English v. Combs et al
Plaintiff: Adria English
Defendant: Penske Media Corporation, Vibe Magazine, Bad Boy Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Vibe, P. Diddy, Diddy, Puff, Puff Daddy, Puffy, Brother Love, Jacob the Jeweler, Sean John Clothing LLC, Inc., Jacob Arabov, Organizational Does 1-10, PMC, Sean Combs, John and Jane Does 1-10, Tamiko Thomas and COMBS GLOBAL ENTERPRISES
Case Number: 1:2024cv05090
Filed: July 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2024 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Penske Media Corporation..(pc)
August 6, 2024 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jacob Arabov..(pc)
August 6, 2024 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Combs Global Enterprises..(pc)
August 6, 2024 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vibe Magazine..(pc)
August 6, 2024 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sean Combs..(pc)
August 6, 2024 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sean John Clothing LLC, Inc...(pc)
August 6, 2024 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bad Boy Entertainment Holdings, Inc...(pc)
August 6, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Ariel Mitchell to RE-FILE Document No. #16 Amended Complaint,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
August 6, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Ariel Mitchell to RE-FILE Document No. #17 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): multiple citizenships for the defendant were selected. Choose one for the first listed defendant. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (pc)
August 6, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ariel Mitchell. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $5,000,000; County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000; the County code has been modified to New York;. (pc)
August 5, 2024 Filing 17 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mitchell, Ariel) Modified on 8/6/2024 (pc).
August 5, 2024 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Jacob Arabov, Bad Boy Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Sean Combs, Combs Global Enterprises, John and Jane Does 1-10, Organizational Does 1-10, Penske Media Corporation, Sean John Clothing LLC, Inc., Tamiko Thomas, Vibe Magazine with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Adria English. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Mitchell, Ariel) Modified on 8/6/2024 (pc).
August 5, 2024 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PENSKE MEDIA CORPORATION, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Adria English..(Mitchell, Ariel)
August 5, 2024 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to VIBE MAGAZINE, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Adria English..(Mitchell, Ariel)
August 5, 2024 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JACOB ARABOV, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Adria English..(Mitchell, Ariel)
August 5, 2024 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to COMBS GLOBAL ENTERPRISES, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Adria English..(Mitchell, Ariel)
August 5, 2024 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sean John CLOTHING LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Adria English..(Mitchell, Ariel)
August 5, 2024 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BAD BOY ENTERTAINMENT HOLDINGS, INC., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Adria English..(Mitchell, Ariel)
August 5, 2024 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SEAN COMBS, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Adria English..(Mitchell, Ariel)
July 18, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ariel Mitchell on behalf of Adria English..(Mitchell, Ariel)
July 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for ARIEL E. MITCHELL-KIDD to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order)(JSS)
July 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by September 9, 2024, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/9/2024) (tro)
July 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of eve1y action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place " before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/9/2024) (tro)
July 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendants shall, by September 9, 2024, file a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge fo1m, available at https://nysd.uscomis.gov/node/754 and attached to this order, on the docket. If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before me. An information sheet on proceedings before magistrate judges is also attached to this order. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by September 9, 2024, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/9/2024) (tro)
July 9, 2024 Filing 3 SECOND MOTION for ARIEL E. MITCHELL-KIDD to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Adria English. Return Date set for 7/11/2024 at 01:00 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attorney Mitchell's Motion (Exhibit A), Declaration (Exhibit B) FL Certficate (Exhibit C), and Federal Certificate (Exhibit D), #2 Exhibit Proposed Order (Exhibit E)).(Metcalf, Steven)
July 9, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #3 SECOND MOTION for ARIEL E. MITCHELL-KIDD to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
July 8, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Steven Alan Metcalf to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
July 8, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 8, 2024 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
July 8, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
July 8, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Steven Alan Metcalf. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Sean P. Diddy Combs; Sean John Clothing LLC; COMBS GLOBAL ENTERPRISES; Vibe Magazine; Penske Media Corporation; Penske Media Corporation; JOHN AND JANE DOE #1-#10; Organizational Does. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; alias party name was omitted;. (jgo)
July 8, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
July 3, 2024 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION for Ariel Mitchell-Kidd to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff as Lead Counsel. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29567975. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Adria English. Return Date set for 7/8/2024 at 09:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Motion for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order).(Metcalf, Steven) Modified on 7/3/2024 (rju).
July 3, 2024 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29567893)Document filed by Adria English..(Metcalf, Steven) Modified on 7/8/2024 (jgo).
July 3, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #2 FIRST MOTION for Ariel Mitchell-Kidd to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff as Lead Counsel Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29567975 Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Florida; No case number on any of the documentation; must have a wet signature on the documentation if using someone else's Pacer account; Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (rju)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: English v. Combs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Media Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vibe Magazine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bad Boy Entertainment Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vibe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Diddy, Diddy, Puff, Puff Daddy, Puffy, Brother Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob the Jeweler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean John Clothing LLC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Arabov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Organizational Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamiko Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMBS GLOBAL ENTERPRISES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adria English
Represented By: Ariel Mitchell
Represented By: Steven Alan Metcalf, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?