing 24 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Mark S. Kaufman dated August 9, 2024. Document filed by Luis Grullon..(Kaufman, Mark)
August 9, 2024 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Galactic Records waiver sent on 7/25/2024, answer due 9/23/2024. Document filed by Luis Grullon..(Kaufman, Mark)
August 9, 2024 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Giuseppe Zappala waiver sent on 7/25/2024, answer due 9/23/2024. Document filed by Luis Grullon..(Kaufman, Mark)
August 9, 2024 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Steven D Lewis waiver sent on 7/25/2024, answer due 9/23/2024. Document filed by Luis Grullon..(Kaufman, Mark)
July 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The request is granted for an extension of defendants' UMG Recordings, Inc., and its unincorporated division Republic Records time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint up to and including September 23, 2024. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/26/2024) (tro)
July 26, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Republic Records answer due 9/23/2024; UMG Recordings, Inc. answer due 9/23/2024. (tro)
July 25, 2024 Filing 19 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Carla Miller dated 07/25/2024. Document filed by Republic Records, UMG Recordings, Inc...(Tardif, Nicholas)
July 24, 2024 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Republic Records served on 7/19/2024, answer due 8/9/2024. Service was accepted by Vincenza Cipriano. Document filed by Luis Grullon..(Lockyer, Benjamin)
July 17, 2024 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. UMG Recordings, Inc. served on 7/17/2024, answer due 8/7/2024. Service was accepted by Vincenza Cipriano. Document filed by Luis Grullon..(Lockyer, Benjamin)
July 12, 2024 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to UMG Recordings, Inc.. (vf)
July 12, 2024 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Republic Records. (vf)
July 12, 2024 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Steven D Lewis. (vf)
July 11, 2024 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UMG Recordings, Inc., re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Luis Grullon..(Lockyer, Benjamin)
July 11, 2024 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Republic Records, re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Luis Grullon..(Lockyer, Benjamin)
July 11, 2024 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Steven D. Lewis, re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Luis Grullon..(Lockyer, Benjamin)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Benjamin C.R. Lockyer, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. As further set forth by this Order. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/10/2024) (tg)
July 9, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Benjamin C.R. Lockyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (corrected). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Luis Grullon. Return Date set for 7/18/2024 at 10:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Lockyer PHV, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing).(Lockyer, Benjamin)
July 9, 2024 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - MOTION for Benjamin Lockyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Luis Grullon. Return Date set for 7/18/2024 at 10:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Lockyer, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing).(Lockyer, Benjamin) Modified on 7/9/2024 (bc).
July 9, 2024 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lockyer, Benjamin)
July 9, 2024 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Giuseppe Zappala, Steven D Lewis, Republic Records, UMG Recordings, Inc., Galactic Records. Document filed by Luis Grullon..(Lockyer, Benjamin)
July 9, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #8 MOTION for Benjamin Lockyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Proposed Order;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bc)
July 9, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Benjamin C.R. Lockyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (corrected). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
July 1, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/23/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/1/2024) (tg)
June 28, 2024 Pro Hac Vice Fee Due: for #3 MOTION for Benjamin C.R. Lockyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(bc)
June 28, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Mark S. Kaufman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Republic Records, a division of UMG Recordings, Inc., Giuseppe Zappata. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name entered incorrectly. (vf)
June 28, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Mark S. Kaufman to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Add party Galactic Records to ECF; Signature Error, The pleading was not signed by the ECF Filing Attorney user. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
June 28, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Mark S. Kaufman to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Nature of Suit Error. Place an [X] in One Box Only; The form was not signed by the ECF Filing Attorney User. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
June 28, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE re: Document No. #3 MOTION for Benjamin C.R. Lockyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Illinois; the filing fee was not paid; Motion needs wet signature because different Pacer account;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. Pay the filing fee using the event Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment found under the event list Other Documents. (bc)
June 28, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Mark S. Kaufman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand Blank; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 200,000; the County code has been modified to Kings. (vf)
June 28, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Mark S. Kaufman to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
June 28, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
June 28, 2024 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
June 28, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
June 27, 2024 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - DECLARATION of Cynthia A. Grant in Support re: #3 MOTION for Benjamin C.R. Lockyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Document filed by Luis Grullon..(Kaufman, Mark) Modified on 6/28/2024 (bc).
June 27, 2024 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - MOTION for Benjamin C.R. Lockyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Luis Grullon. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Benjamin C.R. Lockyer, #2 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Kaufman, Mark) Modified on 6/28/2024 (bc).
June 27, 2024 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kaufman, Mark) Modified on 6/28/2024 (vf).
June 27, 2024 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Steven D Lewis, Republic Records, a division of UMG Recordings, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Giuseppe Zappata. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29542863)Document filed by Luis Grullon..(Kaufman, Mark) Modified on 6/28/2024 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grullon v. Lewis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMG Recordings, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Joseph Tardif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven D Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galactic Records
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Records
Represented By: Nicholas Joseph Tardif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giuseppe Zappala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Grullon
Represented By: Benjamin C.R. Lockyer
Represented By: Mark S. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?